Adriatic Insurance Company v. Zada et al
Plaintiff: Adriatic Insurance Company
Defendant: Hasbullah Wahab Zada, Kalon Trucking, LLC. and John Does 1-X
Case Number: 1:2022cv00818
Filed: October 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Referring Judge: John F Robbenhaar
2 Judge: Margaret I Strickland
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2022 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Answer to Complaint for Subrogation, Negligence, Damages, and Costs by Hasbullah Wahab Zada. (Stiff, John)
December 16, 2022 Filing 18 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed for Defendant Zada Acknowledgement filed by Adriatic Insurance Company. (Padilla, Richard)
December 15, 2022 Filing 17 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar: Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 12/15/2022 at 9:30 a.m. (ajp)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT AND PRESETTLEMENT CONFERENCES by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Settlement Conference set for 4/14/2023 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar via ZOOM. The Court will provide a ZOOM invitation and instructions in the days preceding the Settlement Conference. Telephone Pre-Settlement Status Conference set for 4/6/2023 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Counsel will call Judge Robbenhaar's AT&T Teleconference Line at (888) 363-4735, Access Code 2387395, to connect to the proceedings. Letters due 3/23/2023, 3/30/2023, 4/3/2023. (ajp)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STATUS REPORT AND PROVISIONAL DISCOVERY PLAN WITH CHANGES AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Plaintiff's Expert Witness List due by 4/28/2023. Defendants' Expert Witness list due 5/26/2023. Discovery due by 8/14/2023. Discovery Motions due by 9/5/2023. Pretrial Motions due by 9/15/2023. (ajp)
December 5, 2022 Filing 14 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Kalon Trucking, LLC. (Stiff, John)
December 5, 2022 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kalon Trucking, LLC. Defendants' Rule 26 (A) Initial Disclosure (Stiff, John)
December 1, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 7. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg)
November 25, 2022 Filing 11 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Margaret I. Strickland as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
November 23, 2022 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Adriatic Insurance Company Initial Disclosures (Padilla, Richard)
November 18, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE by Kalon Trucking, LLC. Corporate Disclosure Statement (Stiff, John)
November 18, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE by Kalon Trucking, LLC. Notice of Filing of State Court Record (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Stiff, John)
November 8, 2022 Filing 6 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint for Subrogation, Negligence, Damages, and Costs by Kalon Trucking, LLC.. (Stiff, John)
November 7, 2022 Filing 5 Defendant Kalon Trucking, LLC ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) for Subrogation, Negligence, Damages, and Costs by Kalon Trucking, LLC.. (Stiff, John)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 12/15/2022 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Counsel will call Judge Robbenhaar's AT&T Teleconference Line at (888) 363-4735, Access Code 2387395, to connect to the proceedings. Joint Status Report due by 12/5/2022. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 11/22/2022. (ajp)
October 31, 2022 Filing 3 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number ANMDC-8533327 re #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kalon Trucking, LLC. from Second Judicial District Court, case number D-202-CV-2022-05144. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Kalon Trucking, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Black, Kathy) filed by Kalon Trucking, LLC. (cmm)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
October 31, 2022 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
October 31, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kalon Trucking, LLC. from Second Judicial District Court, case number D-202-CV-2022-05144. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Kalon Trucking, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Black, Kathy)
October 31, 2022 United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa and United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adriatic Insurance Company v. Zada et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adriatic Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard M Padilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hasbullah Wahab Zada
Represented By: John S. Stiff
Represented By: Kathy Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kalon Trucking, LLC.
Represented By: John S. Stiff
Represented By: Kathy Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?