Talavera v. Tapia et al
Plaintiff: Raul Talavera
Defendant: Helen Tapia, Homegoods, Inc. and WRI North Towne, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv00395
Filed: May 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Fouratt
Referring Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2022 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by WRI North Towne, LLC re Interrogatories and RFP to Plaintiff (Oliver, Dominique)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER SETTING TRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Telephonic Trial Scheduling Conference set for 8/22/2022 at 03:00 p.m. MDT before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. The parties shall call Judge Fouratt's conference line at (888) 363-4735 and use access code 9873158 to connect to the proceedings. (nmh)
July 19, 2022 Filing 20 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough: Scheduling Conference held on 07/19/2022. (cm)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough setting a Telephonic Status Conference for 10/04/2022 at 9:30 AM. The purpose of this conference is to discuss setting a settlement conference. The parties shall call the AT&T Conference line at (888) 398-2342 [Access Code: 2418431] to connect to the proceedings. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (cm)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STATUS REPORT by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. (cm)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Discovery due by 02/28/2023. Discovery Motions due by 03/22/2023. Pretrial Motions due by 03/31/2023. Pretrial Order due by 07/17/2023. (cm)
July 12, 2022 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Raul Talavera Re Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures to Dominique C. Oliver (Murray, Brian)
July 7, 2022 Filing 15 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by WRI North Towne, LLC (Oliver, Dominique)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT HOMEGOODS, INC. WITH PREJUDICE by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. (nmh)
June 29, 2022 Filing 13 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party by Homegoods, Inc., WRI North Towne, LLC. (Oliver, Dominique)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS AND QUASHING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. (nmh)
June 21, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 7 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Raul Talavera, 8 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Homegoods, Inc., WRI North Towne, LLC. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (cfa)
June 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Show Cause Response due by 6/22/2022. (nmh)
June 14, 2022 Filing 8 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Homegoods, Inc., WRI North Towne, LLC voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Collins, Jill)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
June 14, 2022 Filing 7 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Raul Talavera voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Murray, Brian)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 07/19/2022 at 11:30 AM. Joint Status Report due by 07/08/2022. (cm)
May 27, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE. In light of the #4 dispositive motion and pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 6/17/2022 unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (nmh)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
May 27, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss re Fraudulent Joinder by Homegoods, Inc., WRI North Towne, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Oliver, Dominique)
May 27, 2022 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) for Personal Injury and Damages by Homegoods, Inc., WRI North Towne, LLC. (Oliver, Dominique)
May 24, 2022 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
May 24, 2022 United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (dr)
May 23, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WRI North Towne, LLC, Homegoods, Inc. from Second Judicial District, case number D-202-CV-2022-00563. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by WRI North Towne, LLC, Homegoods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix Email from Plaintiff's Counsel granting Extension of Time, #3 Appendix Declaration of Helen Capilla, #4 Appendix State Court Pleadings)(Oliver, Dominique)
May 23, 2022 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-8284267 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Homegoods, Inc., WRI North Towne, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Oliver, Dominique)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Talavera v. Tapia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raul Talavera
Represented By: Brian Murray
Represented By: Gregory D Abel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helen Tapia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homegoods, Inc.
Represented By: Dominique C Oliver
Represented By: Jill M Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WRI North Towne, LLC
Represented By: Dominique C Oliver
Represented By: Jill M Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?