Cairns v. Avis Budget Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Norman Wayne Cairns
Defendant: Avis Budget Group, Inc., Sedgwick Claims Management Services, ABG Recovery and Sedwick Claims MGMT Services, ABG Recovery US
Case Number: 1:2023cv00695
Filed: August 19, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Referring Judge: John F Robbenhaar
2 Judge: David H Urias
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by District Judge David H. Urias OVERRULING #6 Response (Objection) to Magistrate's Order and DENYING Request for Court Approval of Settlement Negotiations (bap)
September 20, 2023 Filing 12 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa as the pretrial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
September 19, 2023 Filing 11 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly reassigned to United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough as the pretrial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Jennifer M. Rozzoni no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bc)
September 19, 2023 Filing 10 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly reassigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jennifer M. Rozzoni as the pretrial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bc)
September 19, 2023 Filing 9 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly reassigned to United States District Judge David H. Urias as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bc)
September 12, 2023 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT , filed by Norman Wayne Cairns. (Cairns, Norman) Modified text on 9/13/2023 (jjs).
September 12, 2023 United States District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales assigned. (bc)
September 11, 2023 Filing 7 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea has been randomly reassigned for a 28 U.S.C. 1915 review. (bc)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
September 11, 2023 United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea assigned. Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar no longer assigned to case. (bc)
September 8, 2023 Filing 6 Plaintiff's RESPONSE re #5 Order filed by Norman Wayne Cairns. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Motion, #2 Supplement Order) (Cairns, Norman)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR AMENDED COMPLAINT by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. (ajp)
August 24, 2023 Summons Issued as to Avis Budget Group, Inc., Sedwick Claims MGMT Services, ABG Recovery US. (bc)
August 21, 2023 Filing 4 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number ANMDC-8968544 re #1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Norman Wayne Cairns. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Supplement Attachment A, # 3 Supplement Attachment B, # 4 Supplement Attachment C-1, # 5 Supplement Attachment C-2, # 6 Supplement Attachment C-3, # 7 Supplement Attachment C-4, # 8 Supplement Attachment D, # 9 Supplement Attachment E, # 10 Supplement Attachment F, # 11 Supplement Attachment G, # 12 Supplement Attachment H, # 13 Supplement Attachment I, # 14 Supplement Attachment J, # 15 Supplement Attachment K, # 16 Supplement Attachment L, # 17 Supplement Attachment M, # 18 Supplement Attachment N, # 19 Supplement Attachment O, # 20 Supplement Attachment P, # 21 Supplement Attachment Q, # 22 Supplement Attachment R, # 23 Supplement Attachment S, # 24 Supplement Attachment T, # 25 Supplement Attachment U, # 26 Supplement Attachment V, # 27 Supplement Attachment W, # 28 Supplement Attachment X, # 29 Supplement Attachment Y)(Cairns, Norman) filed by Norman Wayne Cairns (arp)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 21, 2023 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar has been assigned for a 28 U.S.C. 1915 review. (bc)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 21, 2023 Filing 2 FILED IN ERROR: PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bc) Modified on 8/21/2023 (bc).
August 21, 2023 United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (bc) Modified to correct text on 8/21/2023 (bc).
August 20, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Norman Wayne Cairns. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Attachment A, #3 Supplement Attachment B, #4 Supplement Attachment C-1, #5 Supplement Attachment C-2, #6 Supplement Attachment C-3, #7 Supplement Attachment C-4, #8 Supplement Attachment D, #9 Supplement Attachment E, #10 Supplement Attachment F, #11 Supplement Attachment G, #12 Supplement Attachment H, #13 Supplement Attachment I, #14 Supplement Attachment J, #15 Supplement Attachment K, #16 Supplement Attachment L, #17 Supplement Attachment M, #18 Supplement Attachment N, #19 Supplement Attachment O, #20 Supplement Attachment P, #21 Supplement Attachment Q, #22 Supplement Attachment R, #23 Supplement Attachment S, #24 Supplement Attachment T, #25 Supplement Attachment U, #26 Supplement Attachment V, #27 Supplement Attachment W, #28 Supplement Attachment X, #29 Supplement Attachment Y)(Cairns, Norman)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cairns v. Avis Budget Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman Wayne Cairns
Represented By: Norman Wayne Cairns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avis Budget Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sedgwick Claims Management Services, ABG Recovery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sedwick Claims MGMT Services, ABG Recovery US
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?