Mathis v. Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Eugenio Mathis
Defendant: Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC, MHM Health Professionals Inc, Lovelace Health System LLC, Gary French, Murray Young, James Bradley, Vesta Sandoval, Ellen Whittman, Erin Forsberg, John Gay, David Selvage, Vicki Bowers, FNU Archuleta, FNU Palomino, FNU Abate, Anthony Martinez, FNU Ortiz, Control Officer Day Shift L Pod, Dr. Doe 1-2 Doctors and Estate of James Bradley
Case Number: 1:2022cv00020
Filed: January 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Referring Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Summons on Amended Complaint Issued as to John Gay, Anthony Martinez, FNU Palomino. (jg)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ANSWER to #2 Amended Complaint, by Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC, Erin Forsberg, Gary French, MHM Health Professionals Inc.(Lueras, Taylor)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor M. Lueras on behalf of Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC, Erin Forsberg, Gary French, MHM Health Professionals Inc (Lueras, Taylor)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eugenio Mathis. (Piazza, Elizabeth)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Eugenio Mathis (Piazza, Elizabeth)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eugenio Mathis. Lovelace Health System LLC served on 2/3/2022, answer due 2/24/2022. (Piazza, Elizabeth)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eugenio Mathis. MHM Health Professionals Inc served on 2/2/2022, answer due 2/23/2022. (Piazza, Elizabeth)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eugenio Mathis. Vicki Bowers served on 2/4/2022, answer due 2/25/2022. (Piazza, Elizabeth)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eugenio Mathis. David Selvage served on 2/4/2022, answer due 2/25/2022. (Piazza, Elizabeth)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eugenio Mathis. Erin Forsberg served on 2/3/2022, answer due 2/24/2022. (Piazza, Elizabeth)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eugenio Mathis. Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC served on 2/2/2022, answer due 2/23/2022. (Piazza, Elizabeth)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eugenio Mathis. James Bradley served on 2/2/2022, answer due 2/23/2022. (Piazza, Elizabeth)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eugenio Mathis. Vesta Sandoval served on 2/2/2022, answer due 2/23/2022. (Piazza, Elizabeth)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eugenio Mathis. FNU Archuleta served on 2/3/2022, answer due 2/24/2022. (Piazza, Elizabeth)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to FNU Archuleta, Vicki Bowers, Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC, Estate of James Bradley, Erin Forsberg, Gary French, Lovelace Health System LLC, MHM Health Professionals Inc, Vesta Sandoval, David Selvage, Ellen Whittman, Murray Young. (dr)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants. adding Estate of James Bradley. terminating James Bradley (Dr. )., filed by Eugenio Mathis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13)(Piazza, Elizabeth)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Eugenio Mathis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Civil Cover Sheet)(Collins, Parrish)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-8064052 re #1 Complaint, filed by Eugenio Mathis (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Collins, Parrish)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa and United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea assigned. (dr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mathis v. Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugenio Mathis
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Piazza
Represented By: Julia H. Purdy
Represented By: Robert Gentile
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Represented By: Parrish Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC
Represented By: Alfred A Park
Represented By: Taylor M. Lueras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MHM Health Professionals Inc
Represented By: Alfred A Park
Represented By: Taylor M. Lueras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lovelace Health System LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary French
Represented By: Alfred A Park
Represented By: Taylor M. Lueras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murray Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vesta Sandoval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellen Whittman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin Forsberg
Represented By: Alfred A Park
Represented By: Taylor M. Lueras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Gay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Selvage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicki Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Archuleta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Palomino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Abate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Control Officer Day Shift L Pod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Doe 1-2 Doctors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of James Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?