Cornelsen et al v. Los Pinones Evergreen SPE, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Cynthia Diane Cornelsen, Kale Blackmon, Matthew W Horn, Sherrod L Maxwell, III and Elizario L Romero
Defendant: Los Pinones Evergreen SPE, LLC, Virtu Investments, LLC and Virtu Los Piones Associates, LP
Case Number: 1:2021cv01214
Filed: December 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: John F Robbenhaar
Referring Judge: Margaret I Strickland
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by District Judge Margaret I. Strickland denying #10 Motion for Attorney Fees. (tms)
January 27, 2022 Filing 14 Acknowledgment of received remand documents on 1/20/22 by First Judicial District Court. (bc)
January 26, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Cynthia Diane Cornelsen re #10 Opposed MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Cynthia Diane Cornelsen (Aucoin, M.)
January 25, 2022 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 Opposed MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Los Pinones Evergreen SPE, LLC, Virtu Investments, LLC, Virtu Los Piones Associates, LP. (Hoffman, Stephen)
January 14, 2022 Filing 11 Letter to the First Judicial District Court, re: Remand (yc)
January 13, 2022 Filing 10 Opposed MOTION for Attorney Fees by Cynthia Diane Cornelsen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Invoice for Attorney Fees) (Aucoin, M.)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF REMAND by District Judge Margaret I. Strickland. It is ORDERED that all claims in this action are REMANDED to the First Judicial District Court, County of Santa Fe, State of New Mexico. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to take the necessary actions to remand the case. (tms)
January 11, 2022 Filing 8 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Margaret I. Strickland as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
January 10, 2022 Filing 7 Defendants' RESPONSE re #6 Order to Show Cause filed by Los Pinones Evergreen SPE, LLC, Virtu Investments, LLC, Virtu Los Piones Associates, LP. (Hoffman, Stephen)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Show Cause Response due by 1/10/2022. (kc)
December 23, 2021 Filing 5 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Notice of Removal,, Civil Cover Sheet by Los Pinones Evergreen SPE, LLC, Virtu Investments, LLC, Virtu Los Piones Associates, LP (Hoffman, Stephen)
December 23, 2021 Filing 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
December 23, 2021 United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa and United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (dr)
December 22, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE by Los Pinones Evergreen SPE, LLC, Virtu Investments, LLC, Virtu Los Piones Associates, LP re #1 Notice of Removal,, Notice of Service of Notice of Removal on Plaintiffs' Counsel (Hoffman, Stephen)
December 22, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Virtu Los Piones Associates, LP, Virtu Investments, LLC, Los Pinones Evergreen SPE, LLC from State of New Mexico First Judicial District, case number D-101-CV-2021-00931. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Virtu Los Piones Associates, LP, Virtu Investments, LLC, Los Pinones Evergreen SPE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Individual Defendants Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit C - Order Granting Individual Defendants Motion to Dismiss, #4 Exhibit D - Mediation Confirmation Letter)(Hoffman, Stephen)
December 22, 2021 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-8046355 re #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Los Pinones Evergreen SPE, LLC, Virtu Los Piones Associates, LP, Virtu Investments, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Hoffman, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cornelsen et al v. Los Pinones Evergreen SPE, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Diane Cornelsen
Represented By: M. Michelle Aucoin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kale Blackmon
Represented By: M. Michelle Aucoin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew W Horn
Represented By: M. Michelle Aucoin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherrod L Maxwell, III
Represented By: M. Michelle Aucoin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizario L Romero
Represented By: M. Michelle Aucoin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Pinones Evergreen SPE, LLC
Represented By: Stephen D Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virtu Investments, LLC
Represented By: Stephen D Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virtu Los Piones Associates, LP
Represented By: Stephen D Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?