Yates Ranch Property LLP et al v. Village of Wagon Mound, New Mexico et al
Plaintiff: Yates Ranch Property LLP and Jay Land Ltd. Co.
Defendant: Village of Wagon Mound, New Mexico, Andres Martinez, Village of Wagon Mound Council, Eldie R Cruz, Adrian A Clouthier, Paul A. Miera and Claudia M. Martinez
Case Number: 1:2023cv00496
Filed: June 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Fouratt
Referring Judge: Damian L Martinez
2 Judge: Kea W Riggs
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Discovery due 1/31/2024. Motions due 3/6/2024. (gbg)
August 18, 2023 Filing 23 Clerk's Minutes for telephonic Rule 16(c) hearing held on 8/16/2023 before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. (gbg)
August 10, 2023 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Village of Wagon Mound Council, Village of Wagon Mound, New Mexico Defendant's Initial Disclosures (Najjar, Jared) Modified text on 8/11/2023 (arp).
August 10, 2023 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Yates Ranch Property LLP Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures (Allen, Jamie)
August 7, 2023 Filing 20 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Yates Ranch Property LLP (Allen, Jamie)
August 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER RESETTING TELEPHONIC RULE 16(C) HEARING by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. The #9 telephonic Rule 16(c) Hearing, previously set for 8/14/2023 at 01:15 PM, is hereby RESET to 8/16/2023 at 01:15 PM. The parties shall call the Court's conference line at (888) 363-4735 and use access code 9873158 to connect to the proceedings. (gbg)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 17, 2023 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yates Ranch Property LLP. Paul A. Miera served on 06/13/23. (Stevenson, Sarah) Modified text on 7/18/2023 (arp).
July 17, 2023 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yates Ranch Property LLP. Eldie R. Cruz served on 06/13/23 (Stevenson, Sarah) Modified text on 7/18/2023 (arp).
July 17, 2023 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yates Ranch Property LLP. Claudia M. Martinez served on 06/13/23. (Stevenson, Sarah) Modified text on 7/18/2023 (arp).
July 17, 2023 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yates Ranch Property LLP. Adrian A. Clouthier served on 06/13/23. (Stevenson, Sarah) Modified text on 7/18/2023 (arp).
July 17, 2023 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yates Ranch Property LLP. Andres Martinez served on 06/13/23. (Stevenson, Sarah) Modified text on 7/18/2023 (arp).
July 17, 2023 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yates Ranch Property LLP. Village of Wagon Mound Council served on 06/13/23. (Stevenson, Sarah) Modified text on 7/18/2023 (arp).
July 17, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yates Ranch Property LLP. Village of Wagon Mound, New Mexico served on 06/13/23. (Stevenson, Sarah) Modified text on 7/18/2023 (arp).
July 13, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Samantha Adams on behalf of All Defendants (Adams, Samantha)
July 11, 2023 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE by Jay Land Ltd. Co. Proof of Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Affidavits of Service)(Stevenson, Sarah) Modified text on 7/12/2023 (arp).
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Telephonic Rule 16(c) Hearing set for 8/14/2023 at 01:15 PM before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. The parties shall call the Court's conference line at (888) 363-4735 and use access code 9873158 to connect to the proceedings. Client attendance is not required. Joint Status Report due by 8/7/2023. (gbg)
June 30, 2023 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Village of Wagon Mound, New Mexico. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Yates Ranch Property LLP.(Najjar, Jared)
June 29, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 4. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg)
June 28, 2023 Filing 6 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Kea W. Riggs as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States District Judge Martha Vazquez no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
June 27, 2023 Filing 5 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Martha Vazquez as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Damian L. Martinez no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
June 9, 2023 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (bc)
June 8, 2023 Filing 3 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number ANMDC-8863584 re #1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief and for Inverse Condemnation against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Yates Ranch Property LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Village of Wagon Mound Ord No 2023-01, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Stevenson, Sarah) filed by Yates Ranch Property LLP (cmm)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
June 8, 2023 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Damian L. Martinez to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bc)
June 8, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief and for Inverse Condemnation against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Yates Ranch Property LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Village of Wagon Mound Ord No 2023-01, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Stevenson, Sarah)
June 8, 2023 United States Magistrate Judge Damian L. Martinez and United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt assigned. (bc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yates Ranch Property LLP et al v. Village of Wagon Mound, New Mexico et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yates Ranch Property LLP
Represented By: Maria O'Brien
Represented By: Sarah M Stevenson
Represented By: Jamie L. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Land Ltd. Co.
Represented By: Jamie L. Allen
Represented By: Sarah M Stevenson
Represented By: Maria O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village of Wagon Mound, New Mexico
Represented By: Jared Daniel Albert Najjar
Represented By: Samantha Adams
Represented By: Stephen C Ross
Represented By: Amanda Kaye Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andres Martinez
Represented By: Amanda Kaye Nelson
Represented By: Jared Daniel Albert Najjar
Represented By: Samantha Adams
Represented By: Stephen C Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village of Wagon Mound Council
Represented By: Amanda Kaye Nelson
Represented By: Jared Daniel Albert Najjar
Represented By: Samantha Adams
Represented By: Stephen C Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eldie R Cruz
Represented By: Amanda Kaye Nelson
Represented By: Jared Daniel Albert Najjar
Represented By: Samantha Adams
Represented By: Stephen C Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrian A Clouthier
Represented By: Amanda Kaye Nelson
Represented By: Jared Daniel Albert Najjar
Represented By: Samantha Adams
Represented By: Stephen C Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul A. Miera
Represented By: Amanda Kaye Nelson
Represented By: Jared Daniel Albert Najjar
Represented By: Samantha Adams
Represented By: Stephen C Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claudia M. Martinez
Represented By: Amanda Kaye Nelson
Represented By: Jared Daniel Albert Najjar
Represented By: Samantha Adams
Represented By: Stephen C Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?