Gatlin v. CoreCivic, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Jason T. Gatlin
Defendant: CoreCivic, Inc., Corrections Corporation of America and Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00680
Filed: July 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Robert C Brack
Referring Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by CoreCivic, Inc. re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Failure to Timely Serve filed by CoreCivic, Inc. (Lee, Jacob)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Failure to Timely Serve filed by CoreCivic, Inc.. (Lee, Jacob)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Special Appearance for Insufficient Service of Process filed by Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC (White, Geoffrey)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Special Appearance for Insufficient Service of Process filed by Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC. (White, Geoffrey)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Failure to Timely Serve Document 4 filed by Jason T. Gatlin. (Rodriguez, Augustine)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Special Appearance for Insufficient Service of Process filed by Jason T. Gatlin. (Rodriguez, Augustine)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE by Jason T. Gatlin re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Failure to Timely Serve EXTENSION TO RESPOND (Rodriguez, Augustine)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE by Jason T. Gatlin re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Special Appearance for Insufficient Service of Process EXTENSION TO RESPOND (Rodriguez, Augustine)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Debra J. Moulton on behalf of CoreCivic, Inc. (Moulton, Debra)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CoreCivic, Inc. (Lee, Jacob)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Failure to Timely Serve by CoreCivic, Inc.. (Lee, Jacob)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss Special Appearance for Insufficient Service of Process by Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (White, Geoffrey)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE by Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC of Filing State Court Record (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (White, Geoffrey)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC of Civil Action from Second Judicial District Court, case number D-202-CV-2020-00759. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(White, Geoffrey)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7799734 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(White, Geoffrey)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Sr. United States District Judge Robert C. Brack and United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (arp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gatlin v. CoreCivic, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CoreCivic, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel P Struck
Represented By: Deborah D. Wells
Represented By: Debra J. Moulton
Represented By: Jacob B Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corrections Corporation of America
Represented By: Daniel P Struck
Represented By: Deborah D. Wells
Represented By: Debra J. Moulton
Represented By: Jacob B Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC
Represented By: Alfred A Park
Represented By: Geoffrey D White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason T. Gatlin
Represented By: Augustine M Rodriguez, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?