Unitednet, Ltd. et al v. Tata Communications America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Levi Russell and Unitednet Ltd.
Defendant: Tata Communications America, Inc., Tata Communications India, Tata Sons Private, Ltd., Steven Lucero and LatinGroup, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv01081
Filed: November 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kea W Riggs
Referring Judge: John F Robbenhaar
2 Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346 Tort Claim
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Tata Communications India re #34 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Tata Communications India (Waleko, Alexandra)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Tata Sons Private, Ltd. re #33 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Tata Sons Private, Ltd. (Waleko, Alexandra)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 RESPONSE in Opposition re #51 MOTION for Hearing re #42 MOTION for Reconsideration re #28 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, filed by Tata Communications America, Inc.. (Nandy, Debashree)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MOTION for Hearing re #42 MOTION for Reconsideration re #28 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, by Levi Russell, Unitednet Ltd.. (Fuqua, Scott)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Levi Russell, Unitednet Ltd. re #42 MOTION for Reconsideration re #28 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, filed by Unitednet Ltd., Levi Russell (Fuqua, Scott)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 REPLY to Response to Motion re #34 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Tata Communications India. (Waleko, Alexandra)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 REPLY to Response to Motion re #33 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Tata Sons Private, Ltd.. (Waleko, Alexandra)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 REPLY to Response to Motion re #42 MOTION for Reconsideration re #28 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, filed by Levi Russell, Unitednet Ltd.. (Fuqua, Scott)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE by Tata Communications India, Tata Sons Private, Ltd. of Agreed Extension for Replies in Support of their Motions to Dismiss (Waleko, Alexandra)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 RESPONSE in Opposition re #42 MOTION for Reconsideration re #28 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, filed by LatinGroup, LLC, Steven Lucero. (Park, Alfred)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 RESPONSE in Opposition re #42 MOTION for Reconsideration re #28 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, filed by Tata Communications America, Inc.. (Nandy, Debashree)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 RESPONSE in Opposition re #34 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #33 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Levi Russell, Unitednet Ltd.. (Fuqua, Scott)
June 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MOTION for Reconsideration re #28 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, by Levi Russell, Unitednet Ltd.. (Fuqua, Scott)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 REPLY to Plaintiff's re #31 Response to Order to Show Cause, #28 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, filed by Tata Communications India. (Waleko, Alexandra)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 REPLY to Plaintiffs' re #31 Response to Order to Show Cause, #28 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, filed by Tata Sons Private, Ltd.. (Waleko, Alexandra)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 REPLY to Plaintiff's Response to Court's Order to Show Cause Why This Action Should Not be Dismissed for Forum Non Conveniens re #28 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, filed by LatinGroup, LLC, Steven Lucero. (Park, Alfred)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra Waleko on behalf of Tata Communications India, Tata Sons Private, Ltd. (Waleko, Alexandra)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra Waleko on behalf of Tata Communications India, Tata Sons Private, Ltd. (Waleko, Alexandra)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants Tata Communications India, Tata Sons Private, Ltd. by Alexandra Waleko on behalf of: Randall L. Morrison, Jr. Kelley Drye & Warren LLP 3 World Trade Center, 175 Greenwich StNew York, NY 10007 212-808-7800 Fax 202-808-7897 rmorrison@kelleydrye.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Waleko, Alexandra)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants Tata Communications India, Tata Sons Private, Ltd. by Alexandra Waleko on behalf of: Philip D. Robben Kelley Drye & Warren LLP 3 World Trade Center, 175 Greenwich StNew York, NY 10007 212-808-7800 Fax 202-808-7897 probben@kelleydrye.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Waleko, Alexandra)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Tata Communications India. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Anirban Deb Ray) (Waleko, Alexandra)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Tata Sons Private, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Suprakash Mukhopadhyay) (Waleko, Alexandra)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-8317041 re: # 35 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Tata Sons Private, Ltd., Tata Communications India (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Waleko, Alexandra)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-8317043 re: # 36 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Tata Sons Private, Ltd., Tata Communications India (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Waleko, Alexandra)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 RESPONSE re #31 Response to Order to Show Cause, #28 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, filed by Tata Communications America, Inc.. (Nandy, Debashree)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Levi Russell, Unitednet Ltd. (Fuqua, Scott)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE by LatinGroup, LLC, Steven Lucero Agreed Extenstion of Time to File Answer (Park, Alfred)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR SANCTIONS by District Judge Kea W. Riggs. Defendant, Tata Communications (America) Inc.'s #10 Motion Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 11 is DENIED. (ve)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kea W. Riggs. Defendant, Tata Communications (America) Inc.'s #8 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED as set forth in this Memorandum Opinion and Order. Defendant's dismissal from this case is subject to conditions set forth in this Memorandum Opinion and Order. Within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiffs shall show cause why the action should not be dismissed for forum non conveniens against the Non-Moving Defendants for similar reasons. Defendants shall file a reply within fourteen (14) days of Plaintiffs' response. (ve)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kea W. Riggs. Defendants' #4 Motion to Dismiss Based on Forum Non Coveniens is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (ve)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE by Tata Sons Private, Ltd. Amended Notice of Agreed Extension (Waleko, Alexandra)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE by Tata Communications India, Tata Sons Private, Ltd. of Agreed Extension (Waleko, Alexandra)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Tata Communications America, Inc. re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Tata Communications America, Inc. (Nandy, Debashree)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Tata Communications America, Inc. re #10 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Tata Communications America, Inc. (Nandy, Debashree)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by LatinGroup, LLC, Steven Lucero re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Based on Forum Non Conveniens filed by Steven Lucero, LatinGroup, LLC (Park, Alfred)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Based on Forum Non Conveniens filed by LatinGroup, LLC, Steven Lucero. (Park, Alfred)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Tata Communications America, Inc.. (Nandy, Debashree)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Levi Russell, Unitednet Ltd.. (Fuqua, Scott)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Based on Forum Non Conveniens filed by Levi Russell, Unitednet Ltd.. (Fuqua, Scott)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Levi Russell, Unitednet Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Fuqua, Scott)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 13. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER FINDING GOOD CAUSE TO DELAY SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. (kc)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Kea W. Riggs as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Alfred A Park on behalf of LatinGroup, LLC, Steven Lucero (Park, Alfred)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 10 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (atc)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Sanctions by Tata Communications America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Nandy, Debashree)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 BRIEF re #8 MOTION to Dismiss by Tata Communications America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Nandy, Debashree)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Tata Communications America, Inc.. (Nandy, Debashree)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE by Tata Communications America, Inc. Certificate of Good Standing of Katherine A. McNamara (Nandy, Debashree)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Tata Communications America, Inc. by Debashree Nandy on behalf of: Katherine A. McNamara Fraser Stryker PC LLO 500 Energy Plaza, 409 South 17th StreetOmaha, NE 68102 402-978-5371 kmcnamara@fraserstryker.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Nandy, Debashree)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Debashree Nandy on behalf of Tata Communications America, Inc. (Nandy, Debashree)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Based on Forum Non Conveniens by LatinGroup, LLC, Steven Lucero. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Park, Alfred)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-8100799 re: # 6 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Tata Communications America, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Nandy, Debashree)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to Tata Communications India, Tata Sons Private, Ltd.. (jg)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to LatinGroup, LLC, Steven Lucero, Tata Communications America, Inc.. (jg)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet by Unitednet Ltd. (Fuqua, Scott)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea and United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (arp)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Levi Russell, Unitednet Ltd.. (Fuqua, Scott)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7980001 re #1 Complaint filed by Unitednet Ltd., Levi Russell (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Fuqua, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Unitednet, Ltd. et al v. Tata Communications America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Levi Russell
Represented By: Scott Fuqua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unitednet Ltd.
Represented By: Scott Fuqua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tata Communications America, Inc.
Represented By: Debashree Nandy
Represented By: Katherine A McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tata Communications India
Represented By: Alexandra Waleko
Represented By: Nelson Franse
Represented By: Philip D Robben
Represented By: Randall L. Morrison, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tata Sons Private, Ltd.
Represented By: Alexandra Waleko
Represented By: Nelson Franse
Represented By: Philip D Robben
Represented By: Randall L. Morrison, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Lucero
Represented By: Alfred A Park
Represented By: Douglas D. Janicik
Represented By: Karl M. Tilleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LatinGroup, LLC
Represented By: Alfred A Park
Represented By: Douglas D. Janicik
Represented By: Karl M. Tilleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?