United States of America v. Garner et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Dorothy P. Garner, James D. Garner, Federal National Mortgage Association, JP Morgan Chase and San Juan County Assessor
Case Number: 1:2022cv00294
Filed: April 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: James O Browning
Referring Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
2 Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401 IRS: Tax Liability
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by San Juan County Assessor. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by United States of America.(Sawyer, Joseph)
May 26, 2022 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Federal National Mortgage Association (Ewing, Janelle)
May 26, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Federal National Mortgage Association. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by United States of America.(Ewing, Janelle)
May 25, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Janelle Ewing on behalf of Federal National Mortgage Association (Ewing, Janelle)
May 20, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Dorothy P. Garner, James D. Garner. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by United States of America. (ng)
May 10, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 5. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
May 9, 2022 Filing 6 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge James O. Browning as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
May 5, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. James D. Garner served on 4/29/2022, answer due 5/20/2022. (Yepuri, Moha)
May 3, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Dorothy P. Garner served on 4/29/2022, answer due 5/20/2022. (Yepuri, Moha)
May 3, 2022 Summons Issued as to Federal National Mortgage Association, JP Morgan Chase, San Juan County Assessor. (jg)
April 20, 2022 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
April 20, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (United States' Complaint) against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Waived), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Yepuri, Moha)
April 20, 2022 United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea and United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (dr)
April 20, 2022 Summons Issued as to Dorothy P. Garner, James D. Garner. (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Garner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Moha P Yepuri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorothy P. Garner
Represented By: Shad Brown
Represented By: Jason M Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James D. Garner
Represented By: Shad Brown
Represented By: Jason M Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Janelle Ewing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Juan County Assessor
Represented By: Joseph Foye Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?