Vigil et al v. Federal Emergency Management Agency et al
Plaintiff: Mary Vigil, Frank Vigil, Martin Sandoval and Patrick Griego
Defendant: Federal Emergency Management Agency, Department of Homeland Security, National Resources Conservation Service, United States Department of Agriculture and Angela Gladwell
Case Number: 1:2023cv00941
Filed: October 25, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: James O Browning
Referring Judge: John F Robbenhaar
2 Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2023 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Patrick Griego, Martin Sandoval, Frank Vigil, Mary Vigil (Dow, Mark)
November 28, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by All Plaintiffs re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by Patrick Griego, Frank Vigil, Martin Sandoval, Mary Vigil (Dow, Mark)
November 28, 2023 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by Patrick Griego, Martin Sandoval, Frank Vigil, Mary Vigil. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Dow, Mark)
November 14, 2023 Filing 19 RESPONSE re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by Department of Homeland Security, Federal Emergency Management Agency, Angela Gladwell, National Resources Conservation Service, United States Department of Agriculture. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Siler Declaration), #2 Exhibit A-1 (Siler Decl. Ex. 1), #3 Exhibit A-2 (Siler Decl. Ex. 2), #4 Exhibit B (FEMA & NRCS MOU), #5 Exhibit C (Dow Letter), #6 Exhibit D (Tosdal Letter)) (Sydow, Nicholas)
November 14, 2023 Summons Issued as to Department of Homeland Security, Federal Emergency Management Agency, Angela Gladwell, National Resources Conservation Service, United States Department of Agriculture, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (dr)
November 8, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: Nos. 4 and 5. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg)
November 7, 2023 Filing 18 Letter to Court by Nicholas M. Sydow, AUSA. (cmm)
November 6, 2023 Filing 22 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before District Judge James O. Browning: Motion Hearing held on 11/6/2023 re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by Patrick Griego, Frank Vigil, Martin Sandoval, Mary Vigil. (Court Reporter J. Bean) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (cmm)
November 6, 2023 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT re #15 Brief,, ATTORNEY DECLARATION (Mark Dow, Cynthia Weisman) by Patrick Griego, Martin Sandoval, Frank Vigil, Mary Vigil (Dow, Mark)
November 6, 2023 Filing 15 BRIEF re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Patrick Griego, Martin Sandoval, Frank Vigil, Mary Vigil (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 14, 10/6/23 FEMA letter, #2 Exhibit 15,.Rule 16-402, #3 Exhibit 16, Rule 16-804) (Dow, Mark)
November 6, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE by Patrick Griego, Martin Sandoval, Frank Vigil, Mary Vigil State Bar of Texas Certificate of Good Standing - Bill Robins (Roybal-Mack, Antonia)
November 3, 2023 Filing 13 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiffs Patrick Griego, Martin Sandoval, Frank Vigil, Mary Vigil by Antonia Roybal-Mack on behalf of: Bill Robins Robins Cloud LLP 808 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 450Santa Monica, CA 90401 310-929-4200 robins@robinscloud.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Roybal-Mack, Antonia)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
November 3, 2023 Filing 12 DECLARATION by Patrick Griego (Roybal-Mack, Antonia)
November 3, 2023 Filing 11 FILED IN ERROR - ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Martin Sandoval by Antonia Roybal-Mack on behalf of: Thomas Tosdal Tosdal Law Firm P.O. Box 109Ovando, MT 59854 858-877-0223 tom@tosdallaw.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Roybal-Mack, Antonia)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] Modified docket text on 11/6/2023 (am).
November 3, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion Hearing on Application for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Regarding Preliminary Injunction #8 scheduled for 11/6/2023 at 10:30 AM in Albuquerque - 460 Vermejo Courtroom before District Judge James O. Browning. For the convenience of parties wishing to appear remotely, the Court will schedule a Zoom session and provide connectivity details to counsel of record through separate notice/communication. (lr)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
November 3, 2023 Filing 9 BRIEF re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION MEMORANDUM BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Patrick Griego, Martin Sandoval, Frank Vigil, Mary Vigil (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4 Griego Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 4A FEMA signature, #3 Exhibit 5 excerpt from Ex 1, #4 Exhibit 6 8-4-23 letter, #5 Exhibit 7 8-16-23 letter, #6 Exhibit 8 8-25-23 letter, #7 Exhibit 9 9-1-23 letter, #8 Exhibit 10 9-15-23 letter, #9 Exhibit 11 9-25-23 letter, #10 Exhibit 12 9-27-23 email, #11 Exhibit 13 9-27-23 email) (Dow, Mark)
November 3, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Patrick Griego, Martin Sandoval, Frank Vigil, Mary Vigil. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Draft TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION) (Dow, Mark)
November 3, 2023 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT VERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR (I) TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION, AND (II) DECLARATORY RELIEF against All Plaintiffs. adding Patrick Griego., filed by Martin Sandoval, Frank Vigil, Mary Vigil. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Attorney Verification of First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Vigil Decl, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 Sandoval Decl, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 Brant letter)(Dow, Mark)
November 3, 2023 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-9077866 re: # 13 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Patrick Griego, Frank Vigil, Martin Sandoval, Mary Vigil (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Roybal-Mack, Antonia)
November 2, 2023 Filing 6 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly reassigned to United States District Judge James O. Browning as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bc)
October 25, 2023 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
October 25, 2023 Filing 2 COMPLAINT For Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Mary Vigil. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Dow, Mark)
October 25, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE by Mary Vigil Civil Cover Sheet (Dow, Mark)
October 25, 2023 United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (dr)
October 25, 2023 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-9063440 re #2 Complaint filed by Mary Vigil (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Dow, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vigil et al v. Federal Emergency Management Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Vigil
Represented By: Antonia Roybal-Mack
Represented By: Christopher P. Bauman
Represented By: Mark Dow
Represented By: Cynthia L. Weisman
Represented By: Darren Cordova
Represented By: Bill Robins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Vigil
Represented By: Christopher P. Bauman
Represented By: Cynthia L. Weisman
Represented By: Darren Cordova
Represented By: Mark Dow
Represented By: Antonia Roybal-Mack
Represented By: Bill Robins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Sandoval
Represented By: Darren Cordova
Represented By: Antonia Roybal-Mack
Represented By: Cynthia L. Weisman
Represented By: Mark Dow
Represented By: Christopher P. Bauman
Represented By: Bill Robins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Griego
Represented By: Bill Robins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Emergency Management Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Resources Conservation Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Gladwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?