United States of America v. Walters et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: David E. Walters and Robin J. Walters
Case Number: 1:2022cv00216
Filed: March 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Referring Judge: John F Robbenhaar
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401 IRS: Tax Liability
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2022 Filing 9 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to David E. Walters, Robin J. Walters (jg)
April 27, 2022 Filing 8 REQUEST/PRAECIPE for Entry of Default Against Robin J Walters by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Perez Declaration, #2 Sample Entry of Default) (De La Cruz, Ignacio) Modified on 4/28/2022 (jg).
April 27, 2022 Filing 7 REQUEST/PRAECIPE for Entry of Default Against David Walters by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Perez Declaration, #2 Exhibit Sample Clerk's Entry of Default) (De La Cruz, Ignacio) Modified on 4/28/2022 (jg).
April 20, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. (De La Cruz, Ignacio)
April 1, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Robin J. Walters served on 3/29/2022, answer due 4/19/2022. (De La Cruz, Ignacio)
April 1, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. David E. Walters served on 3/29/2022, answer due 4/19/2022. (De La Cruz, Ignacio)
March 25, 2022 Summons Issued as to David E. Walters, Robin J. Walters. (dr)
March 24, 2022 Filing 3 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint JS44 Civil Cover by United States of America (De La Cruz, Ignacio)
March 24, 2022 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
March 24, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Waived), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(De La Cruz, Ignacio)
March 24, 2022 United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar and United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Walters et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Ignacio Perez De La Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David E. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin J. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?