White et al v. Griffin
Plaintiff: State of New Mexico, Marco White, Mark Mitchell and Leslie Lakind
Defendant: Couy Griffin
Case Number: 1:2022cv00284
Filed: April 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Robert C Brack
Referring Judge: William P Johnson
2 Judge: John F Robbenhaar
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE of acknowledgement of receipt of records from First Judicial District Court. (bap)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Letter by United States District Court Clerk remanding case back to First Judicial District Court. (cmm)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING #10 MOTION to Remand and Supporting Memorandum, by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson. (cmm)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION to Transfer Case Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by Couy Griffin. (Smith, Nicholas)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE by Couy Griffin of Supplemental Authority Pursuant to D.N.M. LR-Civ. 7.8(b) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Quo Warranto Treatise (High, 1896)) (Smith, Nicholas)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE by Couy Griffin re #10 MOTION to Remand and Supporting Memorandum Request for Oral Argument, Pursuant to D.N.M.LR-Civ. 7.6(a) (Smith, Nicholas)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER CLARIFYING PLEADINGS by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson. (cmm)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 REPLY re Plaintiffs' Response Regarding Notice of Completion of Briefing on Motion to Remand re #27 Reply filed by Couy Griffin. (Smith, Nicholas)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Plaintiffs' REPLY re #24 Notice of Briefing Complete, #26 Response filed by Leslie Lakind, Mark Mitchell, Marco White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Dodd, Christopher)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #24 Notice of Briefing Complete filed by Couy Griffin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Smith, Nicholas)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION by Leslie Lakind, Mark Mitchell, Marco White (Dodd, Christopher)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Leslie Lakind, Mark Mitchell, Marco White re #10 MOTION to Remand and Supporting Memorandum filed by Leslie Lakind, Marco White, State of New Mexico, Mark Mitchell (Dodd, Christopher)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Remand and Supporting Memorandum filed by Leslie Lakind, Mark Mitchell, Marco White. (Dodd, Christopher)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson GRANTING #21 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (cmm)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Leslie Lakind, Mark Mitchell, State of New Mexico, Marco White. (Goldberg, Joseph)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Chief United States District Judge William P. Johnson as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Sr. United States District Judge Robert C. Brack no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION to Transfer Case Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by Leslie Lakind, Mark Mitchell, State of New Mexico, Marco White. (Goldberg, Joseph)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #17 MOTION for Hearing Request for Status Conference filed by Couy Griffin. (Smith, Nicholas)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for Hearing Request for Status Conference by Leslie Lakind, Mark Mitchell, State of New Mexico, Marco White. (Goldberg, Joseph)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE by Leslie Lakind, Mark Mitchell, State of New Mexico, Marco White re 11 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, 13 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, 14 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, 12 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, Notice of Good Standing (Goldberg, Joseph)
April 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Remand and Supporting Memorandum filed by Couy Griffin. (Smith, Nicholas)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiffs Leslie Lakind, Mark Mitchell, State of New Mexico, Marco White by Joseph Goldberg on behalf of: Stuart McPhail Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington 1331 F Street NW, Suite 900Washington, DC 20004 2024085565 smcphail@citizensforethics.org (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Goldberg, Joseph)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiffs Leslie Lakind, Mark Mitchell, State of New Mexico, Marco White by Joseph Goldberg on behalf of: Nikhel Sus Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington 1331 F Street NW, Suite 900Washington, DC 20004 2024085565 nsus@citizensforethics.org (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Goldberg, Joseph)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiffs Leslie Lakind, Mark Mitchell, State of New Mexico, Marco White by Joseph Goldberg on behalf of: Donald Sherman Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington 1331 F Street NW, Suite 900Washington, DC 20004 2024085565 dsherman@citizensforethics.org (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Goldberg, Joseph)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiffs Leslie Lakind, Mark Mitchell, State of New Mexico, Marco White by Joseph Goldberg on behalf of: Noah Bookbinder Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington 1331 F Street NW, Suite 900Washington, DC 20004 202.408.5565 nbookbinder@citizensforethics.org (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Goldberg, Joseph)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-8232173 re: # 13 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Leslie Lakind, Marco White, State of New Mexico, Mark Mitchell (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Goldberg, Joseph)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-8232052 re: # 11 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Leslie Lakind, Marco White, State of New Mexico, Mark Mitchell (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Goldberg, Joseph)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-8232185 re: # 14 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Leslie Lakind, Marco White, State of New Mexico, Mark Mitchell (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Goldberg, Joseph)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-8232128 re: # 12 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Leslie Lakind, Marco White, State of New Mexico, Mark Mitchell (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Goldberg, Joseph)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Remand and Supporting Memorandum by Leslie Lakind, Mark Mitchell, State of New Mexico, Marco White. (Goldberg, Joseph)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 5. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Filing fee received online: $ 402, receipt number ANMDC-8221164 (bap)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FINDING GOOD CAUSE TO DELAY SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. (ajp)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Sr. United States District Judge Robert C. Brack as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet by Couy Griffin (Smith, Nicholas)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough and United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (jg)
April 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to Transfer Case Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by Couy Griffin. (Smith, Nicholas)
April 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Couy Griffin from First Judicial District Court, Santa Fe County, case number D-101-CV-2022-00473. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Couy Griffin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Copy of State Court Pleadings)(Smith, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White et al v. Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of New Mexico
Represented By: Amber Fayerberg
Represented By: Christopher A Dodd
Represented By: Joseph Goldberg
Represented By: Donald Sherman
Represented By: Nikhel Sus
Represented By: Noah Bookbinder
Represented By: Stuart McPhail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marco White
Represented By: Amber Fayerberg
Represented By: Christopher A Dodd
Represented By: Joseph Goldberg
Represented By: Donald Sherman
Represented By: Nikhel Sus
Represented By: Noah Bookbinder
Represented By: Stuart McPhail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Mitchell
Represented By: Amber Fayerberg
Represented By: Christopher A Dodd
Represented By: Joseph Goldberg
Represented By: Donald Sherman
Represented By: Nikhel Sus
Represented By: Noah Bookbinder
Represented By: Stuart McPhail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Lakind
Represented By: Amber Fayerberg
Represented By: Christopher A Dodd
Represented By: Joseph Goldberg
Represented By: Donald Sherman
Represented By: Nikhel Sus
Represented By: Noah Bookbinder
Represented By: Stuart McPhail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Couy Griffin
Represented By: Nicholas David Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?