Berg v. Amarillo Towing, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Harvey Melvin Berg and Harvey Melven Berg
Defendant: Amarillo Towing, Inc. and Russel G Radney
Case Number: 1:2022cv00393
Filed: May 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kea W Riggs
Referring Judge: John F Robbenhaar
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2022 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amarillo Towing, Inc., Russel G Radney (Perkins, Elizabeth)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Telephone Status Conference set for 9/15/2022 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Counsel will call Judge Robbenhaar's AT&T Teleconference Line at 888-363-4735, Access Code 2387395, to connect to the proceedings. THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED. (kc)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Settlement Conference set for 11/18/2022 at 09:00 AM via ZOOM before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. The Court will provide instructions and a ZOOM invitation in the days preceding the settlement conference. Telephone Pre-Settlement Status Conference set for 11/8/2022 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Counsel are to call Judge Robbenhaar's AT&T Teleconference Line at 888-363-4735, Access Code 2387395, to connect to the proceedings. See Order for additional instructions and deadlines. (kc)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STATUS REPORT AND PROVISIONAL DISCOVERY PLAN WITH CHANGES AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Discovery due by 2/2/2023; Plaintiff's Expert Witness List due by 11/4/2022; Defendants' Expert Witness List due by 12/16/2022; Discovery Motions due by 02/22/2023; Pretrial Motions due by 3/6/2023. (kc)
July 7, 2022 Filing 14 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar: Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 7/7/2022. (kc)
June 30, 2022 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Amarillo Towing, Inc., Russel G Radney re Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (Collins, Jill)
June 29, 2022 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Harvey Melven Berg Initial Disclosures (Tawney, James)
June 27, 2022 Filing 11 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Amarillo Towing, Inc., Russel G Radney (Perkins, Elizabeth)
June 21, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jill M Collins on behalf of Amarillo Towing, Inc., Russel G Radney (Collins, Jill)
June 13, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 7. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
June 9, 2022 Filing 8 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Kea W. Riggs as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
May 27, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) re Amarillo Towing Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint for Personal Injury Damages by Amarillo Towing, Inc., Russel G Radney. (Perkins, Elizabeth)
May 27, 2022 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) re Russel G. Radney's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint for Personal Injury Damages by Amarillo Towing, Inc., Russel G Radney. (Perkins, Elizabeth)
May 27, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Perkins on behalf of Amarillo Towing, Inc., Russel G Radney (Perkins, Elizabeth)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Joint Status Report due by 6/27/2022. Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 7/7/2022 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Counsel will call Judge Robbenhaar's AT&T Teleconference Line at 888-363-4735, Access Code 2387395, to connect to the proceedings. Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this order on any parties that have been served but have not yet entered an appearance and shall file a certificate of service with the Court documenting such service. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 6/27/2022. (kc)
May 23, 2022 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
May 23, 2022 United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough and United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (dr)
May 20, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Amarillo Towing, Inc. from Fourth Judicial District, case number D-424-CV-2022-00007. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Amarillo Towing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix Complaint, #3 Appendix Return of Service, #4 Appendix Return of Service, #5 Appendix Plaintiff's Jury Demand)(Perkins, Elizabeth)
May 20, 2022 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-8281857 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Amarillo Towing, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Perkins, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berg v. Amarillo Towing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harvey Melvin Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harvey Melven Berg
Represented By: Connie J. Flores
Represented By: James Daniel Tawney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amarillo Towing, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Perkins
Represented By: Jill M Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russel G Radney
Represented By: Jill M Collins
Represented By: Elizabeth Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?