New Mexico Cattle Growers Association et al v. United States Forest Service et al
Plaintiff: New Mexico Cattle Growers Association, Spur Lake Cattle Company, Nelson Shirley, Allen Campbell and Humane Farming Association
Defendant: United States Forest Service, Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service, Camille Howes, Tom Vilsack, Randy Moore, Michiko Martin, Henry Provencio, Janet Bucknall and Keith Wehner
Intervenor: Center for Biological Diversity
Case Number: 1:2023cv00150
Filed: February 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: James O Browning
Referring Judge: Gregory B Wormuth
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 4321 Review of Agency Action-Environment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE by Allen Campbell, Humane Farming Association, New Mexico Cattle Growers Association, Nelson Shirley, Spur Lake Cattle Company re 32 Notice of Hearing on Motion,,, Request for Remote Appearance (McGuire, Daniel)
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Humane Farming Association (Blome, Jessica)
March 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Corporate Disclosure Statement by New Mexico Cattle Growers Association, Spur Lake Cattle Company (McGuire, Daniel)
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 REPLY to Response to Motion re #26 Opposed MOTION to Intervene filed by Center for Biological Diversity. (Attachments: #1 Olenhouse Response to Plaintiffs' Complaint (Lodged)) (Segee, Brian)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by District Judge James O. Browning: Joint Status Report due by 4/24/2023. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 4/27/2023 at 01:30 PM in Albuquerque - 460 Vermejo Courtroom before District Judge James O. Browning. (cmm)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE of Motion Hearing on Motion to Intervene #26 scheduled for 4/27/2023 at 01:30 PM in Albuquerque - 460 Vermejo Courtroom before District Judge James O. Browning. Should a party wish to appear remotely for this hearing they shall notify the Court by filing a written notice no later than 4/24/2023 indicating the preferred method of attendance (e.g., via telephone, via Zoom or any other desired method). Upon receipt of notification that one or more of the party(ies) wishes to appear remotely via Zoom the Court will schedule the Zoom session and provide connectivity details to the parties through separate notice/communication by the close of the business day immediately preceding the scheduled hearing. Absent notification as indicated above, the Court will presume an in-person appearance is intended and plan accordingly. (lr) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re #26 Opposed MOTION to Intervene filed by Allen Campbell, New Mexico Cattle Growers Association, Nelson Shirley, Spur Lake Cattle Company. (McGuire, Daniel)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service, Janet Bucknall, Camille Howes, Randy Moore, Henry Provencio, United States Forest Service, Tom Vilsack, Keith Wehner. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit (Second Declaration of Camille Howes, Forest Supervisor, Gila National Forest)) (Smith, Andrew)
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (bc)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Center for Biological Diversity by Brian Segee (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Segee, Brian)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE by Center for Biological Diversity of Good Standing (Wolf, Douglas)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Opposed MOTION to Intervene by Center for Biological Diversity. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit) (Wolf, Douglas)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas W Wolf on behalf of douglas w wolf, Center for Biological Diversity (Wolf, Douglas)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-8704862 re: # 28 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Center for Biological Diversity (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Segee, Brian)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica L Blome on behalf of Humane Farming Association (Blome, Jessica)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 5. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE by Allen Campbell, Humane Farming Association, New Mexico Cattle Growers Association, Nelson Shirley, Spur Lake Cattle Company re 21 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, Certification of Good Standing - Daniel D. McGuire (Edelman, Spencer)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiffs Allen Campbell, Humane Farming Association, New Mexico Cattle Growers Association, Nelson Shirley, Spur Lake Cattle Company by Spencer L Edelman on behalf of: Daniel D. McGuire FisherBroyles, LLP 450 S. Denton Tap Rd., #2211Coppell, TX 75019 214.295.7272 Fax 214.295.7252 dan.mcguire@fisherbroyles.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Edelman, Spencer)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before District Judge James O. Browning: Motion Hearing held on 2/22/2023 re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Nelson Shirley, Humane Farming Association, Allen Campbell, Spur Lake Cattle Company, New Mexico Cattle Growers Association. (Court Reporter J. Bean) (cmm)
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge James O. Browning denying Plaintiffs' request for a temporary restraining order, as set forth in Plaintiffs' Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction #6 . (lr)
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE by Humane Farming Association re 13 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, Certificate of Good Standing for Jessica L. Blome (Elsner, Gretchen)
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Christian Duffy on behalf of All Defendants (Duffy, Sean)
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 DECLARATION of Forest Supervisor Camille Howes by Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service, Janet Bucknall, Camille Howes, Michiko Martin, Randy Moore, Henry Provencio, United States Forest Service, Tom Vilsack, Keith Wehner (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (Smith, Andrew)
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 DECLARATION of Keith P. Wehner by Randy Moore, Henry Provencio, United States Forest Service, Tom Vilsack, Keith Wehner (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Hamilton, Emma)
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew A Smith on behalf of All Defendants (Smith, Andrew)
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Emma Hamilton on behalf of Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service, Janet Bucknall, Camille Howes, Michiko Martin, Randy Moore, Henry Provencio, United States Forest Service, Tom Vilsack, Keith Wehner (Hamilton, Emma)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Humane Farming Association by Gretchen Mary Elsner on behalf of: Jessica L. Blome Greenfire Law, PC 2748 Adeline, Ste. ABerkeley, CA 94703 (510) 900-9502 ext. 703 jblome@greenfirelaw.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Elsner, Gretchen)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AMENDED NOTICE (as to time only) of Motion Hearing on Plaintiff's Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction #6 , Unopposed Motion for Extension of Page Limitations #9 scheduled for 2/22/2023 at 08:45 AM in Albuquerque - 460 Vermejo Courtroom before District Judge James O. Browning. Should a party wish to appear remotely for this hearing they shall notify the Court by filing a written notice no later than 2/21/2023 indicating the preferred method of attendance (via telephone, via Zoom or any other desired method). Upon receipt of notification that one or more of the party(ies) wishes to appear remotely via Zoom the Court will schedule the Zoom session and provide connectivity details to the parties through separate notice/communication.Absent notification as indicated above, the Court will presume an in-person appearance is intended and plan accordingly. (lr) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion Hearing on Plaintiff's Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction #6 , Unopposed Motion for Extension of Page Limitations #9 scheduled for 2/22/2023 at 09:00 AM in Albuquerque - 460 Vermejo Courtroom before District Judge James O. Browning. Should a party wish to appear remotely for this hearing they shall notify the Court by filing a written notice no later than 2/21/2023 indicating the preferred method of attendance (via telephone, via Zoom or any other desired method). Upon receipt of notification that one or more of the party(ies) wishes to appear remotely via Zoom the Court will schedule the Zoom session and provide connectivity details to the parties through separate notice/communication. Absent notification as indicated above, the Court will presume an in-person appearance is intended and plan accordingly. (lr)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiffs New Mexico Cattle Growers Association, Nelson Shirley, Spur Lake Cattle Company by Daniel D. McGuire (Association Dues - Online Payment) (McGuire, Daniel)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Allen Campbell, Humane Farming Association, New Mexico Cattle Growers Association, Nelson Shirley, Spur Lake Cattle Company. (Edelman, Spencer)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge James O. Browning as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ERRATA re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction - Information Sheet for T.R.O. by Allen Campbell, Humane Farming Association, New Mexico Cattle Growers Association, Nelson Shirley, Spur Lake Cattle Company (Edelman, Spencer)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Allen Campbell, Humane Farming Association, New Mexico Cattle Growers Association, Nelson Shirley, Spur Lake Cattle Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19) (Edelman, Spencer)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REFUSAL TO CONSENT to Proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge (Edelman, Spencer)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by New Mexico Cattle Growers Association (Edelman, Spencer)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet by New Mexico Cattle Growers Association (Edelman, Spencer)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against United States Forest Service ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by New Mexico Cattle Growers Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Edelman, Spencer)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-8693264 re #1 Complaint, filed by New Mexico Cattle Growers Association (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Edelman, Spencer)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough and Chief United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth assigned. (jg)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-8694070 re: # 10 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Nelson Shirley, Spur Lake Cattle Company, New Mexico Cattle Growers Association (Payment made via Pay.gov)(McGuire, Daniel)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-8694697 re: # 13 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Humane Farming Association (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Elsner, Gretchen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New Mexico Cattle Growers Association et al v. United States Forest Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Mexico Cattle Growers Association
Represented By: Deana M Bennett
Represented By: Spencer L Edelman
Represented By: Daniel D. McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spur Lake Cattle Company
Represented By: Deana M Bennett
Represented By: Spencer L Edelman
Represented By: Daniel D. McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelson Shirley
Represented By: Deana M Bennett
Represented By: Spencer L Edelman
Represented By: Daniel D. McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Campbell
Represented By: Steven S. Scholl
Represented By: Daniel D. McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Humane Farming Association
Represented By: Gretchen Mary Elsner
Represented By: Daniel D. McGuire
Represented By: Jessica L Blome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Forest Service
Represented By: Andrew A Smith
Represented By: Emma Hamilton
Represented By: Sean Christian Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service
Represented By: Andrew A Smith
Represented By: Emma Hamilton
Represented By: Sean Christian Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camille Howes
Represented By: Andrew A Smith
Represented By: Emma Hamilton
Represented By: Sean Christian Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Vilsack
Represented By: Emma Hamilton
Represented By: Sean Christian Duffy
Represented By: Andrew A Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Moore
Represented By: Emma Hamilton
Represented By: Sean Christian Duffy
Represented By: Andrew A Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michiko Martin
Represented By: Andrew A Smith
Represented By: Emma Hamilton
Represented By: Sean Christian Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Provencio
Represented By: Andrew A Smith
Represented By: Emma Hamilton
Represented By: Sean Christian Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Bucknall
Represented By: Andrew A Smith
Represented By: Emma Hamilton
Represented By: Sean Christian Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Wehner
Represented By: Andrew A Smith
Represented By: Emma Hamilton
Represented By: Sean Christian Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Douglas W Wolf
Represented By: Brian Segee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?