Santa Fe Goldworks, Inc. et al v. Bella Jewelry, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Santa Fe Goldworks, Inc.
Defendant: Bella Jewelry, LLC, Bella Fine Jewelry and Art, Amini Enterprise Inc., Amini Brothers, LLC, SFA Enterprises, Frank Amini, Kevin Karimi, Manic Enterprises LLC, The Catalogues, Bella Jewelry, LLC doing business as Bella Fine Jewelry and Art, Amini Brothers, LLC doing business as SFA Enterprises and Manic Enterprises LLC doing business as The Catalogues
Counter Defendant: David Griego
Counter Claimant: Cindy DeNapoli
Case Number: 1:2023cv00602
Filed: July 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Referring Judge: Jennifer M Rozzoni
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2023 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Manic Enterprises LLC (Banner, Thomas)
September 13, 2023 Filing 16 Manic Enterprises, LLC and Cindy DeNapoli's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against David Griego, Santa Fe Goldworks, Inc. by Manic Enterprises LLC, Cindy DeNapoli. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Santa Fe Goldworks, Inc., David Griego.(Banner, Thomas)
August 22, 2023 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Santa Fe Goldworks, Inc., David Griego. Cindy DeNapoli served on 8/18/2023, answer due 9/8/2023. (Trabaudo, Billy)
August 9, 2023 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Santa Fe Goldworks, Inc., David Griego. Manic Enterprises LLC served on 8/9/2023, answer due 8/30/2023. (Allison, Benjamin)
August 1, 2023 Filing 13 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), David Griego, Santa Fe Goldworks, Inc. voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Allison, Benjamin)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 31, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Santa Fe Goldworks, Inc., David Griego. Bella Jewelry, LLC served on 7/31/2023, answer due 8/21/2023. (Allison, Benjamin)
July 31, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Santa Fe Goldworks, Inc., David Griego. Amini Enterprise Inc. served on 7/31/2023, answer due 8/21/2023. (Allison, Benjamin)
July 31, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Santa Fe Goldworks, Inc., David Griego. Amini Brothers, LLC served on 7/31/2023, answer due 8/21/2023; SFA Enterprises served on 7/31/2023, answer due 8/21/2023. (Allison, Benjamin)
July 31, 2023 Filing 9 FILED IN ERROR - SUMMONS Returned Executed by Santa Fe Goldworks, Inc., David Griego. All Plaintiffs. (Allison, Benjamin) Modified docket text on 7/31/2023 (am).
July 28, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Santa Fe Goldworks, Inc., David Griego. Kevin Karimi served on 7/26/2023, answer due 8/16/2023. (Allison, Benjamin)
July 28, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Santa Fe Goldworks, Inc., David Griego. Frank Amini served on 7/25/2023, answer due 8/15/2023. (Allison, Benjamin)
July 27, 2023 Filing 6 **FILED IN ERROR**AFFIDAVIT of Service - Kevin Karimi by David Griego, Santa Fe Goldworks, Inc. (Allison, Benjamin) Modified on 7/28/2023 (dr).
July 27, 2023 Filing 5 **FILED IN ERROR**AFFIDAVIT of Service - Frank Amini by David Griego, Santa Fe Goldworks, Inc. (Allison, Benjamin) Modified on 7/28/2023 (dr).
July 21, 2023 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by David Griego, Santa Fe Goldworks, Inc. (Allison, Benjamin)
July 18, 2023 Summons Issued as to Kevin Karimi. (jg)
July 18, 2023 Filing 3 Report re: copyright (jg)
July 18, 2023 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
July 18, 2023 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 6 (Santa Fe) to 1 (Albuquerque). (jg)
July 18, 2023 United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa and United States Magistrate Judge Jennifer M. Rozzoni assigned. (jg)
July 18, 2023 Summons Issued as to Frank Amini, Amini Brothers, LLC, Amini Enterprise Inc., Bella Jewelry, LLC, Cindy DeNapoli, Manic Enterprises LLC. (jg)
July 17, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Santa Fe Goldworks, Inc., David Griego. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Allison, Benjamin)
July 17, 2023 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-8918886 re #1 Complaint filed by Santa Fe Goldworks, Inc., David Griego (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Allison, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santa Fe Goldworks, Inc. et al v. Bella Jewelry, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santa Fe Goldworks, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin W Allison
Represented By: Billy Trabaudo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: David Griego
Represented By: Benjamin W Allison
Represented By: Billy Trabaudo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bella Jewelry, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bella Fine Jewelry and Art
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amini Enterprise Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amini Brothers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFA Enterprises
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Amini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Karimi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manic Enterprises LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Catalogues
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bella Jewelry, LLC doing business as Bella Fine Jewelry and Art
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amini Brothers, LLC doing business as SFA Enterprises
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manic Enterprises LLC doing business as The Catalogues
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Cindy DeNapoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?