Ervin v. The United States et al
Plaintiff: Michael W. Ervin
Defendant: The United States and Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 1:2021cv00949
Filed: September 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: James O Browning
Referring Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Addition of Exhibits by Michael W. Ervin. (bap)
November 12, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change Name and Address of Institutional by Michael W. Ervin (bap)
October 28, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Admit Further Exhibits by Michael W. Ervin. (bap)
October 18, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change/Correction of Address effective as of November 1, 2021 by Michael W. Ervin (bap)
October 18, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Coming Address Change by Michael W. Ervin (bap)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter by District Judge James O. Browning. (bap)
September 29, 2021 Filing 3 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael W. Ervin. (cmm)
September 28, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael W. Ervin. (arp)
September 28, 2021 Filing 1 1983 PRISONER'S CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT - Motion to Compel a Response against All Defendants, filed by Michael W. Ervin. (arp)
September 28, 2021 United States District Judge James O. Browning and United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (arp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ervin v. The United States et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael W. Ervin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?