New Mexico Top Organics - Ultra Health, Inc. et al v. Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Mexico et al
Plaintiff: New Mexico Top Organics - Ultra Health, Inc., Jacob R Candelaria, Tomas Lorenzo Valencia, Bryce Bryant-Flynn, Matias Trujillo, Erica Rowland and Ariel McDougal
Defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Mexico, True Health New Mexico, Inc., Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company, Molina Healthcare of New Mexico, Inc., Presbyterian Health Plan, Inc., Presbyterian Insurance Company, Inc. and Western Sky Community Care, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00546
Filed: July 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: Kenneth J Gonzales
2 Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2022 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re #24 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Mexico, Presbyterian Health Plan, Inc., Western Sky Community Care, Inc.. (Thomas, Benjamin)
September 16, 2022 Filing 30 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Western Sky Community Care, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Centene Corporation for Western Sky Community Care, Inc.. (Baris, Melissa)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting #27 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation. (tah)
September 1, 2022 Filing 28 NOTICE by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Mexico re #24 MOTION to Remand to State Court of Extension of Briefing Deadline (Thomas, Benjamin)
September 1, 2022 Filing 27 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Mexico. (Thomas, Benjamin)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to VACATE #8 Initial Scheduling Order. The Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference set for 9/21/2022 at 02:00 PM (and all associated deadlines) is VACATED and will be reset following a decision on the #24 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by New Mexico Top Organics - Ultra Health, Inc., Ariel McDougal, Erica Rowland, Matias Trujillo, Jacob R Candelaria, if necessary. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (cda)
August 21, 2022 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by New Mexico Top Organics - Ultra Health, Inc. (Saucedo, Christopher)
August 21, 2022 Filing 24 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Jacob R Candelaria, Ariel McDougal, New Mexico Top Organics - Ultra Health, Inc., Erica Rowland, Matias Trujillo. (Saucedo, Christopher)
August 19, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Griesmeyer on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Griesmeyer, Brian)
August 19, 2022 Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against Presbyterian Health Plan, Inc., Western Sky Community Care, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Mexico. terminating Tomas Lorenzo Valencia, Molina Healthcare of New Mexico, Inc., Presbyterian Insurance Company, Inc., True Health New Mexico, Inc., Bryce Bryant-Flynn and Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company., filed by Erica Rowland, Ariel McDougal, Jacob R Candelaria, New Mexico Top Organics - Ultra Health, Inc., Matias Trujillo. (Saucedo, Christopher)
August 5, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 17. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg)
August 5, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE by True Health New Mexico, Inc. re 19 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, of Good Standing Associating Attorney (Marshall, Gregory)
August 5, 2022 Filing 19 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant True Health New Mexico, Inc. by Gregory Marshall on behalf of: Joseph G. Adams Snell & Wilmer LLP One Arizona CenterPhoenix, AZ 85004 602-382-6207 Fax 602-382-6070 jgadams@swlaw.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Marshall, Gregory)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 5, 2022 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-8401224 re: # 19 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by True Health New Mexico, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Marshall, Gregory)
August 3, 2022 Filing 18 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
August 3, 2022 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Molina Healthcare of New Mexico, Inc. (Burris, Eric)
August 2, 2022 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Mexico identifying Corporate Parent Blue Cross & Blue Shield of New Mexico for Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Mexico. (Thomas, Benjamin)
July 29, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Mexico of Good Standing of Associating Attorney (Thomas, Benjamin)
July 29, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Mexico of Good Standing of Associating Attorney (Thomas, Benjamin)
July 29, 2022 Filing 12 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Mexico by Benjamin E Thomas on behalf of: Jason Mayer Reed Smith LLP 10 South Wacker Drive, 40th FloorChicago, IL 60606 312-207-2859 jmayer@reedsmith.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Thomas, Benjamin)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 29, 2022 Filing 11 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Mexico by Benjamin E Thomas on behalf of: Martin Bishop Reed Smith LLP 10 South Wacker Drive, 40th FloorChicago, IL 60606 312-207-2859 mbishop@reedsmith.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Thomas, Benjamin)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 29, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin E Thomas on behalf of Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Mexico (Thomas, Benjamin)
July 29, 2022 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-8390727 re: # 11 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Mexico (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Thomas, Benjamin)
July 29, 2022 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-8390760 re: # 12 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Mexico (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Thomas, Benjamin)
July 28, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE by Molina Healthcare of New Mexico, Inc. of Agreed Extension (Burris, Eric)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference set for 9/21/2022 at 02:00 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 9/14/2022. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 8/16/2022. (cda)
July 26, 2022 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by True Health New Mexico, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Bright Health Management, Inc. for True Health New Mexico, Inc.. (Marshall, Gregory)
July 26, 2022 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Presbyterian Health Plan, Inc., Presbyterian Insurance Company, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Southwest Health Foundation, Corporate Parent Presbyterian Network, Inc. for Presbyterian Health Plan, Inc., Presbyterian Insurance Company, Inc.. (Schultz, Andrew)
July 25, 2022 Filing 5 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
July 25, 2022 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company (Miller, Justin)
July 25, 2022 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-8380374 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Miller, Justin)
July 25, 2022 United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (jg)
July 22, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE by Molina Healthcare of New Mexico, Inc. of Consent to Removal (Burris, Eric)
July 22, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric R. Burris on behalf of Molina Healthcare of New Mexico, Inc. (Burris, Eric)
July 22, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company from Second Judicial District Court, case number D-202-CV-2022-03237. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Miller, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New Mexico Top Organics - Ultra Health, Inc. et al v. Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Mexico et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Mexico Top Organics - Ultra Health, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Griesmeyer
Represented By: Christopher T Saucedo
Represented By: Frank T Apodaca
Represented By: Morris J Chavez
Represented By: Ryan Hart Harrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob R Candelaria
Represented By: Brian Griesmeyer
Represented By: Christopher T Saucedo
Represented By: Frank T Apodaca
Represented By: Morris J Chavez
Represented By: Ryan Hart Harrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tomas Lorenzo Valencia
Represented By: Christopher T Saucedo
Represented By: Frank T Apodaca
Represented By: Morris J Chavez
Represented By: Ryan Hart Harrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryce Bryant-Flynn
Represented By: Christopher T Saucedo
Represented By: Frank T Apodaca
Represented By: Morris J Chavez
Represented By: Ryan Hart Harrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matias Trujillo
Represented By: Brian Griesmeyer
Represented By: Christopher T Saucedo
Represented By: Frank T Apodaca
Represented By: Morris J Chavez
Represented By: Ryan Hart Harrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica Rowland
Represented By: Brian Griesmeyer
Represented By: Christopher T Saucedo
Represented By: Frank T Apodaca
Represented By: Morris J Chavez
Represented By: Ryan Hart Harrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ariel McDougal
Represented By: Brian Griesmeyer
Represented By: Christopher T Saucedo
Represented By: Frank T Apodaca
Represented By: Morris J Chavez
Represented By: Ryan Hart Harrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Mexico
Represented By: Alexander G. Elborn
Represented By: Benjamin E Thomas
Represented By: Jason T Mayer
Represented By: Martin Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: True Health New Mexico, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Marshall
Represented By: Joseph G. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Justin W. Miller
Represented By: Benjamin W Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Molina Healthcare of New Mexico, Inc.
Represented By: Eric R. Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Presbyterian Health Plan, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew G. Schultz
Represented By: Linda M Vanzi
Represented By: Melanie B Stambaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Presbyterian Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew G. Schultz
Represented By: Linda M Vanzi
Represented By: Melanie B Stambaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Sky Community Care, Inc.
Represented By: Alfred A Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?