Rodriguez-Ortega et al v. Rich et al
Plaintiff: Jeremy Rodriguez-Ortega and Joshua Rodriguez
Defendant: David Rich, Kenneth Lucero and New Mexico Department of Health
Case Number: 1:2021cv01129
Filed: November 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Judith C Herrera
Referring Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
2 Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against All Defendants., filed by Jeremy Rodriguez-Ortega, Joshua Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Jeremy Rodriguez-Ortega Final SPB Decision, #2 Joshua Rodriguez Final SPB Decision)(Burke, Heather)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Joshua Rodriguez, Jeremy Rodriguez-Ortega. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6) (Burke, Heather)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. The parties' Stipulated Motion to Stay Discovery (Doc. 15) is granted. Discovery and a Rule 16 scheduling conference shall be stayed until the Court rules on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 8). (kmt)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Kenneth Lucero, New Mexico Department of Health, David Rich. (Ackermann, Laura)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER VACATING INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. The Telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference previously set for 1/4/2022 at 9:30 AM (Doc. 4) is vacated. If the parties seek a stay of discovery, they shall file a motion requesting such relief no later than 1/4/2022. (kmt)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Judith C. Herrera as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kenneth Lucero, New Mexico Department of Health, David Rich Initial Disclosures (Ackermann, Laura)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Kenneth Lucero, New Mexico Department of Health, David Rich (Ackermann, Laura)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough granting #7 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (cm)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE by Joshua Rodriguez, Jeremy Rodriguez-Ortega re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Extension of Time for Plaintiffs' Response (Burke, Heather)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Kenneth Lucero, New Mexico Department of Health, David Rich. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit) (Ackermann, Laura)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages to Motion to Dismiss by Kenneth Lucero, New Mexico Department of Health, David Rich. (Ackermann, Laura)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE by Kenneth Lucero, New Mexico Department of Health, David Rich Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (Ackermann, Laura)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 **FILED IN ERROR** NOTICE by Kenneth Lucero, New Mexico Department of Health, David Rich Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (Ackermann, Laura) Attorney called stating that Doc 5 was filed inaccurately. Modified on 12/1/2021 (bp).
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Counsel are to meet and confer by 12/14/2021. The parties' Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan is due by 12/23/2021. A Telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference is set for 1/4/2022 at 09:30 AM before Judge Khalsa. Counsel are to call Judge Khalsa's AT&T conference line at (877) 848-7030 and enter the code 7324132 to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 12/28/2021. (kmt)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number SF003418 re #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kenneth Lucero, David Rich, New Mexico Department of Health from First Judicial District Court, case number D-101-CV-2021-02211. ( Filing Fee - Deliver Payment), filed by Kenneth Lucero, David Rich, New Mexico Department of Health. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Maynes, Paula) filed by David Rich, New Mexico Department of Health, Kenneth Lucero. (gr)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kenneth Lucero, David Rich, New Mexico Department of Health from First Judicial District Court, case number D-101-CV-2021-02211. ( Filing Fee - Deliver Payment), filed by Kenneth Lucero, David Rich, New Mexico Department of Health. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Maynes, Paula)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough and United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez-Ortega et al v. Rich et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Rodriguez-Ortega
Represented By: Heather C. Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Rodriguez
Represented By: Heather C. Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Rich
Represented By: Alexander William Tucker
Represented By: Laura Renee Ackermann
Represented By: Paula Grace Maynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Lucero
Represented By: Alexander William Tucker
Represented By: Laura Renee Ackermann
Represented By: Paula Grace Maynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Mexico Department of Health
Represented By: Alexander William Tucker
Represented By: Laura Renee Ackermann
Represented By: Paula Grace Maynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?