State of Colorado, The v. Sunnyside Gold Corporation
Plaintiff: State of Colorado
Defendant: Sunnyside Gold Corporation
Case Number: 1:2022cv00046
Filed: January 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: William P Johnson
Referring Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 9601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2022 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson DENYING 1395 , in 1:18-md-02824-WJ, Motion for Briefing Schedule to Determine Pretrialthe Appropriateness of an Adverse Inference Instruction; DENYING 1396 , in 1:18-md-02824-WJ, Defendant Environmental Restoration, LLC's Motion for Severance or, in the Alternative, Motion for Protective Jury Instruction Re Spoliation of Evidence; and DENYING 1398 , in 1:18-md-02824-WJ, Weston Solutions, Inc.'s Motion for Separate Trials or in the Alternative a Curative Jury Instruction. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:22-cv-00046-WJ-KK (cmm)
March 10, 2022 Filing 34 JOINDER to (1499 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Weston Solutions, Inc. and Environmental Restoration LLC's Government Contractor Defense joined by Plaintiff Joanna McDaniel. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:22-cv-00046-WJ-KK (Trespel, Jeffrey)
March 10, 2022 Filing 33 JOINDER to (1455 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment REGARDING DEFENDANT ENVIRONMENTAL RESTORATION, LLC'S AMENDED DESIGNATION OF NONPARTIES AT FAULT UNDER COLO. REV. STAT. 13-21-111.5(3)(b) [DOC. NO. 169] joined by Plaintiff Joanna McDaniel. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:22-cv-00046-WJ-KK (Trespel, Jeffrey)
March 10, 2022 Filing 32 NOTICE of Completion of Briefing re (1444 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) MOTION to Quash or Motion for Protective Order Regarding Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition in a Civil Action and For the Production of Documents by Non-Party Berkeley Research Group, LLC by United States of America, Weston Solutions, Inc., Environmental Restoration, LLC. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:22-cv-00046-WJ-KK (Menicucci, Michael) Modified text on 3/10/2022 per M. Menicucci (cmm).
March 9, 2022 Filing 31 JOINDER to (1455 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment REGARDING DEFENDANT ENVIRONMENTAL RESTORATION, LLC'S AMENDED DESIGNATION OF NONPARTIES AT FAULT UNDER COLO. REV. STAT. 13-21-111.5(3)(b) [DOC. NO. 169] Environmental Restoration, LLC's Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs the State of New Mexico and New Mexico Environment Department's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Defendant Environmental Restoration, LLC's Amended Designation of Nonparties at Fault Under Colo. Rev. Stat.A713-21-111.5(3)(B) and Weston Solution's Joinder in Response joined by Defendants United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States of America. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:22-cv-00046-WJ-KK (Bain, John)
March 9, 2022 Filing 30 RESPONSE in Support re (854 in 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 463 in 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1444 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 418 in 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 638 in 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 25 in 1:22-cv-00046-WJ-KK, 737 in 1:18-cv-00319-WJ) MOTION to Quash or Motion for Protective Order Regarding Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition in a Civil Action and For the Production of Documents by Non-Party Berkeley Research Group, LLC filed by Non-Party Berkeley Research Group, LLC filed by Environmental Restoration, LLC, Weston Solutions, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:22-cv-00046-WJ-KK (Menicucci, Michael)
February 23, 2022 Filing 29 NOTICE by Joanna McDaniel re (1454 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) Response in Opposition to Motion McDaniel Plaintiffs' Notice of Joinder Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:22-cv-00046-WJ-KK (Trespel, Jeffrey)
February 18, 2022 Filing 28 CONSENT DECREE by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:22-cv-00046-WJ-KK (cmm)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson Granting (1439) Joint Motion to Approve Consent Judgment in case 1:18-md-02824-WJ; Granting (23) Joint Motion to Approve Consent Judgment in case 1:22-cv-00046-WJ-KK. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:22-cv-00046-WJ-KK (cmm)
February 10, 2022 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM in Support re (1444 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) MOTION to Quash or Motion for Protective Order Regarding Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition in a Civil Action and For the Production of Documents by Non-Party Berkeley Research Group, LLC filed by United States of America, Weston Solutions, Inc., Environmental Restoration, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:22-cv-00046-WJ-KK (Menicucci, Michael)
February 10, 2022 Filing 25 MOTION to Quash or Motion for Protective Order Regarding Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition in a Civil Action and For the Production of Documents by Non-Party Berkeley Research Group, LLC by United States of America, Weston Solutions, Inc., Environmental Restoration, LLC. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:22-cv-00046-WJ-KK (Menicucci, Michael)
February 8, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE by Joanna McDaniel re (1431 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) Brief, Notice of Joinder Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:22-cv-00046-WJ-KK (Trespel, Jeffrey)
January 31, 2022 Filing 23 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment by Sunnyside Gold Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Consent Decree, #2 Exhibit Public Notice, #3 Exhibit Bonita Peak CAG Comments, #4 Exhibit T Schillaci Public Comments, #5 Exhibit Wilkes Comments, #6 Exhibit JHW on BPMD Consent Decree, #7 Exhibit Bonita Peak Settlement Comment Letter, #8 Exhibit Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:22-cv-00046-WJ-KK (Westesen, Neil)
January 31, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE of Tag-Along Case by Chief United States District Judge William P. Johnson. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:22-cv-00046-WJ-KK (cmm)
January 31, 2022 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson DENYING (1114 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) Environmental Restoration's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' State Law Claims for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction and DENYING (1220 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) Weston's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment to Dismiss Tort Claims: (734 in 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 387 in 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY) Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:22-cv-00046-WJ-KK (cmm)
January 28, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael F. Menicucci on behalf of Environmental Restoration, LLC, United States of America, Weston Solutions, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:22-cv-00046-WJ-KK (Menicucci, Michael)
January 28, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States of America re (1395 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 614 in 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 443 in 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 825 in 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 715 in 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 396 in 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK) Opposed MOTION for Order re Rule 16 Pretrial Briefing Schedule filed by United States of America, United States Environmental Protection Agency Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:22-cv-00046-WJ-KK (Lai, Albert)
January 26, 2022 Filing 18 BRIEF re (1395 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) Opposed MOTION for Order re Rule 16 Pretrial Briefing Schedule Surreply in Opposition by Joe C Allen, Navajo Nation, State of New Mexico Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:22-cv-00046-WJ-KK (Walsh, Andrew)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson Granting (841) Motion for Leave to File Surreply in case 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF; Granting (628) Motion for Leave to File Surreply in case 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF; Granting (455) Motion for Leave to File Surreply in case 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY; Granting (1428) Motion for Leave to File Surreply in case 1:18-md-02824-WJ; Granting (729) Motion for Leave to File Surreply in case 1:18-cv-00319-WJ; Granting (410) Motion for Leave to File Surreply in case 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK; Granting (16) Motion for Leave to File Surreply in case 1:22-cv-00046-WJ-KK. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:22-cv-00046-WJ-KK (cmm)
January 25, 2022 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Surreply in Opposition to Dkt. 1395 by Joe C Allen, Navajo Nation, State of New Mexico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Proposed Surreply)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:22-cv-00046-WJ-KK (Walsh, Andrew)
January 25, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Weston Solutions, Inc. re (397 in 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 716 in 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 616 in 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 828 in 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 444 in 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1398 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) MOTION for Order Weston Solutions Inc.'s Motion for Separate Trials or in the Alternative a Curative Jury Instruction filed by Weston Solutions, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:22-cv-00046-WJ-KK (Wechsler, Jeffrey)
January 24, 2022 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re (397 in 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 716 in 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 616 in 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 828 in 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 444 in 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1398 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) MOTION for Order Weston Solutions Inc.'s Motion for Separate Trials or in the Alternative a Curative Jury Instruction filed by Weston Solutions, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:22-cv-00046-WJ-KK (Brooks, Kaleb)
January 20, 2022 Filing 13 Case transferred in from District of Colorado; Case Number 1:21-cv-03327. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 20, 2022 Filing 12 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring from the District of Colorado, 21-cv-3327 MEH, to the District of New Mexico, to become part of MDL 2824, by Clerk on 1/20/2022. (evana, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/20/2022.]
January 20, 2022 United States Chief District Judge William P. Johnson and United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (dr)
January 20, 2022 Case associated to lead case 1:18-md-02824-WJ. (ng)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #10 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/18/2022. Text Only Entry (pabsec, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/20/2022.]
January 11, 2022 Filing 10 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff State of Colorado, The All parties consent.. (Splitek, Mary) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/20/2022.]
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 15 December 2021. This matter comes before the Court sua sponte. Plaintiff has filed a Notice of Lodging of Proposed Consent Decree. ECF #6 . The parties have reached an agreement on a proposed consent decree, but pursuant to Section 122(d)(2) of CERCLA, the proposed consent decree is "subject to at least a 30-day public comment period." Id. at 2. In light of this, the Scheduling Conference set for February 22, 2022 and all associated deadlines (ECF #8 ) are vacated. However, the parties must still complete and file the Magistrate Judge Consent Form (ECF 3-1) and must do so on or before January 11, 2022. (cmadr, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/20/2022.]
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 14 December 2021. Consent Form due by 2/9/2022. Proposed Scheduling Order due 2/15/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 2/22/2022 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (cmadr, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/20/2022.]
December 14, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by State of Colorado, The. Sunnyside Gold Corporation waiver sent on 12/13/2021, answer due 2/11/2022. (Splitek, Mary) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/20/2022.]
December 13, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Lodging of Proposed Consent Decree by Plaintiff State of Colorado, The (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Consent Decree, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice and Opportunity for Public Comment)(Splitek, Mary) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/20/2022.]
December 13, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance Counsel for Sunnyside Gold Corporation by Christopher Clark Stoneback, I on behalf of Sunnyside Gold CorporationAttorney Christopher Clark Stoneback, I added to party Sunnyside Gold Corporation(pty:dft) (Stoneback, Christopher) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/20/2022.]
December 13, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jcharl, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/20/2022.]
December 13, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty Text Only Entry. (jcharl, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/20/2022.]
December 13, 2021 Filing 2 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:Mary Emily Splitek.Attorney or pro se has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, the filer must affix an electronic s/signature and s/followed by a typed, not an inked, signature to all future documents.(Text Only Entry) (jcharl, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/20/2022.]
December 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sunnyside Gold Corporation (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8221456)Attorney Mary Emily Splitek added to party State of Colorado(pty:pla), filed by State of Colorado. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Splitek, Mary) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/20/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Colorado, The v. Sunnyside Gold Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Colorado
Represented By: Mary Emily Splitek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunnyside Gold Corporation
Represented By: Christopher C. Stoneback
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?