Montes et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Daniel Montes and Kristen Montes
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 1:2022cv00536
Filed: July 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Robert C Brack
Referring Judge: Jerry H Ritter
2 Judge: John F Robbenhaar
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE by Daniel Montes, Kristen Montes re #14 Notice of Appearance Amended (Cooper, James)
September 15, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by James Trenton Cooper on behalf of Daniel Montes, Kristen Montes (Cooper, James)
September 15, 2022 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Daniel Montes, Kristen Montes as to Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures (VandenBout, Lawrence)
September 15, 2022 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Schwarz, Todd)
September 14, 2022 Filing 11 Joint Status Report by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Schwarz, Todd)
September 14, 2022 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Schwarz, Todd)
September 7, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: Nos. 4 and 7. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg)
September 2, 2022 Filing 8 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Sr. District Judge Robert C. Brack as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter setting a Telephonic Scheduling Conference for 9/21/2022 at 03:30 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 9/14/2022. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 9/1/2022. (mlt)
July 26, 2022 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Schwarz, Todd)
July 25, 2022 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Schwarz, Todd)
July 20, 2022 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
July 20, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company from Second Judicial District, case number D-202-CV-2022-02983. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schwarz, Todd)
July 20, 2022 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-8375057 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Schwarz, Todd)
July 20, 2022 United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar and United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montes et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Montes
Represented By: Lawrence A VandenBout
Represented By: James Trenton Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen Montes
Represented By: Lawrence A VandenBout
Represented By: James Trenton Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Todd Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?