New Mexico State Investment Council v. Bank of America Corporation et al
Plaintiff: New Mexico State Investment Council
Defendant: Morgan Stanley Capital Services, LLC, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Barclays PLC, NatWest Group PLC, Barclays Capital Inc., J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., J.P. Morgan Chase & Co., Creditex Group Inc., Bank of America Corporation, NatWest Markets PLC, Deutsche Bank AG, Credit Suisse Capital LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. International PLC, BNP Paribas S.A., NatWest Markets Securities, Inc.., Citibank N.A., Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, BNP Paribas Securities Corp., BOFA Securities, Inc., Goldman Sachs International, Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse AG, Jane Does, IHS Markit, Ltd., Citigroup, Inc., Barclays Bank PLC, Credit Suisse Group AG, Bank of America, N.A., Morgan Stanley, The International Swaps and Derivatives Association, Inc. and Citigroup Global Markets Limited
Case Number: 1:2021cv00606
Filed: June 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kenneth J Gonzales
Referring Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
2 Judge: John F Robbenhaar
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 15
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2021 Filing 112 NOTICE by Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Capital LLC, Credit Suisse Group AG, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC Certification of Good Standing of Non-Member Attorney by Association (Allison, Benjamin)
August 26, 2021 Filing 111 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NatWest Group PLC, NatWest Markets PLC, NatWest Markets Securities, Inc.. (Schultz, Andrew)
August 25, 2021 Filing 110 Association Dues: $ 100 paid, receipt number # ANMDC-7856921 re: 103 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Defendant NatWest Group PLC, Defendant NatWest Markets PLC, Defendant NatWest Markets Securities, Inc.. (bl)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 25, 2021 Filing 109 NOTICE by NatWest Group PLC, NatWest Markets PLC, NatWest Markets Securities, Inc.. of Appearance by Linklaters LLP (Schultz, Andrew)
August 25, 2021 Filing 108 NOTICE by NatWest Group PLC, NatWest Markets PLC, NatWest Markets Securities, Inc.. of Certification of Good Standing (Schultz, Andrew)
August 25, 2021 Filing 106 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants NatWest Group PLC, NatWest Markets PLC, NatWest Markets Securities, Inc.. by Andrew G. Schultz on behalf of: Nicole E. Jerry Linklaters LLP 1290 Avenue of the AmericasNew York, NY 10104 (212) 903-9338 nicole.jerry@linklaters.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Schultz, Andrew)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 25, 2021 Filing 105 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants NatWest Group PLC, NatWest Markets PLC, NatWest Markets Securities, Inc.. by Andrew G. Schultz on behalf of: Patrick C. Ashby Linklaters LLP 1290 Avenue of the AmericasNew York, NY 10104 (212) 903-9268 patrick.ashby@linklaters.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Schultz, Andrew)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 25, 2021 Filing 104 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants NatWest Group PLC, NatWest Markets PLC, NatWest Markets Securities, Inc.. by Andrew G. Schultz on behalf of: James R. Warnot, Jr. Linklaters LLP 1290 Avenue of the AmericasNew York, NY 10104 (212) 903-9028 james.warnot@linklaters.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Schultz, Andrew)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 25, 2021 Filing 103 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants NatWest Group PLC, NatWest Markets PLC, NatWest Markets Securities, Inc.. by Andrew G. Schultz on behalf of: Adam S. Lurie Linklaters LLP 601 13th Street, NW - Suite 400Washington, DC 20005 (202) 654-9227 adam.lurie@linklaters.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Schultz, Andrew)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 25, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7856924 re: # 104 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by NatWest Group PLC, NatWest Markets PLC, NatWest Markets Securities, Inc.. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Schultz, Andrew)
August 25, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7856928 re: # 106 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by NatWest Group PLC, NatWest Markets PLC, NatWest Markets Securities, Inc.. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Schultz, Andrew)
August 25, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7856927 re: # 105 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by NatWest Group PLC, NatWest Markets PLC, NatWest Markets Securities, Inc.. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Schultz, Andrew)
August 24, 2021 Filing 107 Association Dues: $ 100 paid, receipt number # ANMDC-7855510 re: 99 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Defendant Credit Suisse AG, Defendant Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Defendant Credit Suisse Capital LLC, Defendant Credit Suisse International, Defendant Credit Suisse Group AG (bap)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 24, 2021 Filing 102 NOTICE by Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Capital LLC, Credit Suisse Group AG, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC Certification of Good Standing of Non-Member Attorney by Association (Allison, Benjamin)
August 24, 2021 Filing 101 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Capital LLC, Credit Suisse Group AG, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC by Benjamin W Allison on behalf of: Margaret A. Barone CAHILL GORDON & REINDEL LLP 32 Old SlipNew York, NY 10005 (212) 701-3000 Fax (212) 269-5420 mbarone@cahill.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Allison, Benjamin)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 24, 2021 Filing 100 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Capital LLC, Credit Suisse Group AG, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC by Benjamin W Allison on behalf of: Jason M. Hall CAHILL GORDON & REINDEL LLP 32 Old SlipNew York, NY 10005 (212) 701-3000 Fax (212) 269-5420 jhall@cahill.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Allison, Benjamin)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 24, 2021 Filing 99 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Capital LLC, Credit Suisse Group AG, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC by Benjamin W Allison on behalf of: Elai Katz CAHILL GORDON & REINDEL LLP 32 Old SlipNew York, NY 10005 (212) 701-3000 Fax (212) 269-5420 ezatz@cahill.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Allison, Benjamin)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 24, 2021 Filing 98 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Capital LLC, Credit Suisse Group AG, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC by Benjamin W Allison on behalf of: Herbert S. Washer CAHILL GORDON & REINDEL LLP 32 Old SlipNew York, NY 10005 (212) 701-3000 Fax (212) 269-5420 hwasher@cahill.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Allison, Benjamin)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 24, 2021 Filing 97 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Capital LLC, Credit Suisse Group AG, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC by Benjamin W Allison on behalf of: David G. Januszewski CAHILL GORDON & REINDEL LLP 32 Old SlipNew York, NY 10005 (212) 701-3000 Fax (212) 269-5420 djanuszewski@cahill.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Allison, Benjamin)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 24, 2021 Filing 96 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Capital LLC, Credit Suisse Group AG, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC (Allison, Benjamin)
August 24, 2021 Filing 95 NOTICE by Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley & Co. International PLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Morgan Stanley Capital Services, LLC re 94 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, Association Dues for Attorney Licensed Outside the District, Certificate of Good Standing and Entry of Appearance for Lauren M. Rosenberg (Anderson, John)
August 24, 2021 Filing 94 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley & Co. International PLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Morgan Stanley Capital Services, LLC by John C. Anderson on behalf of: Lauren M. Rosenberg Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP Worldwide Plaza, 825 Eighth AvenueNew York, NY 10019 (212) 474-1000 lrosenberg@cravath.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Anderson, John)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 24, 2021 Filing 93 NOTICE by Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley & Co. International PLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Morgan Stanley Capital Services, LLC re 92 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, Association Dues for Attorney Licensed Outside the District, Certificate of Good Standing and Entry of Appearance for Michael A. Paskin (Anderson, John)
August 24, 2021 Filing 92 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley & Co. International PLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Morgan Stanley Capital Services, LLC by John C. Anderson on behalf of: Michael A. Paskin Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP Worldwide Plaza, 825 Eighth AvenueNew York, NY 10019 (212) 474-1000 mpaskin@cravath.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Anderson, John)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 24, 2021 Filing 91 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BNP Paribas S.A., BNP Paribas Securities Corp. (Schultz, Andrew)
August 24, 2021 Filing 90 NOTICE by BNP Paribas S.A., BNP Paribas Securities Corp. of Appearance by Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP (Schultz, Andrew)
August 24, 2021 Filing 89 NOTICE by BNP Paribas S.A., BNP Paribas Securities Corp. of Certification of Good Standing (Schultz, Andrew)
August 24, 2021 Filing 88 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants BNP Paribas S.A., BNP Paribas Securities Corp. by Andrew G. Schultz on behalf of: Jake Walter-Warner Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP 1133 Avenue of the AmericasNew York, NY 10036 (212) 336-2000 jwalterwarner@pbwt.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Schultz, Andrew)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 24, 2021 Filing 87 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants BNP Paribas S.A., BNP Paribas Securities Corp. by Andrew G. Schultz on behalf of: Amy N. Vegari Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP 1133 Avenue of the AmericasNew York, NY 10036 (212) 336-2000 avegari@pbwt.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Schultz, Andrew)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 24, 2021 Filing 86 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants BNP Paribas S.A., BNP Paribas Securities Corp. by Andrew G. Schultz on behalf of: Joshua A. Goldberg Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP 1133 Avenue of the AmericasNew York, NY 10036 (212) 336-2000 jgoldberg@pbwt.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Schultz, Andrew)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 24, 2021 Filing 85 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew G. Schultz on behalf of BNP Paribas S.A., BNP Paribas Securities Corp. (Schultz, Andrew)
August 24, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7854400 re: # 86 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by BNP Paribas S.A., BNP Paribas Securities Corp. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Schultz, Andrew)
August 24, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7854403 re: # 87 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by BNP Paribas S.A., BNP Paribas Securities Corp. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Schultz, Andrew)
August 24, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7854888 re: # 92 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Morgan Stanley Capital Services, LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley & Co. International PLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Anderson, John)
August 24, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7855522 re: # 101 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Credit Suisse Capital LLC, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Group AG (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Allison, Benjamin)
August 24, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7855363 re: # 97 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Credit Suisse Capital LLC, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Group AG (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Allison, Benjamin)
August 24, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7854406 re: # 88 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by BNP Paribas S.A., BNP Paribas Securities Corp. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Schultz, Andrew)
August 24, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7855509 re: # 98 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Credit Suisse Capital LLC, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Group AG (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Allison, Benjamin)
August 24, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7854951 re: # 94 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Morgan Stanley Capital Services, LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley & Co. International PLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Anderson, John)
August 24, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7855514 re: # 100 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Credit Suisse Capital LLC, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Group AG (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Allison, Benjamin)
August 23, 2021 Filing 84 Corporate Disclosure Statement by J.P. Morgan Chase & Co., J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC (Schultz, Andrew)
August 23, 2021 Filing 83 NOTICE by J.P. Morgan Chase & Co., J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC of Appearance by Covington & Burling LLP (Schultz, Andrew)
August 23, 2021 Filing 82 NOTICE by J.P. Morgan Chase & Co., J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC of Certification of Good Standing (Schultz, Andrew)
August 23, 2021 Filing 81 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants J.P. Morgan Chase & Co., J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC by Andrew G. Schultz on behalf of: Kyle W. Chow Covington & Burling LLP 620 Eighth AvenueNew York, NY 10018-1405 (212) 841-1000 Kchow@cov.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Schultz, Andrew)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 23, 2021 Filing 80 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants J.P. Morgan Chase & Co., J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC by Andrew G. Schultz on behalf of: Shadman Zaman Covington & Burling LLP 850 Tenth Street, NWWashington, DC 20001 (202) 662-6000 szaman@cov.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Schultz, Andrew)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 23, 2021 Filing 79 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants J.P. Morgan Chase & Co., J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC by Andrew G. Schultz on behalf of: Henry Liu Covington & Burling LLP 850 Tenth Street, NWWashington, DC 20001 (202) 662-6000 hliu@cov,com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Schultz, Andrew)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 23, 2021 Filing 78 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants J.P. Morgan Chase & Co., J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC by Andrew G. Schultz on behalf of: Robert D. Wick Covington & Burling LLP 850 Tenth Street, NWWashington, DC 20001 (202) 662-6000 rwick@cov.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Schultz, Andrew)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING SERVICE AND TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
August 23, 2021 Filing 76 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Goldman Sachs International (Schultz, Andrew)
August 23, 2021 Filing 75 NOTICE by Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Goldman Sachs International of Appearance by Winston & Strawn LLP (Schultz, Andrew)
August 23, 2021 Filing 74 NOTICE by Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Goldman Sachs International of Certification of Good Standing (Schultz, Andrew)
August 23, 2021 Filing 73 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Goldman Sachs International by Andrew G. Schultz on behalf of: Eva W. Cole Winston & Strawn LLP 200 Park AvenueNew York, NY 10166-4193 (212) 294-4703 Fax (212) 294-4700 EWCole@winston.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Schultz, Andrew)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 23, 2021 Filing 72 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Goldman Sachs International by Andrew G. Schultz on behalf of: Eva W. Cole Winston & Strawn LLP 200 Park AvenueNew York, NY 10166-4193 (212) 294-4703 Fax (212) 294-4700 EWCole@winston.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Schultz, Andrew)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 23, 2021 Filing 71 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Goldman Sachs International by Andrew G. Schultz on behalf of: Staci Yablon Winston & Strawn LLP 200 Park AvenueNew York, NY 10166-4193 (212) 294-4703 Fax (212) 294-4700 SYablon@winston.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Schultz, Andrew)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 23, 2021 Filing 70 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Goldman Sachs International by Andrew G. Schultz on behalf of: Robert Sperling Winston & Strawn LLP 35 W. Wacker DriveChicago, IL 60601-9703 (312) 558-7941 Fax (312) 558-5700 RSperling@winston.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Schultz, Andrew)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 23, 2021 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew G. Schultz on behalf of J.P. Morgan Chase & Co., J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC (Schultz, Andrew)
August 23, 2021 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew G. Schultz on behalf of Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Goldman Sachs International (Schultz, Andrew)
August 23, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7853282 re: # 79 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., J.P. Morgan Chase & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Schultz, Andrew)
August 23, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7853268 re: # 78 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., J.P. Morgan Chase & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Schultz, Andrew)
August 23, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7853291 re: # 80 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., J.P. Morgan Chase & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Schultz, Andrew)
August 23, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7852346 re: # 70 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Goldman Sachs International, Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Schultz, Andrew)
August 23, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7852472 re: # 73 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Goldman Sachs International, Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Schultz, Andrew)
August 23, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7853299 re: # 81 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., J.P. Morgan Chase & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Schultz, Andrew)
August 23, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7852352 re: # 71 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Goldman Sachs International, Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Schultz, Andrew)
August 20, 2021 Filing 67 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc. (Allen, Meena)
August 20, 2021 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin W Allison on behalf of Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Capital LLC, Credit Suisse Group AG, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC (Allison, Benjamin)
August 19, 2021 Filing 65 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc. by Meena H Allen on behalf of: John Francis Terzaken, III Simpson Thacher & Bartlett, LLP 900 G Street NWWashington, DC 20001 (202) 636-5858 Fax (202) 636-5502 john.terzaken@stblaw.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Allen, Meena)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 19, 2021 Filing 64 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc. by Meena H Allen on behalf of: Laurel Elizabeth Fresquez Simpson Thacher & Bartlett, LLP 900 G Street NWWashington, DC 20001 (202) 636-5537 Fax (202) 636-5502 laurel.fresquez@stblaw.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Allen, Meena)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 19, 2021 Filing 63 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc. by Meena H Allen on behalf of: Adrienne Vollmer Baxley Simpson Thacher & Bartlett, LLP 900 G Street NWWashington, DC 20001 (202) 636-5503 Fax (202) 636-5502 adrienne.baxley@stblaw.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Allen, Meena)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 19, 2021 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Meena H Allen on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc. (Allen, Meena)
August 19, 2021 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Meena H Allen on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc. (Allen, Meena)
August 19, 2021 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Meena H Allen on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc. (Allen, Meena)
August 19, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7847623 re: # 64 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Deutsche Bank AG (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Allen, Meena)
August 19, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7847600 re: # 63 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Deutsche Bank AG (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Allen, Meena)
August 19, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7847637 re: # 65 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Deutsche Bank AG (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Allen, Meena)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER SETTING DEADLINES FOR RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting #32 Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadlines to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint by Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Morgan Stanley Capital Services LLC, and BNP Paribas Securities Corp. (tah)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting #30 Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadlines to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint by Defendants Citigroup Inc., Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Limited. (tah)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting #23 Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadlines to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint by Defendants NatWest Group Plc, NatWest Markets Plc, NatWest Markets Securities, Inc. and the International Swaps Derivatives Association, Inc. (tah)
August 17, 2021 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Meena H Allen on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc. (Allen, Meena)
August 16, 2021 Filing 54 NOTICE by IHS Markit, Ltd. of Association of Attorney David Munkittrick (Laskey, H)
August 16, 2021 Filing 53 NOTICE by IHS Markit, Ltd. of Association of Attorney Colin Kass (Laskey, H)
August 16, 2021 Filing 52 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant IHS Markit, Ltd. by H Brook Laskey on behalf of: David A. Munkittrick Proskauer Eleven Times SquareNew York, NY 10036-8299 212-969-3226 DMunkittrick@proskauer.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Laskey, H)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 16, 2021 Filing 51 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant IHS Markit, Ltd. by H Brook Laskey on behalf of: Colin R. Kass Proskauer 1001 Pennsylvania Ave NWWashington, DC 20004 212-969-3226 CKass@proskauer.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Laskey, H)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 16, 2021 Filing 50 Corporate Disclosure Statement by IHS Markit, Ltd. (Laskey, H)
August 16, 2021 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by H Brook Laskey on behalf of IHS Markit, Ltd. (Laskey, H)
August 16, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7839971 re: # 51 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by IHS Markit, Ltd. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Laskey, H)
August 16, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7839997 re: # 52 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by IHS Markit, Ltd. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Laskey, H)
August 12, 2021 Filing 48 Association Dues: $ 100 paid, receipt number # ANMDC-7835589 re: 44 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Defendant Citibank N.A., Defendant Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Defendant Citigroup, Inc., Defendant Citigroup Global Markets Limited. (cmm)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 12, 2021 Filing 47 Association Dues: $ 100 paid, receipt number # ANMDC-7835563 re: 43 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Defendant Citibank N.A., Defendant Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Defendant Citigroup, Inc., Defendant Citigroup Global Markets Limited. (cmm)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 12, 2021 Filing 46 NOTICE by Citibank N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup, Inc. Certificate of Good Standing of Karen Hoffman Lent (Burris, Eric)
August 12, 2021 Filing 45 NOTICE by Citibank N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup, Inc. Certificate of Good Standing of Jay B. Kasner (Burris, Eric)
August 12, 2021 Filing 44 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants Citibank N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup, Inc. by Eric R. Burris on behalf of: Karen Hoffman Lent Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP One Manhattan WestNew York, NY 10001 (212) 735-3276 karen.lent@skadden.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Burris, Eric)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 12, 2021 Filing 43 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants Citibank N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup, Inc. by Eric R. Burris on behalf of: Jay B. Kasner Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP One Manhattan WestNew York, NY 10001 (212) 735-2628 jay.kasner@skadden.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Burris, Eric)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 12, 2021 Filing 42 NOTICE by BOFA Securities, Inc., Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A. re 41 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, Notice of Certification (Sohn, Jeanne)
August 12, 2021 Filing 41 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants BOFA Securities, Inc., Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A. by Jeanne Y Sohn on behalf of: Sheila R. Adams Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP 450 Lexington Ave.New York, NY 10017 212-450-3160 sheila.adams@davispolk.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Sohn, Jeanne)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 12, 2021 Filing 40 NOTICE by BOFA Securities, Inc., Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A. re 39 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, Notice of Certification (Sohn, Jeanne)
August 12, 2021 Filing 39 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants BOFA Securities, Inc., Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A. by Jeanne Y Sohn on behalf of: Paul S. Mishkin Davis Polk& Wardwell LLP 450 Lexington Ave.New York, NY 10017 212-450-4292 paul.mishkin@davispolk.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Sohn, Jeanne)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 12, 2021 Filing 38 NOTICE by BOFA Securities, Inc., Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A. re 37 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, Notice of Certification (Sohn, Jeanne)
August 12, 2021 Filing 37 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants BOFA Securities, Inc., Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A. by Jeanne Y Sohn on behalf of: Arthur J. Burke Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP 450 Lexington Ave.New York, NY 10017 212-450-4352 arthur.burke@davispolk.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Sohn, Jeanne)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 12, 2021 Filing 36 NOTICE by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A., re 35 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, Notice of Certification (Sohn, Jeanne) Modified text on 8/12/2021 (mjr).
August 12, 2021 Filing 35 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants BOFA Securities, Inc., Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A. by Jeanne Y Sohn on behalf of: Adam G. Mehes Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP 450 Lexington Ave.New York, NY 10017 212-450-4398 adam.mehes@davispolk.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Sohn, Jeanne)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 12, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7834759 re: # 35 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Bank of America Corporation, BOFA Securities, Inc., Bank of America, N.A. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Sohn, Jeanne)
August 12, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7834796 re: # 39 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Bank of America Corporation, BOFA Securities, Inc., Bank of America, N.A. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Sohn, Jeanne)
August 12, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7834844 re: # 41 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Bank of America Corporation, BOFA Securities, Inc., Bank of America, N.A. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Sohn, Jeanne)
August 12, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7834783 re: # 37 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Bank of America Corporation, BOFA Securities, Inc., Bank of America, N.A. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Sohn, Jeanne)
August 11, 2021 Filing 34 Association Dues: $ 100.00 paid, receipt number # ANMDC-7833080 re: 33 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Plaintiff New Mexico State Investment Council. (cmm)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 11, 2021 Filing 33 ***FILED IN ERROR*** ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff New Mexico State Investment Council by Ethan Kaminsky (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Kaminsky, Ethan)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] Modified on 8/12/2021 (jg).
August 11, 2021 Filing 32 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Unopposed Motion To Extend Deadlines To Answer Or Otherwise Respond To Plaintiffs Class Action Complaint by BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Morgan Stanley Capital Services, LLC. (Anderson, John)
August 11, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew G. Schultz on behalf of BNP Paribas Securities Corp. (Schultz, Andrew)
August 11, 2021 Filing 30 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint by Citibank N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup, Inc.. (Burris, Eric)
August 10, 2021 Filing 29 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BOFA Securities, Inc., Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company, Corporate Parent NB Holdings for BOFA Securities, Inc., Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A.. (Sohn, Jeanne)
August 10, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeanne Y Sohn on behalf of BOFA Securities, Inc., Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A. (Sohn, Jeanne)
August 10, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Debashree Nandy on behalf of Citibank N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup, Inc. (Nandy, Debashree)
August 10, 2021 Filing 26 ***FILED IN ERROR*** ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff New Mexico State Investment Council by Alison Gaske (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Gaske, Alison)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] Modified on 8/11/2021 (jg).
August 10, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric R. Burris on behalf of Citibank N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup, Inc. (Burris, Eric)
August 10, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew G. Schultz on behalf of NatWest Group PLC, NatWest Markets PLC, NatWest Markets Securities, Inc.. (Schultz, Andrew)
August 10, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7831460 re: # 26 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by New Mexico State Investment Council (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Gaske, Alison)
August 9, 2021 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint by NatWest Group PLC, NatWest Markets PLC, NatWest Markets Securities, Inc.., The International Swaps and Derivatives Association, Inc.. (Schultz, Andrew)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting #14 Unopposed Motion for the Adjournment of Deadlines to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint filed jointly by Barclays Capital, Inc., Barclays Bank PLC, Bank of America, N.A., Bank of America Corporation, and BofA Securities, Inc. (tah)
August 9, 2021 Filing 21 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant The International Swaps and Derivatives Association, Inc. by Jessica M Hernandez on behalf of: Avia Gridi SIMPSON THACHER & BARTLETT LLP 900 G Street, NWWashington, DC 20001 (202) 636-5500 avia.gridi@stblaw.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Hernandez, Jessica)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 9, 2021 Filing 20 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant The International Swaps and Derivatives Association, Inc. by Jessica M Hernandez on behalf of: Jonathan D. Porter SIMPSON THACHER & BARTLETT LLP 900 G Street, NWWashington, DC 20001 (202) 636-5500 jporter@stblaw.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Hernandez, Jessica)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 9, 2021 Filing 19 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant The International Swaps and Derivatives Association, Inc. by Jessica M Hernandez on behalf of: Alan C. Turner SIMPSON THACHER & BARTLETT LLP 425 Lexington AvenueNew York, NY 10017 (212) 455-2472 aturner@stblaw.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Hernandez, Jessica)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 9, 2021 Filing 18 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant The International Swaps and Derivatives Association, Inc. by Jessica M Hernandez on behalf of: Abram J. Ellis SIMPSON THACHER & BARTLETT LLP 900 G Street, NWWashington, DC 20001 (202) 636-5500 aellis@stblaw.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Hernandez, Jessica)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 9, 2021 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The International Swaps and Derivatives Association, Inc. (Hernandez, Jessica)
August 9, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE by The International Swaps and Derivatives Association, Inc. Notice of Certificate of Good Standing for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Hernandez, Jessica)
August 9, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica M Hernandez on behalf of The International Swaps and Derivatives Association, Inc. (Hernandez, Jessica)
August 9, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7828178 re: # 19 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by The International Swaps and Derivatives Association, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Hernandez, Jessica)
August 9, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7828201 re: # 21 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by The International Swaps and Derivatives Association, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Hernandez, Jessica)
August 9, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7828159 re: # 18 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by The International Swaps and Derivatives Association, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Hernandez, Jessica)
August 9, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7828188 re: # 20 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by The International Swaps and Derivatives Association, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Hernandez, Jessica)
August 5, 2021 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Jointly by Bank of America, N.A., Bank of America Corporation, BofA Securities, Inc., and by Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays PLC. (Baker, Douglas)
August 5, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas A. Baker on behalf of Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays PLC (Baker, Douglas)
August 5, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin D Rodriguez on behalf of Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays PLC (Rodriguez, Justin)
August 5, 2021 Summons Issued as to Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Credit Suisse International, Goldman Sachs International. (arp)
August 3, 2021 Filing 11 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff New Mexico State Investment Council by Adam Farra (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Farra, Adam)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 3, 2021 Filing 10 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff New Mexico State Investment Council by Richard James Leveridge (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Leveridge, Richard)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 3, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7818075 re: # 10 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by New Mexico State Investment Council (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Leveridge, Richard)
August 3, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7818098 re: # 11 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by New Mexico State Investment Council (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Farra, Adam)
July 30, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 7. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
July 28, 2021 Filing 8 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
July 27, 2021 Summons Issued as to Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays PLC, IHS Markit, Ltd., Morgan Stanley & Co. International PLC, NatWest Group PLC, NatWest Markets PLC. (jg)
July 16, 2021 Filing 6 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff New Mexico State Investment Council by David E Kovel (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Kovel, David)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 16, 2021 Filing 5 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff New Mexico State Investment Council by Karen M Lerner (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Lerner, Karen)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 16, 2021 Filing 4 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff New Mexico State Investment Council by Thomas Popejoy (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Popejoy, Thomas)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 16, 2021 Filing 3 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff New Mexico State Investment Council by Anthony Epifanio Maneiro (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Maneiro, Anthony)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 16, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7790477 re: # 5 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by New Mexico State Investment Council (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Lerner, Karen)
July 16, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7790496 re: # 6 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by New Mexico State Investment Council (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Kovel, David)
July 16, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7790444 re: # 3 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by New Mexico State Investment Council (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Maneiro, Anthony)
July 16, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7790451 re: # 4 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by New Mexico State Investment Council (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Popejoy, Thomas)
July 9, 2021 Summons Issued as to BNP Paribas S.A., BNP Paribas Securities Corp., BOFA Securities, Inc., Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A., Barclays Capital Inc., Citibank N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup, Inc., Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Capital LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Creditex Group Inc., Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., J.P. Morgan Chase & Co., J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Morgan Stanley Capital Services, LLC, NatWest Markets Securities, Inc.., The International Swaps and Derivatives Association, Inc.. (arp)
July 1, 2021 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
July 1, 2021 United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa and United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (jg)
June 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by New Mexico State Investment Council. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Khoury, Cholla)
June 30, 2021 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7766612 re #1 Complaint filed by New Mexico State Investment Council (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Khoury, Cholla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New Mexico State Investment Council v. Bank of America Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley Capital Services, LLC
Represented By: John C. Anderson
Represented By: Lauren M Rosenberg
Represented By: Michael A Paskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets Inc.
Represented By: Debashree Nandy
Represented By: Eric R. Burris
Represented By: Jay B Kasner
Represented By: Karen Hoffman Lent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities LLC
Represented By: Andrew G. Schultz
Represented By: Henry Liu
Represented By: Kyle Chow
Represented By: Robert D Wick
Represented By: Shadman Zaman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.
Represented By: Adrienne Vollmer Baxley
Represented By: John Francis Terzaken III
Represented By: Laurel Elizabeth Fresquez
Represented By: Meena H Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC
Represented By: Benjamin W Allison
Represented By: David G Januszewski
Represented By: Elai Katz
Represented By: Herbert S Washer
Represented By: Jason M Hall
Represented By: Margaret A Barone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays PLC
Represented By: Douglas A. Baker
Represented By: Justin D Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NatWest Group PLC
Represented By: Adam S Lurie
Represented By: Andrew G. Schultz
Represented By: James R Warnot, Jr
Represented By: Nicole E Jerry
Represented By: Patrick C Ashby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Capital Inc.
Represented By: Douglas A. Baker
Represented By: Justin D Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Andrew G. Schultz
Represented By: Henry Liu
Represented By: Kyle Chow
Represented By: Robert D Wick
Represented By: Shadman Zaman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Chase & Co.
Represented By: Andrew G. Schultz
Represented By: Henry Liu
Represented By: Kyle Chow
Represented By: Robert D Wick
Represented By: Shadman Zaman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Creditex Group Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation
Represented By: Gregory Marshall
Represented By: Jeanne Y Sohn
Represented By: Adam G. Mehes
Represented By: Arthur J. Burke
Represented By: Paul S. Mishkin
Represented By: Sheila R. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NatWest Markets PLC
Represented By: Adam S Lurie
Represented By: Andrew G. Schultz
Represented By: James R Warnot, Jr
Represented By: Nicole E Jerry
Represented By: Patrick C Ashby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank AG
Represented By: Adrienne Vollmer Baxley
Represented By: John Francis Terzaken III
Represented By: Laurel Elizabeth Fresquez
Represented By: Meena H Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Capital LLC
Represented By: Benjamin W Allison
Represented By: David G Januszewski
Represented By: Elai Katz
Represented By: Herbert S Washer
Represented By: Jason M Hall
Represented By: Margaret A Barone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley & Co. International PLC
Represented By: Lauren M Rosenberg
Represented By: Michael A Paskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNP Paribas S.A.
Represented By: Amy N. Vegari
Represented By: Andrew G. Schultz
Represented By: Jake Walter-Warner
Represented By: Josh A Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NatWest Markets Securities, Inc..
Represented By: Adam S Lurie
Represented By: Andrew G. Schultz
Represented By: James R Warnot, Jr
Represented By: Nicole E Jerry
Represented By: Patrick C Ashby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank N.A.
Represented By: Debashree Nandy
Represented By: Eric R. Burris
Represented By: Jay B Kasner
Represented By: Karen Hoffman Lent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC
Represented By: Andrew G. Schultz
Represented By: Eva W Cole
Represented By: Robert Sperling
Represented By: Staci Yablon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC
Represented By: John C. Anderson
Represented By: Lauren M Rosenberg
Represented By: Michael A Paskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNP Paribas Securities Corp.
Represented By: Amy N. Vegari
Represented By: Andrew G. Schultz
Represented By: Jake Walter-Warner
Represented By: Josh A Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOFA Securities, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Marshall
Represented By: Jeanne Y Sohn
Represented By: Adam G. Mehes
Represented By: Arthur J. Burke
Represented By: Paul S. Mishkin
Represented By: Sheila R. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman Sachs International
Represented By: Andrew G. Schultz
Represented By: Eva W Cole
Represented By: Robert Sperling
Represented By: Staci Yablon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman Sachs Group, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew G. Schultz
Represented By: Eva W Cole
Represented By: Robert Sperling
Represented By: Staci Yablon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse International
Represented By: Benjamin W Allison
Represented By: David G Januszewski
Represented By: Elai Katz
Represented By: Herbert S Washer
Represented By: Jason M Hall
Represented By: Margaret A Barone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse AG
Represented By: Benjamin W Allison
Represented By: David G Januszewski
Represented By: Elai Katz
Represented By: Herbert S Washer
Represented By: Jason M Hall
Represented By: Margaret A Barone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IHS Markit, Ltd.
Represented By: Colin Kass
Represented By: David A. Munkittrick
Represented By: H Brook Laskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup, Inc.
Represented By: Debashree Nandy
Represented By: Eric R. Burris
Represented By: Jay B Kasner
Represented By: Karen Hoffman Lent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Bank PLC
Represented By: Douglas A. Baker
Represented By: Justin D Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Group AG
Represented By: Benjamin W Allison
Represented By: David G Januszewski
Represented By: Elai Katz
Represented By: Herbert S Washer
Represented By: Jason M Hall
Represented By: Margaret A Barone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Gregory Marshall
Represented By: Jeanne Y Sohn
Represented By: Adam G. Mehes
Represented By: Arthur J. Burke
Represented By: Paul S. Mishkin
Represented By: Sheila R. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley
Represented By: John C. Anderson
Represented By: Lauren M Rosenberg
Represented By: Michael A Paskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The International Swaps and Derivatives Association, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica M Hernandez
Represented By: Abram Ellis
Represented By: Alan Turner
Represented By: Avia Gridi
Represented By: Jonathan D. Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets Limited
Represented By: Debashree Nandy
Represented By: Eric R. Burris
Represented By: Jay B Kasner
Represented By: Karen Hoffman Lent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Mexico State Investment Council
Represented By: Cholla Khoury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?