Garcia v. Dunstan et al
Plaintiff: Steven Garcia
Defendant: Adam Dunstan and Mountain States Crane, LLC
3Rd Party Defendant: FEI Faith Enterprises, Inc., Faith Enterprises, Inc. and United States Department of Veterans Affairs doing business as The Raymond G. Murphy Department of Veterans Affairs Medical Center
Case Number: 1:2022cv00346
Filed: May 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kea W Riggs
Referring Judge: Jerry H Ritter
2 Judge: John F Robbenhaar
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Tort/Non-Motor Vehicle
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2022 Filing 18 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Kea W. Riggs as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
June 24, 2022 Filing 17 STIPULATION re #13 MOTION to Remand by Adam Dunstan, Mountain States Crane, LLC (Ruotanen, Leanna)
June 17, 2022 Filing 16 STIPULATION re #13 MOTION to Remand by Adam Dunstan, Mountain States Crane, LLC (Ruotanen, Leanna)
June 8, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 21 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (mlt)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Finding Good Cause to Delay Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. (ajp)
June 3, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand by Steven Garcia. (Sutten, Richard)
May 25, 2022 Filing 12 Association Dues: $ 100 paid, receipt number # ANMDC-8286866 re: 10 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Defendant Adam Dunstan, Defendant Mountain States Crane, LLC. (cmm)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
May 25, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE by Adam Dunstan, Mountain States Crane, LLC (Kemp, Anne)
May 25, 2022 Filing 10 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants Adam Dunstan, Mountain States Crane, LLC by Anne Kemp on behalf of: Leanna Ruotanen Deasy Mahoney & Valentini, LTD 1601 Market St., Suite 3400Philadelphia, PA 19103 (215) 587-9400 Fax (215) 587-9456 lruotanen@dmvlawfirm.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Kemp, Anne)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
May 20, 2022 Filing 9 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants Adam Dunstan, Mountain States Crane, LLC by Anne Kemp on behalf of: Frank Deasy Deasy Mahoney & Valentini, LTD 1601 Market St., Suite 3400Philadelphia, PA 19103 (215) 587-9400 Fax (215) 587-9456 fdeasey@dmvlawfirm.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Kemp, Anne)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
May 20, 2022 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-8281661 re: # 9 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Adam Dunstan, Mountain States Crane, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Kemp, Anne)
May 11, 2022 Filing 8 FEI Faith Enterprises, Inc. and Faith Enterprises, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by FEI Faith Enterprises, Inc.. (Cash, Paul)
May 11, 2022 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by FEI Faith Enterprises, Inc. (Cash, Paul)
May 11, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul M. Cash on behalf of FEI Faith Enterprises, Inc. (Cash, Paul)
May 11, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory D. Steinman on behalf of FEI Faith Enterprises, Inc. (Steinman, Gregory)
May 6, 2022 Filing 4 Filing fee received online: $ 402.00, receipt number ANMDC-8256675 (bap)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
May 5, 2022 Filing 3 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Notice of Removal, by Adam Dunstan, Mountain States Crane, LLC (jg)
May 5, 2022 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
May 5, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mountain States Crane, LLC, Adam Dunston from Second Judicial District Court, case number D-202-CV-2021-06801. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Mountain States Crane, LLC, Adam Dunston. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit Third-Party Complaint, #3 Exhibit Proof of Service of Third-Party Complaint, #4 Exhibit Pleadings)(Kemp, Anne)
May 5, 2022 United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter and United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Dunstan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Garcia
Represented By: Richard W Sutten
Represented By: Richard Sutten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Dunstan
Represented By: Chris Henry Begeman
Represented By: Richard L. Righi
Represented By: Anne Kemp
Represented By: Francis J. Deasey
Represented By: Leanna B. Ruotanen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mountain States Crane, LLC
Represented By: Chris Henry Begeman
Represented By: Richard L. Righi
Represented By: Anne Kemp
Represented By: Francis J. Deasey
Represented By: Leanna B. Ruotanen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: FEI Faith Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory D. Steinman
Represented By: Paul M. Cash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Faith Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory D. Steinman
Represented By: Paul M. Cash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: United States Department of Veterans Affairs doing business as The Raymond G. Murphy Department of Veterans Affairs Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?