HiTex, LLC v. Vorel et al
Plaintiff: HiTex, LLC
Defendant: Paul M. Vorel, John Ernest Light, Tina S Light, Accounting for Edmond, LLC and Investors Services Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00697
Filed: July 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: John F Robbenhaar
Referring Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE by Accounting for Edmond, LLC, Investors Services Inc., John Ernest Light, Tina S Light, Paul M. Vorel re #1 Complaint Notice of Second Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint (Kafka, Jacqueline)
August 26, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE by Accounting for Edmond, LLC, Investors Services Inc., John Ernest Light, Tina S Light, Paul M. Vorel re #3 Appendix/Supplement, #1 Complaint Notice of Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint (Kafka, Jacqueline)
August 26, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline K Kafka on behalf of Paul M. Vorel (Kafka, Jacqueline)
August 25, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline K Kafka on behalf of Accounting for Edmond, LLC, Investors Services Inc., John Ernest Light, Tina S Light (Kafka, Jacqueline)
July 30, 2021 Summons Issued as to Accounting for Edmond, LLC, Investors Services Inc., John Ernest Light, Tina S Light, Paul M. Vorel. (jg)
July 28, 2021 Filing 3 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint Cover Sheet by HiTex, LLC (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover sheet) (Curtis, Stephen)
July 28, 2021 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
July 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by HiTex, LLC. (Curtis, Stephen)
July 28, 2021 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7809213 re #1 Complaint filed by HiTex, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Curtis, Stephen)
July 28, 2021 United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar and United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea assigned. (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HiTex, LLC v. Vorel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HiTex, LLC
Represented By: Stephen P. Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul M. Vorel
Represented By: Arlyn G Crow
Represented By: Jacqueline K Kafka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Ernest Light
Represented By: Arlyn G Crow
Represented By: Jacqueline K Kafka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tina S Light
Represented By: Arlyn G Crow
Represented By: Jacqueline K Kafka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accounting for Edmond, LLC
Represented By: Arlyn G Crow
Represented By: Jacqueline K Kafka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Investors Services Inc.
Represented By: Arlyn G Crow
Represented By: Jacqueline K Kafka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?