Donk et al v. Grisham et al
Plaintiff: Randy Donk, Gun Owners of America, Inc. and Gun Owners Foundation
Defendant: Michelle Lujan Grisham, Patrick M. Allen, Jason R. Bowie and Troy W. Weisler
Case Number: 1:2023cv00772
Filed: September 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: David H Urias
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2023 Filing 34 "FILED IN ERROR" SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gun Owners of America, Inc.. (Caruso, Mark) Modified on 10/27/2023 **NEED TO REFILE IN LEAD CASE 23cv771 ** (bap).
October 26, 2023 Filing 33 "FILED IN ERROR" SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gun Owners of America, Inc.. (Caruso, Mark) Modified on 10/27/2023 **NEED TO REFILE IN LEAD CASE 23cv771 **(bap).
October 26, 2023 Filing 32 "FILED IN ERROR" SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gun Owners of America, Inc.. (Caruso, Mark) Modified on 10/27/2023 **NEED TO REFILE IN LEAD CASE 23cv771 ** (bap).
October 26, 2023 Filing 31 "FILED IN ERROR" SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gun Owners of America, Inc.. (Caruso, Mark) Modified on 10/27/2023 ** NEED TO REFILE IN LEAD CASE 23cv771 **(bap).
October 26, 2023 Filing 30 'FILED IN ERROR" SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gun Owners of America, Inc.. (Caruso, Mark) Modified on 10/27/2023 ** NEED TO REFILE IN LEAD CASE 23cv771 ** (bap).
October 26, 2023 Filing 29 **DUPLICATE**SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gun Owners of America, Inc.. (Caruso, Mark) Modified on 10/26/2023 (jjs).
October 26, 2023 Filing 28 "FILED IN ERROR" SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gun Owners of America, Inc.. Gun Owners of America, Inc. served on 10/18/2023, answer due 11/8/2023. (Caruso, Mark) Modified on 10/27/2023 **NEED TO REFILE IN LEAD CASE 23cv771** (bap).
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES by District Judge David H. Urias. Cases: 23-CV-771, 23-CV-772, 23-CV-773, 23-CV-774, 23-CV-778, and 23-CV-839. All pleadings shall be filed under the lead case number 23-CV-773. (fs)
October 6, 2023 Filing 26 BRIEF Supplemental Brief In Support of Preliminary Injunction as to the Amended Public Health Order Issued September 15, 2023 by Randy Donk, Gun Owners Foundation, Gun Owners of America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1) (Napolitano, Anthony)
October 5, 2023 Filing 24 NOTICE OF HEARING WITH VIDEO STREAMING: Status Conference set for 10/18/2023 at 11:00 AM Remote via Zoom before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. (cda)NOTE:1. This proceeding will be held via Zoom Video/Web Conferencing with all participants appearing remotely; The Zoom ID and Passcode will be docketed separately and available to the parties but not the public. 2. Participants should connect to the proceeding 15 minutes prior its scheduled start time to allow time for trouble-shooting of any connectivity issues.3. To ensure the record is of the best quality participants are encouraged to utilize a headset to reduce static and background noise; if not using a headset participants must ensure the audio feed at their location is muted when not speaking.*** REMINDER: Recording or broadcasting of this hearing is prohibited. ***This hearing will be available for remote viewing by video stream.Please visit the Court's website at #www.nmd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions to connect.
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by District Judge David H. Urias: DENYING Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction as to Defendants Public Health Order dated September 8, 2023 (Original PHO) on mootness grounds; Extending Temporary Restraining Order as to firearms restrictions in public parks until October 11, 2023; The Court takes Plaintiffs request for a preliminary injunction as to the Amended Public Health Order issued September 15, 2023, under advisement. (CRG) THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.
October 3, 2023 Filing 22 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before District Judge David H. Urias: Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 10/3/2023. (Court Reporter C. McAlister) (fs)
October 3, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Holly Agajanian on behalf of All Defendants (Agajanian, Holly)
October 3, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE OF PUBLIC ACCESS TO HEARING scheduled for 10/3/2023 at 10:00 AM:AUDIO connection to this hearing can be accessed by following the link below and using the login information provided:#Click here to access public hearing.USERNAME: audioPASSWORD: 07FE9C (jmg)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
October 3, 2023 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (bc)
October 2, 2023 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Patrick M. Allen, Jason R. Bowie, Michelle Lujan Grisham, Troy W. Weisler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Agajanian, Holly)
September 22, 2023 Filing 18 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on September 13, 2023, before District Judge David H. Urias. Court Reporter/Transcriber Carmela McAlister, Telephone number 505-348-2094. Transcript may be viewed at the Clerk's Office public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that each party now has seven (7) calendar days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of any personal identifiers from this transcript. If no notice is filed during this seven-day period, the court will assume that redaction of personal data is not necessary and will make the transcript electronically available, as is, to the public after 90 days. For additional guidance, PLEASE REVIEW the complete policy, located in the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures Manual at https://www.nmd.uscourts.gov. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction set for 9/29/2023. Redaction Request due 10/13/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/23/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/21/2023.(cm)
September 18, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Roman Napolitano on behalf of Randy Donk, Gun Owners Foundation, Gun Owners of America, Inc. (Napolitano, Anthony)
September 15, 2023 Set Hearing as to Motion Hearing set for 10/3/2023 at 10:00 AM in Albuquerque - 420 Mimbres Courtroom before District Judge David H. Urias. (arp)
September 15, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction set for 10/3/2023 at 10:00 AM in Albuquerque - 420 Mimbres Courtroom before District Judge David H. Urias. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.](jdf)
September 13, 2023 Filing 15 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before District Judge David H. Urias: Motion Hearing held on 9/13/2023 re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Gun Owners Foundation, Gun Owners of America, Inc., Randy Donk. (Court Reporter C. McAlister) (fs)
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by District Judge David H. Urias GRANTING #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (jdf). Modified on 9/14/2023 (bc).
September 13, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE OF PUBLIC ACCESS TO HEARING scheduled for 9/13/2023 at 1:00 PM:AUDIO connection to this hearing can be accessed by following the link below and using the login information provided:#Click here to access public hearing.USERNAME: audioPASSWORD: 7AE9EC (jmg)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
September 13, 2023 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Randy Donk Certificate of Service Complaint (Caruso, Mark)
September 13, 2023 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Randy Donk Certificate of Service Notice of Hearing (Caruso, Mark)
September 13, 2023 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Randy Donk Certificate of Service to Attorney General (Caruso, Mark)
September 12, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Roman Napolitano on behalf of Gun Owners of America, Inc. (Napolitano, Anthony)
September 12, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Stamboulieh on behalf of Randy Donk, Gun Owners Foundation, Gun Owners of America, Inc. (Stamboulieh, Stephen)
September 12, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order : Motion Hearing set for 9/13/2023 at 01:00 PM in Albuquerque - 420 Mimbres Courtroom before District Judge David H. Urias. (jmg)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
September 11, 2023 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDERVACATING the hearing on Temporary Restraining Order set for 9/12/2023. The hearing will be reset at a later date.THIS IS A TEXT ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED. (jmg)
September 11, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order : Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2023 at 11:00 AM in Albuquerque - 420 Mimbres Courtroom before District Judge David H. Urias. (jmg)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
September 11, 2023 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gun Owners Foundation (Caruso, Mark)
September 11, 2023 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gun Owners of America, Inc. (Caruso, Mark)
September 11, 2023 United States District Judge David H. Urias and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (dr)
September 9, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by RANDY DONK, GUN OWNERS FOUNDATION, GUN OWNERS OF AMERICA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 TRO Cover Page) (Caruso, Mark)
September 9, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Patrick M. Allen, Jason R. Bowie, Michelle Lujan Grisham, Troy W. Weisler ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by RANDY DONK, GUN OWNERS FOUNDATION, GUN OWNERS OF AMERICA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Governor EO, #2 Exhibit Public Health Order, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Randy Donk, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Erich Pratt, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons on Gov, #7 Summons on Jason Bowie, #8 Summons on Patrick Allen, #9 Summons on Weisler)(Caruso, Mark)
September 9, 2023 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-8997776 re #1 Complaint,, filed by RANDY DONK, GUN OWNERS FOUNDATION, GUN OWNERS OF AMERICA, INC. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Caruso, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Donk et al v. Grisham et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Donk
Represented By: Mark J Caruso
Represented By: Stephen Stamboulieh
Represented By: Anthony Roman Napolitano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gun Owners of America, Inc.
Represented By: Mark J Caruso
Represented By: Anthony Roman Napolitano
Represented By: Stephen Stamboulieh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gun Owners Foundation
Represented By: Mark J Caruso
Represented By: Anthony Roman Napolitano
Represented By: Stephen Stamboulieh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Lujan Grisham
Represented By: Holly Agajanian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick M. Allen
Represented By: Holly Agajanian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason R. Bowie
Represented By: Holly Agajanian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy W. Weisler
Represented By: Holly Agajanian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?