United States of America for the use of Sierra Canyon Construction, LLC v. Markel Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: United States of America for the use of Sierra Canyon Construction, LLC
Defendant: Markel Insurance Company and Siemens Energy, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00974
Filed: October 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Paul Kelly
Referring Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40 U.S.C. ยง 270
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2021 Filing 16 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by United States of America for the use of Sierra Canyon Construction, LLC (Simons, Quinn)
December 3, 2021 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Markel Insurance Company of Markel's Initial Disclosures (Thomas, Jackson)
December 1, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE by Siemens Energy, Inc. Of Certification of Good Standing of Associated Counsel Robert L. Joyce (Russell, Nicole)
December 1, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE by Siemens Energy, Inc. of Certification of Good Standing of Associated Counsel Eric J. Goldberg (Russell, Nicole)
December 1, 2021 Filing 12 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Siemens Energy, Inc. by Nicole T. Russell on behalf of: Robert L. Joyce Littleton Park Joyce Ughetta & Kelly LLP 4 Manhattanville Road, Suite 202Purchase, NY 10577 914-417-3400 Fax 914-417-3401 robert.joyce@littletonpark.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Russell, Nicole)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 1, 2021 Filing 11 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Siemens Energy, Inc. by Nicole T. Russell on behalf of: Eric J. Goldberg Littleton Park Joyce Ughetta & Kelly LLP 39 Broadway, 29th FloorNew York, NY 10006 212-404-5777 Fax 212-232-0088 Eric.goldberg@littletonpark.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Russell, Nicole)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 1, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Siemens Energy, Inc.. (Russell, Nicole)
December 1, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-8013998 re: # 11 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Siemens Energy, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Russell, Nicole)
December 1, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-8014059 re: # 12 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Siemens Energy, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Russell, Nicole)
November 23, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher R Ward on behalf of Markel Insurance Company (Ward, Christopher)
November 23, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Phillip W Pemberton on behalf of Markel Insurance Company (Thomas, Jackson) Modified text on 11/23/2021 change the filed by Attorney name. Advised attorney's assistant not to refile. But all future documents should be filed with Mr. Pemberton's account (gr).
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Joint Status Report due by 12/3/2021. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 12/14/2021 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. (kfo)
October 29, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Markel Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Markel Corporation for Markel Insurance Company. (Thomas, Jackson)
October 29, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Markel Insurance Company. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by United States of America for the use of Sierra Canyon Construction, LLC.(Thomas, Jackson)
October 13, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America for the use of Sierra Canyon Construction, LLC. Markel Insurance Company served on 10/8/2021, answer due 10/29/2021. (Simons, Quinn)
October 8, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America for the use of Sierra Canyon Construction, LLC. Siemens Energy, Inc. served on 10/7/2021, answer due 10/28/2021. (Simons, Thomas)
October 6, 2021 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (dr)
October 5, 2021 Filing 2 Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number ANMDC-7926102 re #1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by United States of America, for the use of Sierra Canyon Construction, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit G)(Simons, Quinn) filed by United States of America for the use of Sierra Canyon Construction, LLC. (cmm)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
October 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by United States of America, for the use of Sierra Canyon Construction, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G)(Simons, Quinn)
October 5, 2021 United States Circuit Judge Paul Kelly, Jr and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (dr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America for the use of Sierra Canyon Construction, LLC v. Markel Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America for the use of Sierra Canyon Construction, LLC
Represented By: Quinn Scott Simons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Markel Insurance Company
Represented By: Jackson Thomas
Represented By: Christopher R Ward
Represented By: Phillip Pemberton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Siemens Energy, Inc.
Represented By: Nicole T. Russell
Represented By: Eric Jay Goldberg
Represented By: Robert L Joyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?