Beverly v. Martin et al
Plaintiff: Jim Beverly doing business as Jim Beverly Company
Defendant: William Martin, Ronald A Montoya, RM Designs, Inc. and Alexander Finale
Counter Defendant: Jim Beverly
Case Number: 1:2022cv00884
Filed: November 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: John F Robbenhaar
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION for Entry of Default Pursuant to Rule 55(a) by Jim Beverly. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Affidavit) (Atkinson, Clifford)
January 17, 2023 Filing 17 JIM BEVERLY d.b.a. JIM BEVERLY COMPANY ANSWER to #10 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, OF RONALD A. MONTOYA AND RM DESIGNS, INC. FOR FRAUD ON THE COPYRIGHT OFFICE, MISUSE OF COPYRIGHT, UNFAIR TRADE PRACTICES, MALICIOUS ABUSE OF PROCESS AND DECLARATORY JUDGMENT by Jim Beverly.(Atkinson, Clifford)
January 17, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Owen Eugene Barcala on behalf of Jim Beverly (Barcala, Owen)
January 17, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Clifford K. Atkinson on behalf of Jim Beverly (Atkinson, Clifford)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference set for 2/27/2023 at 02:00 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 2/21/2023. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 2/3/2023. (cda)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing granting #12 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorneys Carlos J. Padilla and K. Stephen Royce terminated. (cda)
January 12, 2023 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Jim Beverly. (Royce, K Stephen)
January 6, 2023 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by RM Designs, Inc. (McConnell, Alicia)
January 4, 2023 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint for Copyright Infringement, COUNTERCLAIM against Jim Beverly by RM Designs, Inc., Ronald A Montoya. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Jim Beverly. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(McConnell, Alicia)
December 19, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Alicia M. McConnell on behalf of Ronald A Montoya, RM Designs, Inc. (McConnell, Alicia)
December 13, 2022 Filing 8 ERRATA re #1 Complaint by Jim Beverly (Royce, K Stephen)
December 3, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jim Beverly. Alexander Finale served on 12/1/2022, answer due 12/22/2022. (Royce, K Stephen)
November 29, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jim Beverly. Ronald A Montoya served on 11/29/2022, answer due 12/20/2022. (Royce, K Stephen)
November 29, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jim Beverly. RM Designs, Inc. served on 11/29/2022, answer due 12/20/2022. (Royce, K Stephen)
November 23, 2022 Summons Issued as to Alexander Finale. (jg)
November 23, 2022 Summons Issued as to Alexander Finale, William Martin, Ronald A Montoya. (jg)
November 21, 2022 Filing 4 Report re:copyright (dr)
November 21, 2022 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
November 21, 2022 Filing 2 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet by Jim Beverly Company, The (Royce, K Stephen)
November 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Copyright Infringement against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Jim Beverly Company, The. (Royce, K Stephen)
November 21, 2022 United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (dr)
November 21, 2022 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-8564795 re #1 Complaint filed by Jim Beverly Company, The (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Royce, K Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beverly v. Martin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Beverly doing business as Jim Beverly Company
Represented By: Carlos J. Padilla
Represented By: Justin Muehlmeyer
Represented By: K Stephen Royce
Represented By: Clifford K. Atkinson
Represented By: Owen Eugene Barcala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald A Montoya
Represented By: Alicia Mieko LaPado
Represented By: Donald Kochersberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RM Designs, Inc.
Represented By: Alicia Mieko LaPado
Represented By: Donald Kochersberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Finale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Jim Beverly
Represented By: Carlos J. Padilla
Represented By: Justin Muehlmeyer
Represented By: Owen Eugene Barcala
Represented By: K Stephen Royce
Represented By: Clifford K. Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?