Zamarchi v. Honda Motor Co., Ltd et al
Plaintiff: Isabella K. Zamarchi
Defendant: Honda Motor Co., Ltd and American Honda Motor Co., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00198
Filed: March 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Judith C Herrera
Referring Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
2 Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan T Goodhue on behalf of American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (Goodhue, Ryan)
May 6, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of Change of Address by Terra Hittson (Hittson, Terra)
May 2, 2022 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Honda Motor Co., Inc. re Initial Disclosures (Hittson, Terra)
May 2, 2022 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Isabella K. Zamarchi of Initial Disclosures (Tracy, E) Modified text on 5/3/2022 change from notice to certificate of service (gr).
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STATUS REPORT AND PROVISIONAL DISCOVERY PLAN WITH CHANGES AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Plaintiff to seek leave to join and amend by 9/10/2022. Defendants to seek leave to join and amend by 10/10/2022. Plaintiff's expert disclosures due by 1/20/2023. Defendants' expert disclosures due by 3/21/2023. Discovery due by 4/21/2023. Discovery motions due by 5/11/2023. Pretrial motions due by 5/22/2023. Proposed Pretrial Order due from Plaintiff to Defendants by 8/21/2023 and from Defendants to the Court by 9/4/2023. (rps)
April 29, 2022 Filing 16 Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa: Scheduling Conference held on 4/29/2022. (rps)
April 27, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 13. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
April 25, 2022 Filing 14 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Judith C. Herrera as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
April 19, 2022 Filing 12 Joint Status Report by American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (Hittson, Terra)
April 12, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE by Isabella K. Zamarchi of Good Standing (Kaufman, Justin)
April 11, 2022 Filing 9 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Isabella K. Zamarchi by Justin Ross Kaufman on behalf of: Garrett Rogers The Tracy Firm 4701 Bengal StreetDallas, TX 75235 (214) 324-9000 Fax (972) 387-2205 grogers@vehiclesafetyfirm.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Kaufman, Justin)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
April 11, 2022 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-8211344 re: # 9 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Isabella K. Zamarchi (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Kaufman, Justin)
March 30, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE by American Honda Motor Co., Inc. re 7 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, Notice of Filing Certificate of Good Standing of Jeffrey S. Patterson (Hittson, Terra)
March 30, 2022 Filing 7 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc. by Terra Hittson on behalf of: Jeffrey S. Patterson Hartline Barger LLP 8750 N. Central Expressway, Suite 1600Dallas, TX 75231 214-369-2100 jpatterson@hartlinebarger.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Hittson, Terra)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
March 30, 2022 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-8191324 re: # 7 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Hittson, Terra)
March 29, 2022 Filing 6 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc. by Jeffrey S Patterson (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Patterson, Jeffrey)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
March 25, 2022 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Honda Motor Co., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Honda Motor Co., Ltd for American Honda Motor Co., Inc.. (Hittson, Terra)
March 25, 2022 Filing 4 Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by American Honda Motor Co., Inc.. (Hittson, Terra)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Counsel are to meet and confer by 4/8/2022. The parties' Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan is due by 4/19/2022. A Telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference is set for 4/29/2022 at 09:30 AM before Judge Khalsa. Counsel are to call Judge Khalsa's AT&T conference line at (877) 848-7030 and enter the code 7324132 to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 4/22/2022. (rps)
March 18, 2022 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
March 18, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from First Judicial District Court, case number D-117-CV-2022-00038. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Hittson, Terra)
March 18, 2022 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-8173547 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Honda Motor Co., Ltd, American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Hittson, Terra)
March 18, 2022 United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar and United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (dr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zamarchi v. Honda Motor Co., Ltd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isabella K. Zamarchi
Represented By: Caren I Friedman
Represented By: E Todd Tracy
Represented By: Justin Ross Kaufman
Represented By: Rosalind Bienvenu
Represented By: Garrett Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honda Motor Co., Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Honda Motor Co., Inc.
Represented By: Terra Hittson
Represented By: Jeffrey S Patterson
Represented By: Ryan T Goodhue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?