D'Antonio et al v. New Mexico Corrections Department et al
Plaintiff: Michael D'Antonio and Nikki Lawrie
Defendant: New Mexico Corrections Department, Centene Corporation, MHM Health Professionals, LLC, Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC, David Udero, Natalia Hudson, Sheri Pierce, Jose G. Andrade-Barraza and "Jane" Hudson
Case Number: 1:2021cv01027
Filed: October 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: James O Browning
Referring Judge: Gregory B Wormuth
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2021 Filing 36 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Michael D'Antonio re #27 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Surreply filed by Michael D'Antonio (Walker, Samuel)
December 16, 2021 Filing 35 REPLY to Response to Motion re #27 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Surreply filed by Michael D'Antonio. (Walker, Samuel)
December 13, 2021 Filing 34 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Sheri Pierce. (Lueras, Taylor)
December 13, 2021 Filing 33 RESPONSE in Opposition re #27 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Surreply filed by Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC. (Lueras, Taylor)
December 9, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC re #12 MOTION for Reconsideration for Portions of the October 5, 2021 Order Granting in Part Plaintiff's Motion to Compel filed by Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC (Lueras, Taylor)
December 9, 2021 Filing 31 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION for Reconsideration for Portions of the October 5, 2021 Order Granting in Part Plaintiff's Motion to Compel filed by Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC. (Lueras, Taylor)
December 6, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE by Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC re #12 MOTION for Reconsideration for Portions of the October 5, 2021 Order Granting in Part Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Extension of Time to File Reply (Lueras, Taylor)
November 29, 2021 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael D'Antonio. Sheri Pierce served on 11/23/2021, answer due 12/14/2021. (Walker, Samuel)
November 29, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE by Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC to File Reply Brief (Lueras, Taylor)
November 29, 2021 Filing 27 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by Michael D'Antonio. (Walker, Samuel)
November 24, 2021 Filing 26 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC. (Lueras, Taylor)
November 24, 2021 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC (Lueras, Taylor)
November 24, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT as to document #6 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), #4 Certificate of Service by Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC (Lueras, Taylor)
November 23, 2021 Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Answer to Second Amended Complaint by New Mexico Corrections Department, David Udero. (Sivage, Mariposa)
November 23, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT as to document #5 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by New Mexico Corrections Department, David Udero (Sivage, Mariposa)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by District Judge James O. Browning granting #10 Unopposed Motion to Seal or Withdraw and Refile Pleadings with Redactions (bap)
November 22, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC re #16 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC (Lueras, Taylor)
November 22, 2021 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #16 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Lueras, Taylor)
November 22, 2021 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Michael D'Antonio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Med. Record (Prog Note) 11-10-18 v1, #2 Exhibit Med. Record (Prog Note) 11-10-18 v2, #3 Exhibit Excerpts Depo. Hudson, #4 Exhibit Excerpts Depo. Guzman, #5 Exhibit Med. Record (On Call Checklist) 11-10-18, #6 Exhibit Call for Service Detail Rpt 11-10-18, #7 Exhibit Email from TL to SW 10-21-21, #8 Exhibit Email Resp SW to TL 10-21-21, #9 Exhibit Email Reply TL to SW 10-25-21, #10 Exhibit Staffing Actual v Contract 2017) (Walker, Samuel)
November 22, 2021 Summons Issued as to Sheri Pierce. (dr)
November 19, 2021 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION to Extend (other) Page Limits for Reply to Motion for Protective Order by Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC. (Lueras, Taylor)
November 19, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Protective Order by Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Lueras, Taylor)
November 19, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT as to document #3 Motion for Protective Order by Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC (Lueras, Taylor)
November 16, 2021 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC Fourth Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Production (Lueras, Taylor)
November 16, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION for Reconsideration for Portions of the October 5, 2021 Order Granting in Part Plaintiff's Motion to Compel filed by Michael D'Antonio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Hearing Transcript, #2 Exhibit FTR Log) (Walker, Samuel)
November 16, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Reconsideration for Portions of the October 5, 2021 Order Granting in Part Plaintiff's Motion to Compel by Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Lueras, Taylor)
November 15, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE by Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC of Extension to File Reply to Doc 7 (Lueras, Taylor)
November 10, 2021 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION to Seal or Withdraw and Refile Pleadings with Redactions by Nikki Lawrie. (Hart, F)
November 5, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC Third Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Production (Lueras, Taylor) Modified text on 11/8/2021 (bap).
November 5, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE by Michael D'Antonio (Walker, Samuel)
October 29, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Jose G. Andrade-Barraza, Centene Corporation, Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC, "Jane" Hudson, MHM Health Professionals, LLC. (Lueras, Taylor)
October 29, 2021 Filing 5 (Withdrawn) per doc. 22 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Second Amended Complaint by New Mexico Corrections Department, David Udero. (Sivage, Mariposa) Modified text on 11/24/2021 (bap).
October 25, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC Responses to Plaintiff's Third Requests for Production (Lueras, Taylor)
October 25, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Protective Order for Plaintiff's Requests for Production Numbers 71, 72 and 73 by Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Lueras, Taylor)
October 22, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE by Jose G. Andrade-Barraza, Centene Corporation, Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC, Natalia Hudson, MHM Health Professionals, LLC of Filing State Court Record (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Lueras, Taylor)
October 22, 2021 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7955158 re 1 Notice of Removal,, filed by MHM Health Professionals, LLC, Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC, Centene Corporation, Jose G. Andrade-Barraza, "Jane" Hudson, R.N. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Lueras, Taylor)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D'Antonio et al v. New Mexico Corrections Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael D'Antonio
Represented By: Kari E. Brandenburg
Represented By: Mark Dinelli
Represented By: Samuel H Walker
Represented By: Mark Peter Dinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nikki Lawrie
Represented By: F Michael Hart
Represented By: Julio C. Romero
Represented By: Kelly A. Stout Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Mexico Corrections Department
Represented By: Mariposa Padilla Sivage
Represented By: Noe Astorga-Corral
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centene Corporation
Represented By: Taylor M. Lueras
Represented By: Alfred A Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MHM Health Professionals, LLC
Represented By: Alfred A Park
Represented By: Taylor M. Lueras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC
Represented By: Alfred A Park
Represented By: Taylor M. Lueras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Udero
Represented By: Noe Astorga-Corral
Represented By: Mariposa Padilla Sivage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natalia Hudson
Represented By: Alfred A Park
Represented By: Taylor M. Lueras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheri Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose G. Andrade-Barraza
Represented By: Alfred A Park
Represented By: Taylor M. Lueras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: "Jane" Hudson
Represented By: Alfred A Park
Represented By: Taylor M. Lueras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?