Magana et al v. The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company et al
Plaintiff: Romeo Magana, Victoria Magana and Edward Magana
Defendant: The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, FCA US LLC, Key Safety Systems, Inc., Lithia Motors, Inc. doing business as Lithia Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram Fiat of Santa Fe, Paige Pyke and Martin Pyke
Case Number: 1:2022cv00379
Filed: May 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Referring Judge: John F Robbenhaar
2 Judge: David H Urias
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Defendants', Martin Pyke and Paige Pyke, ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Martin Pyke, Paige Pyke. (Montoya, Gino)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 RESPONSE in Opposition re #36 MOTION to Strike #34 Response in Opposition to Motion To Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, or, in the Alternative, Permission to Reply filed by Key Safety Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Sedillo, Raul)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MOTION to Strike #34 Response in Opposition to Motion To Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, or, in the Alternative, Permission to Reply by Edward Magana, Romeo Magana, Victoria Magana. (Zamora, Matthew)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Edward Magana, Romeo Magana, Victoria Magana re #12 MOTION to Remand , Request for Attorney Fees, and Authorities in Support filed by Romeo Magana, Edward Magana, Victoria Magana (Zamora, Matthew)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Remand , Request for Attorney Fees, and Authorities in Support filed by Key Safety Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Sedillo, Raul)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Lithia Motors, Inc. re #18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Lithia Motors, Inc. (Edelman, Spencer)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Lithia Motors, Inc.. (Edelman, Spencer)
June 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION to Remand , Request for Attorney Fees, and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Edward Magana, Romeo Magana, Victoria Magana. (Zamora, Matthew)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Key Safety Systems, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Joyson Auto Safety Holdings, SA for Key Safety Systems, Inc.. (Sedillo, Raul)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Defendant ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Affirmative Defenses, and Jury Demand by Key Safety Systems, Inc.. (Sedillo, Raul)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FCA US LLC re #27 Response in Opposition to Motion Certificate of Mailing (Brooks, Kaleb)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Remand , Request for Attorney Fees, and Authorities in Support filed by FCA US LLC. (Brooks, Kaleb)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiffs' Response to Lithia Motors, Inc. Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Edward Magana, Romeo Magana, Victoria Magana. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6) (Zamora, Matthew)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lithia Motors, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The Vanguard Group, Inc. for Lithia Motors, Inc.. (Edelman, Spencer)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER FINDING GOOD CAUSE TO DELAY by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(b)(2), the Court finds good cause to delay entering a scheduling order until the matters referenced in this Order have been resolved. This finding is without prejudice to Plaintiffs' ability to file a properly supported motion for jurisdictional discovery, if appropriate. (kmt)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company (DeCandia, Donald)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (DeCandia, Donald)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 16. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE by Lithia Motors, Inc. re #18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Notice of Filing Declaration in Support of Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Edelman, Spencer)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company (DeCandia, Donald)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Lithia Motors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Edelman, Spencer)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge David H. Urias as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FCA US LLC re #13 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), #14 Corporate Disclosure Statement Mailing FCA's Answer and Disclosure Statement to Defendants Key Safety, Lithia, Paige Pyke and Martin Pyke (Brooks, Kaleb)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FCA US LLC (Brooks, Kaleb)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Defendant FCA US LLC's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) to Recover Damages for Personal Injuries and Loss of Consortium by FCA US LLC. (Brooks, Kaleb)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Remand , Request for Attorney Fees, and Authorities in Support by Edward Magana, Romeo Magana, Victoria Magana. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Zamora, Matthew)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald A. DeCandia on behalf of The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company (DeCandia, Donald)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE by Edward Magana, Romeo Magana, Victoria Magana Member Attorney's Certification in Support of Appearance Pro Hac Vice by Out of State Counsel-C. Tab Turner (Zamora, Matthew)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiffs Edward Magana, Romeo Magana, Victoria Magana by Matthew J Zamora on behalf of: C. Tab Turner Turner & Associates, PA 4705 Somes Ave., Suite 100North Little Rock, AR 72116 5017912277 Fax (501)791-1251 tab@tturner.com (Association Dues - Deliver Payment) (Zamora, Matthew)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Association Dues: $ 100 paid, receipt number # SF003450 re: 6 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (gr)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE by FCA US LLC re 6 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, Certificate of Association with Attorney Licensed Outside of the District (Brooks, Kaleb)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant FCA US LLC by Kaleb W. Brooks on behalf of: C. Megan Fischer Klein Thomas & Lee 340 E. Palm Lane, Suite A310Phoenix, AX 85004 602-935-8342 megan.fischer@kleinthomaslaw.com (Association Dues - Deliver Payment) (Brooks, Kaleb)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FCA US LLC (Brooks, Kaleb)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Romeo Magana by Tab Turner (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Turner, Tab)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number SF003449 re #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FCA US LLC from First Judicial District Court, case number D-101-CV-2022-00509. ( Filing Fee - Deliver Payment), filed by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit)(Brooks, Kaleb) filed by FCA US LLC.. (gr)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-8274428 re: # 4 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Romeo Magana (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Turner, Tab)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FCA US LLC from First Judicial District Court, case number D-101-CV-2022-00509. ( Filing Fee - Deliver Payment), filed by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Brooks, Kaleb)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar and United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (dr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Magana et al v. The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Romeo Magana
Represented By: Matthew J Zamora
Represented By: C. Tab Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Magana
Represented By: Matthew J Zamora
Represented By: C. Tab Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Magana
Represented By: Matthew J Zamora
Represented By: C. Tab Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Represented By: Angela Skaggs Gordon
Represented By: Donald A. DeCandia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Randy S. Bartell
Represented By: Kaleb W. Brooks
Represented By: C. Megan Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Key Safety Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Fernando Castillo Palomares
Represented By: Raul P Sedillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lithia Motors, Inc. doing business as Lithia Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram Fiat of Santa Fe
Represented By: Melissa Marie Kountz
Represented By: Spencer L Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paige Pyke
Represented By: Gino Lawrence Montoya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Pyke
Represented By: Gino Lawrence Montoya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?