Mathis v. New Mexico Children Youth & Families Department et al
Plaintiff: Eugenio S. Mathis
Defendant: New Mexico Children Youth & Families Department, Jessica Etoll, Marvin Paul, Matthew Hernandez, Melissa Garcia and John 1-10 Does
Case Number: 1:2022cv00930
Filed: December 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Referring Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eugenio S. Mathis. Melissa Garcia served on 1/23/2023, answer due 2/13/2023. (Berenson, Rachel)
January 23, 2023 Filing 10 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Eugenio S. Mathis voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Crecca, Alexander)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Counsel are to meet and confer by February 3, 2023. The parties' Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan is due by February 14, 2023. A Telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference is set for February 24, 2023, at 10:30 a.m. before Judge Khalsa. Counsel are to call Judge Khalsa's AT&T conference line at (877) 848-7030 and enter the code 7324132 to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court, a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than February 17, 2023. (nlb)
January 18, 2023 Summons Issued as to Melissa Garcia. (dr)
January 17, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eugenio S. Mathis. Matthew Hernandez served on 1/12/2023, answer due 2/2/2023. (Berenson, Rachel)
January 17, 2023 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Jessica Etoll. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Eugenio S. Mathis.(Lueras, Taylor)
January 17, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor M. Lueras on behalf of Jessica Etoll (Lueras, Taylor)
January 5, 2023 Summons Issued as to Matthew Hernandez. (jg)
January 4, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eugenio S. Mathis. New Mexico Children Youth & Families Department served on 12/22/2022, answer due 1/12/2023. (Berenson, Rachel)
January 4, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eugenio S. Mathis. Jessica Etoll served on 12/19/2022, answer due 1/9/2023. (Berenson, Rachel)
January 3, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eugenio S. Mathis. New Mexico Children Youth & Families Department served on 12/20/2022, answer due 1/10/2023. (Berenson, Rachel)
December 14, 2022 Summons Issued as to Jessica Etoll. (jg)
December 14, 2022 Summons Issued as to New Mexico Children Youth & Families Department and U.S. Attorney General (dr)
December 7, 2022 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
December 7, 2022 United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough and United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (dr)
December 6, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR CIVIL RIGHTS VIOLATIONS RESULTING IN DEATH against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Eugenio S. Mathis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Winters, Jordan)
December 6, 2022 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-8584730 re #1 Complaint filed by Eugenio S. Mathis (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Winters, Jordan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mathis v. New Mexico Children Youth & Families Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugenio S. Mathis
Represented By: Jordan E. Winters
Represented By: Sara Seymour Crecca
Represented By: Alexander D Crecca
Represented By: Rachel Berenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Mexico Children Youth & Families Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Etoll
Represented By: Alfred A Park
Represented By: Taylor M. Lueras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John 1-10 Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?