Legacy Mills, LLC v. National Surety Corporation
Plaintiff: Legacy Mills, LLC
Defendant: National Surety Corporation
Case Number: 1:2021cv00950
Filed: September 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Fouratt
Referring Judge: Martha Vazquez
2 Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2021 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Surety Corporation Defendant National Surety Corporations First Set Of Interrogatories And Requests For Production To Plaintiff Legacy Mills, LLC (Lardy, Mia)
November 10, 2021 Filing 15 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough: Scheduling Conference held on 11/10/2021. (kfo)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STATUS REPORT by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. (kfo)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Discovery due by 5/6/2022. Pretrial Motions due by 6/6/2022. Proposed Pretrial Order due to Court by 9/21/2022. (kfo)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Order by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Telephonic Status Conference set for 3/1/2022 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. The parties shall call the AT&T Conference line at (888) 398-2342 [Access Code 2418431] to connect to the proceedings. (kfo)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
November 4, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Legacy Mills, LLC Rule 26 Disclosures (Valdez, John)
November 2, 2021 Filing 11 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Martha Vazquez as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
October 29, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Surety Corporation Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures of Defendant (Anderson, Jennifer)
October 29, 2021 Filing 9 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by National Surety Corporation (Anderson, Jennifer)
October 22, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that this matter will be reassigned to a district judge as the trial judge if written consents from all parties have not been filed by November 1, 2021. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (gbg)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
October 18, 2021 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by National Surety Corporation (Anderson, Jennifer)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Joint Status Report due by 10/29/2021. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/10/2021 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 10/21/2021. (kfo)
September 29, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by National Surety Corporation (Anderson, Jennifer)
September 29, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by National Surety Corporation. (Anderson, Jennifer)
September 28, 2021 Filing 3 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number ANMDC-7914288 re #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by National Surety Corporation from Fourth Judicial District Court, case number D-412-CV-2021-00236. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by National Surety Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A)(Anderson, Jennifer) filed by National Surety Corporation. (cmm)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
September 28, 2021 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
September 28, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by National Surety Corporation from Fourth Judicial District Court, case number D-412-CV-2021-00236. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by National Surety Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Anderson, Jennifer)
September 28, 2021 United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (arp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Legacy Mills, LLC v. National Surety Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Legacy Mills, LLC
Represented By: John Paul Valdez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Surety Corporation
Represented By: Mia Kern Lardy
Represented By: Jennifer G. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?