Navajo Nation et al v. San Juan County, New Mexico et al
Plaintiff: Navajo Nation, Navajo Nation Human Rights Commission, Lorenzo Bates, Jonnye Kaibah Begay, Gloria Ann Dennison, Tracy Dee Raymond and Bessie Yazzie Werito
Defendant: San Juan County, New Mexico, San Juan County Board of Commissioners, John Beckstead, Terri Fortner, Steve Lanier, Michael Sullivan, GloJean Todacheene and Tanya Shelby
Case Number: 1:2022cv00095
Filed: February 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: James O Browning
Referring Judge: John F Robbenhaar
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2022 Filing 36 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 31. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER VACATING INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. All instructions, deadlines and hearings in the Initial Scheduling Order (Doc. 32) are VACATED. THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED. (kc)
April 1, 2022 Filing 34 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge James O. Browning as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
March 18, 2022 Filing 33 NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that this matter will be reassigned to a district judge as presiding judge if written consents from all parties have not been filed by March 30, 2022. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (rh)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Joint Status Report due by 4/11/2022. Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 4/21/2022 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Counsel are to call Judge Robbenhaar's AT&T Teleconference Line at 888-363-4735, Access Code 2387395, to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 3/30/2022. (kc)
March 7, 2022 Filing 30 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by John Beckstead, Terri Fortner, Steve Lanier, San Juan County Board of Commissioners, San Juan County, New Mexico, Tanya Shelby, Michael Sullivan, GloJean Todacheene. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Lorenzo Bates, Navajo Nation Human Rights Commission, Navajo Nation, Jonnye Kaibah Begay, Bessie Yazzie Werito, Gloria Ann Dennison, Tracy Dee Raymond.(Griesmeyer, Brian)
February 23, 2022 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan Oglesby on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Oglesby, Jordan)
February 18, 2022 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lorenzo Bates, Navajo Nation, Jonnye Kaibah Begay, Bessie Yazzie Werito, Tracy Dee Raymond, Gloria Ann Dennison, Navajo Nation Human Rights Commission. GloJean Todacheene served on 2/14/2022, answer due 3/7/2022. (Howard, Leon)
February 18, 2022 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lorenzo Bates, Navajo Nation, Jonnye Kaibah Begay, Bessie Yazzie Werito, Tracy Dee Raymond, Gloria Ann Dennison, Navajo Nation Human Rights Commission. San Juan County, New Mexico served on 2/14/2022, answer due 3/7/2022. (Howard, Leon)
February 18, 2022 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lorenzo Bates, Navajo Nation, Jonnye Kaibah Begay, Bessie Yazzie Werito, Tracy Dee Raymond, Gloria Ann Dennison, Navajo Nation Human Rights Commission. John Beckstead served on 2/14/2022, answer due 3/7/2022. (Howard, Leon)
February 18, 2022 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lorenzo Bates, Navajo Nation, Jonnye Kaibah Begay, Bessie Yazzie Werito, Tracy Dee Raymond, Gloria Ann Dennison, Navajo Nation Human Rights Commission. Terri Fortner served on 2/14/2022, answer due 3/7/2022. (Howard, Leon)
February 18, 2022 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lorenzo Bates, Navajo Nation, Jonnye Kaibah Begay, Bessie Yazzie Werito, Tracy Dee Raymond, Gloria Ann Dennison, Navajo Nation Human Rights Commission. Steve Lanier served on 2/14/2022, answer due 3/7/2022. (Howard, Leon)
February 18, 2022 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lorenzo Bates, Navajo Nation, Jonnye Kaibah Begay, Bessie Yazzie Werito, Tracy Dee Raymond, Gloria Ann Dennison, Navajo Nation Human Rights Commission. San Juan County Board of Commissioners served on 2/14/2022, answer due 3/7/2022. (Howard, Leon)
February 18, 2022 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lorenzo Bates, Navajo Nation, Jonnye Kaibah Begay, Bessie Yazzie Werito, Tracy Dee Raymond, Gloria Ann Dennison, Navajo Nation Human Rights Commission. Michael Sullivan served on 2/14/2022, answer due 3/7/2022. (Howard, Leon)
February 18, 2022 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lorenzo Bates, Navajo Nation, Jonnye Kaibah Begay, Bessie Yazzie Werito, Tracy Dee Raymond, Gloria Ann Dennison, Navajo Nation Human Rights Commission. Tanya Shelby served on 2/14/2022, answer due 3/7/2022. (Howard, Leon)
February 11, 2022 Filing 20 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
February 11, 2022 United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar and United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (jg)
February 11, 2022 Summons Issued as to John Beckstead, Terri Fortner, Steve Lanier, San Juan County Board of Commissioners, San Juan County, New Mexico, Tanya Shelby, Michael Sullivan, GloJean Todacheene. (jg)
February 10, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE by Lorenzo Bates, Jonnye Kaibah Begay, Gloria Ann Dennison, Navajo Nation, Navajo Nation Human Rights Commission, Tracy Dee Raymond, Bessie Yazzie Werito re 10 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, of Good Standing (Howard, Leon)
February 10, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE by Lorenzo Bates, Jonnye Kaibah Begay, Gloria Ann Dennison, Navajo Nation, Navajo Nation Human Rights Commission, Tracy Dee Raymond, Bessie Yazzie Werito re 9 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, of Good Standing (Howard, Leon)
February 10, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE by Lorenzo Bates, Jonnye Kaibah Begay, Gloria Ann Dennison, Navajo Nation, Navajo Nation Human Rights Commission, Tracy Dee Raymond, Bessie Yazzie Werito re 8 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, of Good Standing (Howard, Leon)
February 10, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE by Lorenzo Bates, Jonnye Kaibah Begay, Gloria Ann Dennison, Navajo Nation, Navajo Nation Human Rights Commission, Tracy Dee Raymond, Bessie Yazzie Werito re 7 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, of Good Standing (Howard, Leon)
February 10, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE by Lorenzo Bates, Jonnye Kaibah Begay, Gloria Ann Dennison, Navajo Nation, Navajo Nation Human Rights Commission, Tracy Dee Raymond, Bessie Yazzie Werito re 6 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, of Good Standing (Howard, Leon)
February 10, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE by Lorenzo Bates, Jonnye Kaibah Begay, Gloria Ann Dennison, Navajo Nation, Navajo Nation Human Rights Commission, Tracy Dee Raymond, Bessie Yazzie Werito re 5 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, of Good Standing (Howard, Leon)
February 10, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE by Lorenzo Bates, Jonnye Kaibah Begay, Gloria Ann Dennison, Navajo Nation, Navajo Nation Human Rights Commission, Tracy Dee Raymond, Bessie Yazzie Werito re 4 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, of Good Standing (Howard, Leon)
February 10, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE by Lorenzo Bates, Jonnye Kaibah Begay, Gloria Ann Dennison, Navajo Nation, Navajo Nation Human Rights Commission, Tracy Dee Raymond, Bessie Yazzie Werito re 3 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, of Good Standing (Howard, Leon)
February 10, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE by Lorenzo Bates, Jonnye Kaibah Begay, Gloria Ann Dennison, Navajo Nation, Navajo Nation Human Rights Commission, Tracy Dee Raymond, Bessie Yazzie Werito re 2 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, of Good Standing (Howard, Leon)
February 10, 2022 Filing 10 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiffs Lorenzo Bates, Jonnye Kaibah Begay, Gloria Ann Dennison, Navajo Nation, Navajo Nation Human Rights Commission, Tracy Dee Raymond, Bessie Yazzie Werito by Leon F Howard, III on behalf of: James Tucker Lawyers Committee for Civil Rights Under Law 1500 K Street, N.W. Suite 900Washington, D.C. 20005 202-662-8309 jtucker@lawyerscommittee.org (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Howard, Leon)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 10, 2022 Filing 9 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiffs Lorenzo Bates, Jonnye Kaibah Begay, Gloria Ann Dennison, Navajo Nation, Navajo Nation Human Rights Commission, Tracy Dee Raymond, Bessie Yazzie Werito by Leon F Howard, III on behalf of: Bernadette Samson Reyes UCLA Voting Rights Project 3250 Public Affairs BuildingLos Angeles, CA 90095 310-400-6019 bernadette@uclavrp.org (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Howard, Leon)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 10, 2022 Filing 8 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiffs Lorenzo Bates, Jonnye Kaibah Begay, Gloria Ann Dennison, Navajo Nation, Navajo Nation Human Rights Commission, Tracy Dee Raymond, Bessie Yazzie Werito by Leon F Howard, III on behalf of: Sonni Waknin UCLA Voting Rights Project 3250 Public Affairs BuildingLos Angeles, CA 90095 310-400-6019 sonni@uclavrp.org (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Howard, Leon)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 10, 2022 Filing 7 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiffs Lorenzo Bates, Jonnye Kaibah Begay, Gloria Ann Dennison, Navajo Nation, Navajo Nation Human Rights Commission, Tracy Dee Raymond, Bessie Yazzie Werito by Leon F Howard, III on behalf of: Virginia Weeks DLA Piper 701 Fifth Avenue, Suite 6900Seattle, Washington 98104-7029 206-839-4868 virginia.weeks@us.dlapiper.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Howard, Leon)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 10, 2022 Filing 6 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiffs Lorenzo Bates, Jonnye Kaibah Begay, Gloria Ann Dennison, Navajo Nation, Navajo Nation Human Rights Commission, Tracy Dee Raymond, Bessie Yazzie Werito by Leon F Howard, III on behalf of: Daniel Nettles DLA Piper 2000 University AvenueEast Palo Alto, California 94303-2214 650-833-2014 daniel.nettles@us.dlapiper.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Howard, Leon)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 10, 2022 Filing 5 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiffs Lorenzo Bates, Jonnye Kaibah Begay, Gloria Ann Dennison, Navajo Nation, Navajo Nation Human Rights Commission, Tracy Dee Raymond, Bessie Yazzie Werito by Leon F Howard, III on behalf of: Jean Gabat DLA Piper 1650 Market Street, Suite 5000Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19103-7300 215-656-3373 jean.gabat@us.dlapiper.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Howard, Leon)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 10, 2022 Filing 4 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiffs Lorenzo Bates, Jonnye Kaibah Begay, Gloria Ann Dennison, Navajo Nation, Navajo Nation Human Rights Commission, Tracy Dee Raymond, Bessie Yazzie Werito by Leon F Howard, III on behalf of: Raymond Williams DLA Piper 1650 Market Street, Suite 5000Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19103-7300 215-656-3368 raymond.williams@us.dlapiper.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Howard, Leon)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 10, 2022 Filing 3 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiffs Lorenzo Bates, Jonnye Kaibah Begay, Gloria Ann Dennison, Navajo Nation, Navajo Nation Human Rights Commission, Tracy Dee Raymond, Bessie Yazzie Werito by Leon F Howard, III on behalf of: Ryan Snow Lawyers Committee for Civil Rights Under Law 1500 K Street, NW, Suite 900Washington, D.C. 20005 202-662-8312 rsnow@lawyerscommittee.org (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Howard, Leon)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 10, 2022 Filing 2 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiffs Lorenzo Bates, Jonnye Kaibah Begay, Gloria Ann Dennison, Navajo Nation, Navajo Nation Human Rights Commission, Tracy Dee Raymond, Bessie Yazzie Werito by Leon F Howard, III on behalf of: Ezra D. Rosenberg Lawyers Committee for Civil Rights Under Law 1500 K Street, NW, Suite 900Washington DC 20005 (202) 662-8345 erosenberg@lawyerscommittee.org (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Howard, Leon)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 10, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Lorenzo Bates, Navajo Nation, Jonnye Kaibah Begay, Bessie Yazzie Werito, Tracy Dee Raymond, Gloria Ann Dennison, Navajo Nation Human Rights Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Howard, Leon)
February 10, 2022 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-8115747 re #1 Complaint, filed by Lorenzo Bates, Navajo Nation Human Rights Commission, Navajo Nation, Jonnye Kaibah Begay, Bessie Yazzie Werito, Gloria Ann Dennison, Tracy Dee Raymond (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Howard, Leon)
February 10, 2022 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-8115977 re: # 2 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Lorenzo Bates, Navajo Nation Human Rights Commission, Navajo Nation, Jonnye Kaibah Begay, Bessie Yazzie Werito, Gloria Ann Dennison, Tracy Dee Raymond (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Howard, Leon)
February 10, 2022 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-8116050 re: # 7 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Lorenzo Bates, Navajo Nation Human Rights Commission, Navajo Nation, Jonnye Kaibah Begay, Bessie Yazzie Werito, Gloria Ann Dennison, Tracy Dee Raymond (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Howard, Leon)
February 10, 2022 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-8116052 re: # 8 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Lorenzo Bates, Navajo Nation Human Rights Commission, Navajo Nation, Jonnye Kaibah Begay, Bessie Yazzie Werito, Gloria Ann Dennison, Tracy Dee Raymond (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Howard, Leon)
February 10, 2022 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-8116056 re: # 9 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Lorenzo Bates, Navajo Nation Human Rights Commission, Navajo Nation, Jonnye Kaibah Begay, Bessie Yazzie Werito, Gloria Ann Dennison, Tracy Dee Raymond (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Howard, Leon)
February 10, 2022 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-8116043 re: # 6 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Lorenzo Bates, Navajo Nation Human Rights Commission, Navajo Nation, Jonnye Kaibah Begay, Bessie Yazzie Werito, Gloria Ann Dennison, Tracy Dee Raymond (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Howard, Leon)
February 10, 2022 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-8116039 re: # 5 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Lorenzo Bates, Navajo Nation Human Rights Commission, Navajo Nation, Jonnye Kaibah Begay, Bessie Yazzie Werito, Gloria Ann Dennison, Tracy Dee Raymond (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Howard, Leon)
February 10, 2022 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-8115985 re: # 3 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Lorenzo Bates, Navajo Nation Human Rights Commission, Navajo Nation, Jonnye Kaibah Begay, Bessie Yazzie Werito, Gloria Ann Dennison, Tracy Dee Raymond (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Howard, Leon)
February 10, 2022 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-8116035 re: # 4 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Lorenzo Bates, Navajo Nation Human Rights Commission, Navajo Nation, Jonnye Kaibah Begay, Bessie Yazzie Werito, Gloria Ann Dennison, Tracy Dee Raymond (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Howard, Leon)
February 10, 2022 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-8116061 re: # 10 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Lorenzo Bates, Navajo Nation Human Rights Commission, Navajo Nation, Jonnye Kaibah Begay, Bessie Yazzie Werito, Gloria Ann Dennison, Tracy Dee Raymond (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Howard, Leon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Navajo Nation et al v. San Juan County, New Mexico et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Navajo Nation
Represented By: Chad W. Dunn
Represented By: Doreen N. McPaul
Represented By: Jason Searle
Represented By: Paul Spruhan
Represented By: Preston Sanchez
Represented By: Leon F Howard, III
Represented By: Bernadette Reyes
Represented By: Daniel Nettles
Represented By: Ezra D Rosenberg
Represented By: James Tucker
Represented By: Jean Camille Gabat
Represented By: Jordan Oglesby
Represented By: Raymond Williams
Represented By: Ryan Snow
Represented By: Sonni Waknin
Represented By: Virgina Weeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Navajo Nation Human Rights Commission
Represented By: Chad W. Dunn
Represented By: Doreen N. McPaul
Represented By: Jason Searle
Represented By: Paul Spruhan
Represented By: Preston Sanchez
Represented By: Leon F Howard, III
Represented By: Bernadette Reyes
Represented By: Daniel Nettles
Represented By: Ezra D Rosenberg
Represented By: Jean Camille Gabat
Represented By: Jordan Oglesby
Represented By: Raymond Williams
Represented By: Ryan Snow
Represented By: Sonni Waknin
Represented By: Virgina Weeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorenzo Bates
Represented By: Chad W. Dunn
Represented By: Doreen N. McPaul
Represented By: Jason Searle
Represented By: Paul Spruhan
Represented By: Preston Sanchez
Represented By: Leon F Howard, III
Represented By: Bernadette Reyes
Represented By: Daniel Nettles
Represented By: Ezra D Rosenberg
Represented By: James Tucker
Represented By: Jean Camille Gabat
Represented By: Jordan Oglesby
Represented By: Raymond Williams
Represented By: Ryan Snow
Represented By: Sonni Waknin
Represented By: Virgina Weeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonnye Kaibah Begay
Represented By: Chad W. Dunn
Represented By: Doreen N. McPaul
Represented By: Jason Searle
Represented By: Paul Spruhan
Represented By: Preston Sanchez
Represented By: Leon F Howard, III
Represented By: Bernadette Reyes
Represented By: Daniel Nettles
Represented By: Ezra D Rosenberg
Represented By: James Tucker
Represented By: Jean Camille Gabat
Represented By: Jordan Oglesby
Represented By: Raymond Williams
Represented By: Ryan Snow
Represented By: Sonni Waknin
Represented By: Virgina Weeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Ann Dennison
Represented By: Chad W. Dunn
Represented By: Doreen N. McPaul
Represented By: Jason Searle
Represented By: Paul Spruhan
Represented By: Preston Sanchez
Represented By: Leon F Howard, III
Represented By: Bernadette Reyes
Represented By: Daniel Nettles
Represented By: Ezra D Rosenberg
Represented By: James Tucker
Represented By: Jean Camille Gabat
Represented By: Jordan Oglesby
Represented By: Raymond Williams
Represented By: Ryan Snow
Represented By: Sonni Waknin
Represented By: Virgina Weeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Dee Raymond
Represented By: Chad W. Dunn
Represented By: Doreen N. McPaul
Represented By: Jason Searle
Represented By: Paul Spruhan
Represented By: Preston Sanchez
Represented By: Leon F Howard, III
Represented By: Bernadette Reyes
Represented By: Daniel Nettles
Represented By: Ezra D Rosenberg
Represented By: Jean Camille Gabat
Represented By: Jordan Oglesby
Represented By: Raymond Williams
Represented By: Ryan Snow
Represented By: Sonni Waknin
Represented By: Virgina Weeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bessie Yazzie Werito
Represented By: Chad W. Dunn
Represented By: Doreen N. McPaul
Represented By: Jason Searle
Represented By: Paul Spruhan
Represented By: Preston Sanchez
Represented By: Leon F Howard, III
Represented By: Bernadette Reyes
Represented By: Daniel Nettles
Represented By: Ezra D Rosenberg
Represented By: Jean Camille Gabat
Represented By: Jordan Oglesby
Represented By: Raymond Williams
Represented By: Ryan Snow
Represented By: Sonni Waknin
Represented By: Virgina Weeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Juan County, New Mexico
Represented By: Brian Griesmeyer
Represented By: Christopher T Saucedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Juan County Board of Commissioners
Represented By: Brian Griesmeyer
Represented By: Christopher T Saucedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Beckstead
Represented By: Brian Griesmeyer
Represented By: Christopher T Saucedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terri Fortner
Represented By: Brian Griesmeyer
Represented By: Christopher T Saucedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Lanier
Represented By: Brian Griesmeyer
Represented By: Christopher T Saucedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Sullivan
Represented By: Brian Griesmeyer
Represented By: Christopher T Saucedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GloJean Todacheene
Represented By: Brian Griesmeyer
Represented By: Christopher T Saucedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanya Shelby
Represented By: Brian Griesmeyer
Represented By: Christopher T Saucedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?