Hiller v. Circled Wagons Management, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Dale Hiller and Dale Hiller doing business as YouTube Channel Lackluster
Defendant: Mr. Nicholas Layman and Circled Wagons Management, LLC
3Rd Party Defendant: Lackluster Media, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv00865
Filed: November 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: John F Robbenhaar
Referring Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2023 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dale Hiller. Nicholas Layman served on 12/29/2022, answer due 1/19/2023. (Constant, Gina)
December 21, 2022 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Lackluster Media, LLC, COUNTERCLAIM against Dale Hiller by Circled Wagons Management, LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Dale Hiller.(Hernandez, Jessica)
December 14, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE by Dale Hiller re 10 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, Certificate of Good Standing (Constant, Gina)
December 13, 2022 Filing 11 Association Dues received online: $ 100 paid, receipt number # ANMDC-8595027 re: 10 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Plaintiff Dale Hiller (bap)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 13, 2022 Filing 10 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Dale Hiller by Gina Tassotti Constant on behalf of: John H. Bryan JohnBryanLaw 411 Main StreetUnion, WV 24983 304-772-4999 Fax 304-772-4998 jhb@johnbryanlaw.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Constant, Gina)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 8, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dale Hiller. Circled Wagons Management, LLC served on 11/30/2022, answer due 12/21/2022. (Constant, Gina)
December 8, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dale Hiller. Nicholas Layman served on 11/21/2022, answer due 12/12/2022. (Constant, Gina)
December 7, 2022 Filing 7 **FILED IN ERROR**CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dale Hiller re Summons Issued Nicholas Layman (Constant, Gina) Modified on 12/9/2022 (dr).
December 7, 2022 Filing 6 **FILED IN ERROR**CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dale Hiller re Summons Issued Circled Wagons Management LLC (Constant, Gina) Modified on 12/9/2022 (dr).
November 17, 2022 Filing 5 **FILED IN ERROR** NOTICE by Dale Hiller Certificate of Good Standing (Constant, Gina) Modified on 12/13/2022 - attorney will refile (bp).
November 17, 2022 Filing 4 **FILED IN ERROR** ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Dale Hiller by John H Bryan (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Bryan, John)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] Modified on 12/13/2022 (bp).
November 17, 2022 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (dr)
November 16, 2022 Filing 3 Report re:copyright (dr)
November 16, 2022 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
November 16, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Parties ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Dale Hiller. (Constant, Gina)
November 16, 2022 United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough and United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (dr)
November 16, 2022 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-8558064 re #1 Complaint filed by Dale Hiller (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Constant, Gina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hiller v. Circled Wagons Management, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Hiller
Represented By: Gina Tassotti Constant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Hiller doing business as YouTube Channel Lackluster
Represented By: John H Bryan
Represented By: Gina Tassotti Constant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Nicholas Layman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Circled Wagons Management, LLC
Represented By: Esther C. Jamison
Represented By: Jessica M Hernandez
Represented By: Paul J. Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Lackluster Media, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?