Clark et al v. Haaland et al
Plaintiff: Guy Clark, Linda Corwin, Craig Corwin, Richard Jones, Wesley Hanchett, Michael Wright and San Juan Agricultural Water Users Association
Defendant: Deb Haaland, Camille C Touton, Martha Williams, Rudy Shebala, David Zeller, John D'Antonio and Rolf Schmidt-Petersen
Case Number: 1:2021cv01091
Filed: November 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Referring Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ERRATA re #1 Complaint, by Guy Clark, Craig Corwin, Linda Corwin, Wesley Hanchett, Richard Jones, San Juan Agricultural Water Users Association, Michael Wright (Marshall, Victor)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough granting #4 and #7 Motions for Extension of Time. Defendants John D'Antonio, Rolf Schmidt-Petersen, David Zeller, and Dr. Rudy Shebala shall have until 01/14/2022 to file their answers or other responsive pleadings. (cm)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Geenebah Michelle Brown-Yazzie on behalf of Rudy Shebala (Brown-Yazzie, Geenebah)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 Motion to Extend (other), #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Guy Clark, Craig Corwin, Linda Corwin, Wesley Hanchett, Richard Jones, San Juan Agricultural Water Users Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Marshall, Victor)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Alvina L Earnhart on behalf of David Zeller (Earnhart, Alvina)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Louis Irie Mallette, IV on behalf of Rudy Shebala (Mallette, Louis)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Rudy Shebala. (Searle, Jason)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Searle on behalf of Rudy Shebala (Searle, Jason)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough GRANTING IN PART #4 Motion for Extension of Time and ORDERING EXPEDITED BRIEFING. (cm)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Responsive Pleadings re #1 Complaint, by John D'Antonio, Rolf Schmidt-Petersen, David Zeller. (Bassett, Frances) Modified text to correct title of document on 12/2/2021 pursuant to phone call received by Frances Bassett (bap).
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to Deb Haaland, Rudy Shebala, Camille C Touton, Martha Williams, David Zeller. (dr)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to John D'Antonio, Rolf Schmidt-Petersen and U.S. Attorney General. (dr)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number ANMDC-7988939 (arp)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John D'Antonio, Deb Haaland, Rolf Schmidt-Petersen, Rudy Shebala, Camille C Touton, Martha Williams, David Zeller ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Michael Wright, Craig Corwin, San Juan Agricultural Water Users Assn, Linda Corwin, Guy Clark, Richard Jones, Wesley Hanchett. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Marshall, Victor)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (arp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark et al v. Haaland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guy Clark
Represented By: Victor R. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Corwin
Represented By: Victor R. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Corwin
Represented By: Victor R. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Jones
Represented By: Victor R. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley Hanchett
Represented By: Victor R. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Wright
Represented By: Victor R. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Juan Agricultural Water Users Association
Represented By: Victor R. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deb Haaland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camille C Touton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rudy Shebala
Represented By: Jason Searle
Represented By: Louis Irie Mallette, IV
Represented By: Geenebah Michelle Brown-Yazzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Zeller
Represented By: Frances C Bassett
Represented By: Alvina L Earnhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John D'Antonio
Represented By: Gregory C. Ridgley
Represented By: John W. Utton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rolf Schmidt-Petersen
Represented By: Arianne Singer
Represented By: John W. Utton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?