Bosbonis v. Fairfield by Marriott, et al.
Plaintiff: Michael Bosbonis
Defendant: Fairfield by Marriott, Fairfield Inn & Suites, Marriott International, Inc., John A. Doe and John B. Doe
Case Number: 1:2022cv00200
Filed: March 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kenneth J Gonzales
Referring Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
2 Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2022 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael Bosbonis First Set of Discovery to Defendant 1.0 (Yamato, Jason)
April 26, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE by Marriott International, Inc. of Filing State Court Records (Pullen, Lisa)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Counsel are to meet and confer by 5/6/2022. The parties' Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan is due by 5/17/2022. A Telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference is set for 5/27/2022 at 11:30 AM before Judge Khalsa. Counsel are to call Judge Khalsa's AT&T conference line at (877) 848-7030 and enter the code 7324132 to connect to the proceedings. (rps)
April 13, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 11. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg)
April 11, 2022 Filing 12 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
March 28, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 10 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (kfo)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
March 21, 2022 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) for Damages, and Jury Demand by Marriott International, Inc.. (Wesner, David)
March 21, 2022 Filing 8 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Marriott International, Inc. Amended Notice of Removal from Second Judicial District Court, case number D-202-CV-2022-00698. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Marriott International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wesner, David) Modified on 3/22/2022 (jg).
March 21, 2022 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-8176781 re #8 Notice of Removal, filed by Marriott International, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Wesner, David)
March 18, 2022 Filing 7 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
March 18, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Entress Pullen on behalf of Marriott International, Inc. (Pullen, Lisa)
March 18, 2022 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Marriott International, Inc. (Wesner, David)
March 18, 2022 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT Amended in Support of Removal by Marriott International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B.1, #2 Exhibit B.2) (Wesner, David)
March 18, 2022 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT in Support of Removal by Marriott International, Inc. (Wesner, David)
March 18, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David M Wesner on behalf of Marriott International, Inc. (Wesner, David)
March 18, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Marriott International, Inc. from Second Judicial District Court, case number D-202-CV-2022-00698. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Marriott International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wesner, David)
March 18, 2022 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-8174037 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Marriott International, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Wesner, David)
March 18, 2022 United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough and United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (dr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bosbonis v. Fairfield by Marriott, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairfield by Marriott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairfield Inn & Suites
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc.
Represented By: David M Wesner
Represented By: Lisa Entress Pullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John B. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Bosbonis
Represented By: David Adams
Represented By: Jason T. Yamato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?