McKinzie v. Concentrix CVG Customer Management Group Inc.
Plaintiff: Latasha McKinzie
Defendant: Concentrix CVG Customer Management Group Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv00670
Filed: August 11, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Referring Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STATUS REPORT AND PROVISIONAL DISCOVERY PLAN WITH CHANGES AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Plaintiff to seek leave to join and amend by November 20, 2023. Defendant to seek leave to join and amend by December 4, 2023. Plaintiff's expert disclosures due by January 12, 2024. Defendant's expert disclosures due by February 12, 2024. Discovery due by March 29, 2024. Discovery motions due by April 18, 2024. Pretrial motions due by June 24, 2024. Proposed Pretrial Order due from Plaintiff to Defendant by September 23, 2024 and from Defendant to the Court by October 7, 2024. (nlb)
October 5, 2023 Filing 19 Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 10/5/2023. (nlb)
September 25, 2023 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Latasha McKinzie for Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (Curtice, Stephen)
September 25, 2023 Filing 17 Joint Status Report by Concentrix CVG Customer Management Group Inc. (Burns, Clara)
September 25, 2023 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Concentrix CVG Customer Management Group Inc. Defendant's Initial Disclosures (Burns, Clara)
September 20, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE by Concentrix CVG Customer Management Group Inc. re Association Dues for Attorney Licensed Outside the District, 14 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, Mekesha Montgomery (Burns, Clara)
September 20, 2023 Filing 14 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Concentrix CVG Customer Management Group Inc. by Clara B Burns on behalf of: Mekesha H. Montgomery Frost Brown Todd LLP 150 3rd Ave. South, Suit 1900Nashville, TN 37201 615-251-5550 mmontgomery@fbtlaw.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Burns, Clara)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
September 20, 2023 Filing 13 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Concentrix CVG Customer Management Group Inc. by Mekesha H Montgomery (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Montgomery, Mekesha)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
September 20, 2023 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-9014653 re: # 14 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Concentrix CVG Customer Management Group Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Burns, Clara)
September 19, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE by Concentrix CVG Customer Management Group Inc. re 11 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, Seth Granda (Burns, Clara)
September 19, 2023 Filing 11 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Concentrix CVG Customer Management Group Inc. by Clara B Burns on behalf of: Seth Granda Frost Brown Todd LLP 150 3rd Ave. South, Suit 1900Nashville, TN 37201 615-251-5550 sgranda@fbtlaw.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Burns, Clara)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
September 19, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 8 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Latasha McKinzie, 5 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Concentrix CVG Customer Management Group Inc.. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
September 19, 2023 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-9011377 re: # 11 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Concentrix CVG Customer Management Group Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Burns, Clara)
September 12, 2023 Filing 9 **FILED IN ERROR** ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Concentrix CVG Customer Management Group Inc. by Seth Granda (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Granda, Seth)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] Modified on 9/19/2023 - Local counsel will refile. (bp).
September 5, 2023 Filing 8 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Latasha McKinzie voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Curtice, Stephen)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
September 5, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Curtice on behalf of Latasha McKinzie (Curtice, Stephen)
August 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Counsel and pro se parties are to meet and confer by September 14, 2023. The parties' Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan is due by September 25, 2023. A Telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference is set for October 5, 2023, at 10:30 a.m. MT before Judge Khalsa. Counsel are to call Judge Khalsa's AT&T conference line at (877) 848-7030 and enter the code 7324132 to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court, a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than September 29, 2023. (nlb)
August 15, 2023 Filing 5 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Concentrix CVG Customer Management Group Inc. voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Burns, Clara)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 11, 2023 Filing 4 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number ANMDC-8956046 re #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Concentrix CVG Customer Management Group Inc. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Concentrix CVG Customer Management Group Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit State Court Pleadings)(Burns, Clara) filed by Concentrix CVG Customer Management Group Inc. (arp)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 11, 2023 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bc)
August 11, 2023 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Concentrix CVG Customer Management Group Inc.. (Burns, Clara)
August 11, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Concentrix CVG Customer Management Group Inc. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Concentrix CVG Customer Management Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Pleadings)(Burns, Clara)
August 11, 2023 United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter and United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (bc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKinzie v. Concentrix CVG Customer Management Group Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latasha McKinzie
Represented By: Stephen Curtice
Represented By: James A. Montalbano
Represented By: Shane C Youtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Concentrix CVG Customer Management Group Inc.
Represented By: Seth Granda
Represented By: Mekesha H Montgomery
Represented By: Clara B Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?