Mackin v. OM Sai Corporation
Plaintiff: ASHLEIGH MACKIN
Defendant: OM SAI CORPORATION, OM 2000 Corp., Galisteo Street Inc, Loretto Hotel Investment, LLC, Zia Santa Fe LLC, Sage Concept, LLC, JP Taos LLC, Las Cruces Hotel LP, Hotel St Francis, Sangre de Cristo Hotel Investment LLC and Second Wind Partners Inc
Case Number: 1:2021cv01052
Filed: November 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: John F Robbenhaar
Referring Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 PRAECIPE by Ashleigh Mackin (Gillespie, Tristan)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 PRAECIPE by Ashleigh Mackin (Gillespie, Tristan)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 PRAECIPE by Ashleigh Mackin (Gillespie, Tristan)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 PRAECIPE by Ashleigh Mackin (Gillespie, Tristan)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 PRAECIPE by Ashleigh Mackin (Gillespie, Tristan)
December 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MOTION for Entry of Default as to HOTEL ST FRANCIS by Ashleigh Mackin. (Gillespie, Tristan)
December 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MOTION for Entry of Default as to LAS CRUCES HOTEL LP by Ashleigh Mackin. (Gillespie, Tristan)
December 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MOTION for Entry of Default as to JP TAOS LLC by Ashleigh Mackin. (Gillespie, Tristan)
December 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Sage Concept, LLC by Ashleigh Mackin. (Gillespie, Tristan)
December 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MOTION for Entry of Default by Ashleigh Mackin. (Gillespie, Tristan)
December 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ashleigh Mackin. (Gillespie, Tristan)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by Ashleigh Mackin (Gillespie, Tristan)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by Ashleigh Mackin (Gillespie, Tristan)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to GALISTEO STREET INC by Ashleigh Mackin (Gillespie, Tristan)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea denying #7 Motion for Refund of Filing Fees. (atc)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Corporate Disclosure Statement by OM 2000 Corp. (Leavitt, Lindsay)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Corporate Disclosure Statement by OM Sai Corporation (Leavitt, Lindsay)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint, by OM 2000 Corp..(Leavitt, Lindsay)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint, by OM Sai Corporation.(Leavitt, Lindsay)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Second Wind Partners Inc (a New Mexico Corporation) by Ashleigh Mackin (Gillespie, Tristan)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE by OM 2000 Corp. "Notice of Service of Offer of Judgment" (Leavitt, Lindsay)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE by OM Sai Corporation "Notice of Service of Offer Of Judgment" (Leavitt, Lindsay)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay Gordon Leavitt on behalf of OM 2000 Corp. (Leavitt, Lindsay)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay Gordon Leavitt on behalf of OM Sai Corporation (Leavitt, Lindsay)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ashleigh Mackin. OM Sai Corporation served on 11/20/2021, answer due 12/13/2021. (Gillespie, Tristan) Modified on 12/7/2021 (arp).
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ashleigh Mackin. Las Cruces Hotel LP served on 11/22/2021, answer due 12/13/2021. (Gillespie, Tristan) Modified on 12/7/2021 (arp).
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ashleigh Mackin. Hotel St Francis served on 11/23/2021, answer due 12/14/2021. (Gillespie, Tristan) Modified on 12/7/2021 (arp).
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ashleigh Mackin. OM 2000 Corp. served on 11/20/2021, answer due 12/13/2021. (Gillespie, Tristan) Modified on 12/7/2021 (arp).
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ashleigh Mackin. Loretto Hotel Investment, LLC served on 11/23/2021, answer due 12/14/2021. (Gillespie, Tristan) Modified on 12/7/2021 (arp).
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ashleigh Mackin. Galisteo Street Inc served on 11/19/2021, answer due 12/10/2021. (Gillespie, Tristan) Modified on 12/7/2021 (arp).
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ashleigh Mackin. JP Taos LLC served on 11/19/2021, answer due 12/10/2021. (Gillespie, Tristan) Modified on 12/7/2021 (arp).
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ashleigh Mackin. Sage Concept, LLC served on 11/19/2021, answer due 12/10/2021. (Gillespie, Tristan) Modified on 12/7/2021 (arp).
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Settlement with SECOND WIND PARTNERS INC by Ashleigh Mackin (Gillespie, Tristan)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 **FILED IN ERROR** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ashleigh Mackin. Second Wind Partners Inc served on 11/19/2021, answer due 12/10/2021. (Gillespie, Tristan) Modified on 12/3/2021 (arp).
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 **FILED IN ERROR** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ashleigh Mackin. Sage Concept, LLC served on 11/19/2021, answer due 12/10/2021. (Gillespie, Tristan) Modified on 12/3/2021 (arp).
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 **FILED IN ERROR** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ashleigh Mackin. JP Taos LLC served on 11/19/2021, answer due 12/10/2021. (Gillespie, Tristan) Modified on 12/3/2021 (arp).
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 **FILED IN ERROR** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ashleigh Mackin. Galisteo Street Inc served on 11/19/2021, answer due 12/10/2021. (Gillespie, Tristan) Modified on 12/3/2021 (arp).
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 **FILED IN ERROR** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ashleigh Mackin. Loretto Hotel Investment, LLC served on 11/23/2021, answer due 12/14/2021. (Gillespie, Tristan) Modified on 12/3/2021 (arp).
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 **FILED IN ERROR** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ashleigh Mackin. OM Sai Corporation served on 11/20/2021, answer due 12/13/2021. (Gillespie, Tristan) Modified on 12/3/2021 (arp).
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 **FILED IN ERROR** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ashleigh Mackin. OM 2000 Corp. served on 11/20/2021, answer due 12/13/2021. (Gillespie, Tristan) Modified on 12/3/2021 (arp).
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 **FILED IN ERROR** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ashleigh Mackin. Hotel St Francis served on 11/23/2021, answer due 12/14/2021. (Gillespie, Tristan) Modified on 12/3/2021 (arp).
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 **FILED IN ERROR** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ashleigh Mackin. Las Cruces Hotel LP served on 11/22/2021, answer due 12/13/2021. (Gillespie, Tristan) Modified on 12/3/2021 (arp).
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 **FILED IN ERROR** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ashleigh Mackin. Zia Santa Fe LLC served on 11/23/2021, answer due 12/14/2021. (Gillespie, Tristan) Modified on 12/3/2021 (arp).
November 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for refund of filing fees paid online via Pay.gov RE: Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7973635 re #1 Complaint filed by Ashleigh Mackin (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Gillespie, Tristan) by Ashleigh Mackin. (Gillespie, Tristan)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Danoff on behalf of Ashleigh Mackin (Danoff, Ryan)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to All Defendants on Amended Complaint. (dr)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against OM 2000 Corp., Loretto Hotel Investment, LLC, Sangre de Cristo Hotel Investment LLC, Hotel St Francis, Zia Santa Fe LLC, Galisteo Street Inc, OM Sai Corporation, Second Wind Partners Inc, JP Taos LLC, Sage Concept, LLC, Las Cruces Hotel LP., filed by Ashleigh Mackin. (Gillespie, Tristan)
November 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 *FILED IN ERROR* AMENDED COMPLAINT against OM Sai Corporation., filed by Ashleigh Mackin. (Gillespie, Tristan) Wrong case number. Modified on 11/12/2021 (arp).
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Chief United States District Judge William P. Johnson, all documents for each of the consolidated cases shall be filed only in this case: Mackin v. OM SAI Corporation, 1:21-cv-01052-JFR-KRS (ng)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to OM Sai Corporation. (arp)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar and United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea assigned. (arp)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7973635 re #1 Complaint filed by Ashleigh Mackin (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Gillespie, Tristan)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against OM SAI CORPORATION ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by ASHLEIGH MACKIN. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gillespie, Tristan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mackin v. OM Sai Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASHLEIGH MACKIN
Represented By: Tristan Wade Gillespie
Represented By: Brett J. Danoff
Represented By: Ryan Danoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OM SAI CORPORATION
Represented By: Lindsay Gordon Leavitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OM 2000 Corp.
Represented By: Lindsay Gordon Leavitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Galisteo Street Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loretto Hotel Investment, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zia Santa Fe LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sage Concept, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Taos LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Cruces Hotel LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hotel St Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sangre de Cristo Hotel Investment LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Second Wind Partners Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?