Contreras v. State Farm Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Jimena Gonzales Contreras
Defendant: State Farm Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2023cv01032
Filed: November 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2024 Filing 19 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint for Negligence and Determination of Uninsured Motorist Benefits Under Insurance Policy, Breach of Covenant of Good Faith and Fair Dealing, Insurance Bad Faith and Unfair Trade Practices by Jimena Gonzales Contreras. (Valle, Richard)
January 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing granting in part and denying in part #17 Motion to Extend Initial Scheduling Conference. The parties advise that plaintiff intends to file a motion to amend by 1/19/2024 and ask that the Court extend the deadlines in the Amended Initial Scheduling Order Doc. 16 (amending #10 ) until after the motion is decided. Instead of an extension, the Court will vacate the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/25/2024 at 02:00 PM in Albuquerque and reset it as necessary. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Order, as amended (Docs. #10 and 16) and all associated deadlines are VACATED and will be reset after the motion to amend is decided. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (cda) Modified on 1/18/2024 (dr).
January 17, 2024 Filing 17 Joint MOTION to Extend (other) Time to File JSR and Initial Disclosures by State Farm Insurance Company. (Kaselonis, Taryn)
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AMENDED Initial Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing (amended as to date only). Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference reset for 1/25/2024 at 02:00 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. All of the other dates and instructions in Doc. #10 Initial Scheduling Order remain in effect. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (cda)
January 10, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard J. Valle on behalf of Jimena Gonzales Contreras (Valle, Richard)
January 5, 2024 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Insurance Company (Kaselonis, Taryn)
January 5, 2024 Filing 13 AMENDED Notice of Removal against Jimena Gonzales Contreras., filed by State Farm Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kaselonis, Taryn) Modified text on 1/10/2024 (bc).
January 5, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by State Farm Insurance Company re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Count 1 filed by State Farm Insurance Company (Keller, Courtenay)
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order To File Rule 7.1 Notice And Amend Notice Of Removal by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. (kfo)
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/24/2024 at 02:00 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 1/17/2024. (cda)
December 14, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 7 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by State Farm Insurance Company, 8 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Jimena Gonzales Contreras. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
December 13, 2023 Filing 8 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Jimena Gonzales Contreras voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Lopez, Raul)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 6, 2023 Filing 7 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), State Farm Insurance Company voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Kaselonis, Taryn)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
November 22, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 14 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (kfo)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
November 21, 2023 Filing 5 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
November 21, 2023 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by State Farm Insurance Company. (Kaselonis, Taryn)
November 21, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Count 1 by State Farm Insurance Company. (Kaselonis, Taryn)
November 21, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company for State Farm Insurance Company. (Kaselonis, Taryn)
November 21, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Insurance Company from Second Judicial District Court, County of Bernalillo, State of New Mexico, case number D-202-CV-2023-07626. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by State Farm Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kaselonis, Taryn)
November 21, 2023 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-9101838 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by State Farm Insurance Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Kaselonis, Taryn)
November 21, 2023 United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Contreras v. State Farm Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimena Gonzales Contreras
Represented By: Raul A. Lopez
Represented By: Richard J. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Insurance Company
Represented By: Courtenay L Keller
Represented By: Taryn M Kaselonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?