OptumCare Management, LLC v. Grenemyer
Plaintiff: OptumCare Management, LLC
Defendant: Timothy Grenemyer
Case Number: 1:2021cv00982
Filed: October 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: Gregory J Fouratt
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2021 Filing 9 FINAL NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT: This matter will be reassigned to a district judge as the trial judge if written consents from all parties have not been filed by December 17, 2021. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (gbg)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] Modified on 11/30/2021 (cfa).
November 29, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE by OptumCare Management, LLC re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM of Parties' Agreed Extension of Briefing Deadlines (Burris, Eric)
November 24, 2021 Filing 7 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), OptumCare Management, LLC voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Burris, Eric)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
November 12, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Because a dispositive motion has been filed in this case, the parties are reminded, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that this matter will be reassigned to a district judge as the trial judge if written consents from all parties have not been filed by November 29, 2021. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (gbg)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
November 11, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Timothy Grenemyer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (Jackson, Travis)
October 18, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by OptumCare Management, LLC. Timothy Grenemyer served on 10/11/2021, answer due 11/1/2021. (Burris, Eric)
October 8, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by OptumCare Management, LLC (Burris, Eric)
October 8, 2021 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
October 8, 2021 Summonses Issued as to Timothy Grenemyer to three different addresses. (arp) Modified on 10/8/2021 (arp).
October 8, 2021 United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (arp)
October 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Breach of Contract and Unjust Enrichment against Timothy Grenemyer ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by OptumCare Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Burris, Eric)
October 7, 2021 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7931242 re #1 Complaint filed by OptumCare Management, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Burris, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OptumCare Management, LLC v. Grenemyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OptumCare Management, LLC
Represented By: Eric R. Burris
Represented By: Debashree Nandy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Grenemyer
Represented By: Kara Shair-Rosenfield
Represented By: Sarah K Downey
Represented By: Travis G Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?