Doe et al v. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement et al
Plaintiff: Carlos Doe, Luis Doe, Ernesto Doe and Gabriel Doe
Defendant: U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Alejandro Mayorkas, Patrick J Lechleitner, Ricardo A Wong, Monica S Burke, Brittany Tobias and Mary De Anda-Ybarra
Case Number: 1:2023cv00971
Filed: November 3, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Matthew L Garcia
Referring Judge: Jennifer M Rozzoni
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jennifer M. Rozzoni. Status Conference set for 1/9/2024 at 10:30 AM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Jennifer M. Rozzoni. (ccp)
December 19, 2023 Filing 26 NOTICE by Monica S Burke, Mary De Anda-Ybarra, Patrick J Lechleitner, Alejandro Mayorkas, Brittany Tobias, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Ricardo A Wong re #8 MOTION to Certify Class (Slaughter, Ross)
December 19, 2023 Filing 25 NOTICE by Monica S Burke, Mary De Anda-Ybarra, Patrick J Lechleitner, Alejandro Mayorkas, Brittany Tobias, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Ricardo A Wong re #2 MOTION for Leave to File Proceed Under Pseudonym (Slaughter, Ross)
December 15, 2023 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Ross McNeill Slaughter on behalf of All Defendants (Slaughter, Ross)
December 4, 2023 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ernesto Doe, Luis Doe, Carlos Doe, Gabriel Doe. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 11/30/2023, answer due 1/19/2024. (Sheff, Rebecca)
December 4, 2023 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ernesto Doe, Luis Doe, Carlos Doe, Gabriel Doe. U.S. Attorney General served on 11/16/2023, answer due 1/16/2024. (Sheff, Rebecca) Modified text on 12/4/2023 (arp).
December 4, 2023 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ernesto Doe, Luis Doe, Carlos Doe, Gabriel Doe. U.S. Attorneys Office served on 11/16/2023, answer due 1/16/2024. (Sheff, Rebecca) Modified on 12/4/2023 (arp).
December 1, 2023 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ernesto Doe, Luis Doe, Carlos Doe, Gabriel Doe. Ricardo A Wong served on 11/20/2023, answer due 1/19/2024. (Sheff, Rebecca)
December 1, 2023 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ernesto Doe, Luis Doe, Carlos Doe, Gabriel Doe. Patrick J Lechleitner served on 11/20/2023, answer due 1/19/2024. (Sheff, Rebecca)
December 1, 2023 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ernesto Doe, Luis Doe, Carlos Doe, Gabriel Doe. Monica S Burke served on 11/20/2023, answer due 1/19/2024. (Sheff, Rebecca)
December 1, 2023 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ernesto Doe, Luis Doe, Carlos Doe, Gabriel Doe. Mary De Anda-Ybarra served on 11/20/2023, answer due 1/19/2024. (Sheff, Rebecca)
December 1, 2023 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ernesto Doe, Luis Doe, Carlos Doe, Gabriel Doe. U.S. Department of Homeland Security served on 11/20/2023, answer due 1/19/2024. (Sheff, Rebecca)
December 1, 2023 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ernesto Doe, Luis Doe, Carlos Doe, Gabriel Doe. Brittany Tobias served on 11/20/2023, answer due 1/19/2024. (Sheff, Rebecca)
December 1, 2023 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ernesto Doe, Luis Doe, Carlos Doe, Gabriel Doe. Alejandro Mayorkas served on 11/20/2023, answer due 1/19/2024. (Sheff, Rebecca)
November 16, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 6. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg)
November 16, 2023 Summons Issued as to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement.(dr)
November 14, 2023 Summons Issued as to Monica S Burke, Mary De Anda-Ybarra, Patrick J Lechleitner, Alejandro Mayorkas, Brittany Tobias, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (dr)
November 7, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE by Carlos Doe, Ernesto Doe, Gabriel Doe, Luis Doe of Good Standing (Sheff, Rebecca)
November 7, 2023 Filing 11 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiffs Carlos Doe, Ernesto Doe, Gabriel Doe, Luis Doe by Rebecca Fae Sherman Sheff on behalf of: Deepa Acharya Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP 1300 I St. NW, Suite 900Washington, DC 20005 202-538-8000 deepaacharya@quinnemanuel.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Sheff, Rebecca)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
November 7, 2023 Filing 10 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiffs Carlos Doe, Ernesto Doe, Gabriel Doe, Luis Doe by Rebecca Fae Sherman Sheff on behalf of: Sasha Boutilier Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP 51 Madison Avenue, 22nd FloorNew York, NY 10010 212-849-7000 sashaboutilier@quinnemanuel.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Sheff, Rebecca)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
November 7, 2023 Filing 9 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiffs Carlos Doe, Ernesto Doe, Gabriel Doe, Luis Doe by Rebecca Fae Sherman Sheff on behalf of: Misha Boutilier Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP 51 Madison Avenue, 22nd FloorNew York, NY 10010 212-849-7000 mishaboutilier@quinnemanuel.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Sheff, Rebecca)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
November 7, 2023 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-9082298 re: # 10 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Carlos Doe, Gabriel Doe, Ernesto Doe, Luis Doe (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Sheff, Rebecca)
November 7, 2023 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-9082290 re: # 9 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Carlos Doe, Gabriel Doe, Ernesto Doe, Luis Doe (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Sheff, Rebecca)
November 7, 2023 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-9082303 re: # 11 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Carlos Doe, Gabriel Doe, Ernesto Doe, Luis Doe (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Sheff, Rebecca)
November 3, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION to Certify Class by Carlos Doe, Ernesto Doe, Gabriel Doe, Luis Doe. (Sheff, Rebecca)
November 3, 2023 Filing 7 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly reassigned to United States District Judge Matthew L. Garcia as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bc)
November 3, 2023 Filing 5 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bc)
November 3, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE by Carlos Doe, Ernesto Doe, Gabriel Doe, Luis Doe re 1 Complaint, Filing Exhibits 1-8 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8) (Sheff, Rebecca)
November 3, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to File Proceed Under Pseudonym by Carlos Doe, Luis Doe, Ernesto Doe, Gabriel Doe (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B) (Sheff, Rebecca) Modified on 11/3/2023 (bc).
November 3, 2023 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-9077441 re 1 Complaint filed by Carlos Doe, Gabriel Doe, Ernesto Doe, Luis Doe (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Sheff, Rebecca)
November 3, 2023 United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt and United States Magistrate Judge Jennifer M. Rozzoni assigned. (bc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe et al v. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Doe
Represented By: Alison J. Coutifaris
Represented By: Mark Feldman
Represented By: Max Isak Brooks
Represented By: Tess Hellgren
Represented By: Rebecca Fae Sherman Sheff
Represented By: Deepa Acharya
Represented By: Misha Boutilier
Represented By: Sasha Boutilier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Doe
Represented By: Alison J. Coutifaris
Represented By: Tess Hellgren
Represented By: Rebecca Fae Sherman Sheff
Represented By: Max Isak Brooks
Represented By: Mark Feldman
Represented By: Deepa Acharya
Represented By: Misha Boutilier
Represented By: Sasha Boutilier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernesto Doe
Represented By: Max Isak Brooks
Represented By: Alison J. Coutifaris
Represented By: Mark Feldman
Represented By: Tess Hellgren
Represented By: Rebecca Fae Sherman Sheff
Represented By: Deepa Acharya
Represented By: Misha Boutilier
Represented By: Sasha Boutilier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Doe
Represented By: Alison J. Coutifaris
Represented By: Mark Feldman
Represented By: Max Isak Brooks
Represented By: Tess Hellgren
Represented By: Rebecca Fae Sherman Sheff
Represented By: Deepa Acharya
Represented By: Misha Boutilier
Represented By: Sasha Boutilier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Ross McNeill Slaughter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Ross McNeill Slaughter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: Ross McNeill Slaughter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick J Lechleitner
Represented By: Ross McNeill Slaughter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricardo A Wong
Represented By: Ross McNeill Slaughter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica S Burke
Represented By: Ross McNeill Slaughter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brittany Tobias
Represented By: Ross McNeill Slaughter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary De Anda-Ybarra
Represented By: Ross McNeill Slaughter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?