Gonzales et al v. Progressive Direct Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Ruby Gonzales, Aaliyah Santos and Harmony Gonzales
Defendant: Progressive Direct Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2023cv00954
Filed: October 31, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Fouratt
Referring Judge: Damian L Martinez
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER AMENDING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Damian L. Martinez. The Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 1/3/2024 at 10:30 AM is VACATED and RESET for 1/2/2024 at 10:30 AM. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (im)
December 15, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER by Magistrate Judge Damian L. Martinez AMENDING Initial Scheduling Order #4 . The Rule 16(c) Hearing set for 12/21/2023 is VACATED and RESET for 1/3/2024 at 10:30 AM. All other provisions and deadlines of the Initial Scheduling Order #4 remain in effect. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (im)
December 14, 2023 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ruby Gonzales Initial disclosures . (Voorhees, Scott) Modified text as per chambers on 12/15/2023 (ac).
December 12, 2023 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Progressive Direct Insurance Company Progressive's Initial Disclosures (Kaselonis, Taryn)
December 11, 2023 Filing 10 Joint Status Report by Progressive Direct Insurance Company (Kaselonis, Taryn)
November 30, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge on January 4, 2024, unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (am)
November 22, 2023 Filing 8 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Ruby Gonzales voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Voorhees, Scott)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
November 9, 2023 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Progressive Direct Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Progressive Corporation, Corporate Parent Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc. for Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Kaselonis, Taryn)
November 9, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE by Progressive Direct Insurance Company Amended Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Kaselonis, Taryn)
November 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Damian L. Martinez. Amended Notice of Removal no later than 21 days after the entry of this order. All parties subject to Rule 7.1(a)(2) shall file a disclosure statement no later than 21 days after the entry of this order. (im)
November 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Damian L. Martinez. Joint Status Report due by 12/11/2023. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 12/21/2023 at 09:00 AM. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 11/27/2023. (Attachments: #1 Supplement) (im)
October 31, 2023 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
October 31, 2023 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Kaselonis, Taryn)
October 31, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Progressive Direct Insurance Company from First Judicial District Court, County of Santa Fe, State of New Mexico, case number D-101-CV-2023-02383. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kaselonis, Taryn)
October 31, 2023 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-9070405 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Progressive Direct Insurance Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Kaselonis, Taryn)
October 31, 2023 United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt and United States Magistrate Judge Damian L. Martinez assigned. (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzales et al v. Progressive Direct Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruby Gonzales
Represented By: Scott F. Voorhees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaliyah Santos
Represented By: Scott F. Voorhees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harmony Gonzales
Represented By: Scott F. Voorhees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Direct Insurance Company
Represented By: Courtenay L Keller
Represented By: Taryn M Kaselonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?