Lopez v. The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company et al
Plaintiff: Todd M. Lopez, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Edward Ornelas and Todd M. Lopez
Defendant: The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company and Steven Leaton
Case Number: 1:2021cv00846
Filed: August 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Referring Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2021 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Remand filed by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (DeCandia, Donald)
October 20, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: #14 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Steven Leaton, 11 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Todd M. Lopez and 13 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (eh)
October 19, 2021 Filing 14 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Steven Leaton voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (eh)
October 18, 2021 Filing 13 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Hittson, Terra)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
October 7, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company re #9 MOTION to Remand - Notice of Extension (DeCandia, Donald)
September 28, 2021 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Todd M. Lopez voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Ragan, James)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
September 28, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge unless consents from all parties have been filed by Tuesday, October 19, 2021. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (kmt)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
September 27, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand by Todd M. Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10) (Ragan, James)
September 21, 2021 Filing 8 Clerk's Minutes for telephonic status conference held before Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar on September 21, 2021. (Recording Info: MARS) (rcf)
September 17, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Terra Hittson on behalf of The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company (Hittson, Terra)
September 14, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company identifying Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc. for The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (DeCandia, Donald)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar SETTING telephonic Status Conference for September 21, 2021, at 9:00 a.m. MDT. Counsel must call Judge Vidmar's AT&T Conference Line at (888) 363-4734 (access code: 4382538) to connect to the proceedings. (rcf)
August 31, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company re #1 Notice of Removal, Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) (DeCandia, Donald)
August 30, 2021 Filing 3 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Notice of Removal, Exhibits 6-27 and Civil Coversheet by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 18, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 19, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 20, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 21, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 22, #17 Exhibit EXhibit 23, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 24, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 25, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 26, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 27, #22 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (DeCandia, Donald)
August 30, 2021 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
August 30, 2021 United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa and United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar assigned. (jg)
August 27, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company from First Judicial District, case number D-101-CV-2020-01877. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5)(DeCandia, Donald)
August 27, 2021 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number BNMDC-7863271 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(DeCandia, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd M. Lopez, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Edward Ornelas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd M. Lopez
Represented By: Gilbert Arrazolo
Represented By: James B Ragan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Represented By: Donald A. DeCandia
Represented By: Terra Hittson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Leaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?