New Mexico Public Schools Insurance Authority v. Express Scripts Inc.
Plaintiff: New Mexico Public Schools Insurance Authority
Defendant: Express Scripts Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv01034
Filed: November 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Martha Vazquez
Referring Judge: Gregory B Wormuth
2 Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2024 Filing 24 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by New Mexico Public Schools Insurance Authority re #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by New Mexico Public Schools Insurance Authority (Purcell, Charles)
January 18, 2024 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by New Mexico Public Schools Insurance Authority. (Purcell, Charles)
January 16, 2024 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Dismiss the Second and Third Counts of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by New Mexico Public Schools Insurance Authority. (Purcell, Charles)
January 4, 2024 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 Amended MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Express Scripts Inc.. (Allison, Benjamin)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER VACATING INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth. The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference and all associated deadlines contained in the Court's #9 Initial Scheduling Order are hereby VACATED, to be reset at a later date. (dkk)
January 2, 2024 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss the Second and Third Counts of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Express Scripts Inc.. (Allison, Benjamin)
December 27, 2023 Filing 18 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Express Scripts Inc. by Benjamin W Allison on behalf of: Emily Holtzman Husch Blackwell LLP 8001 Forsyth Blvd., Ste 1500St. Louis, MO 63105 314-345-6714 Fax 314-480-1505 emily.holtzman@huschblackwell.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Allison, Benjamin)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 27, 2023 Filing 17 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Express Scripts Inc. by Benjamin W Allison on behalf of: Elizabeth A. Bozicevic Husch Blackwell LLP 8001 Forsyth Blvd., Ste 1500St. Louis, MO 63105 314-480-1844 Fax 314-480-1505 elizabeth.bozicevic@huschblackwell.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Allison, Benjamin)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 27, 2023 Filing 16 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Express Scripts Inc. by Benjamin W Allison on behalf of: Christopher A. Smith Husch Blackwell LLP 8001 Forsyth Blvd., Ste 1500St. Louis, MO 63105 314-480-1836 Fax 314-480-1505 chris.smith@huschblackwell.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Allison, Benjamin)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 27, 2023 Filing 15 Amended MOTION to Remand to State Court by New Mexico Public Schools Insurance Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Purcell, Charles)
December 27, 2023 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-9148565 re: # 16 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Express Scripts Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Allison, Benjamin)
December 27, 2023 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-9148580 re: # 18 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Express Scripts Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Allison, Benjamin)
December 27, 2023 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-9148573 re: # 17 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Express Scripts Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Allison, Benjamin)
December 26, 2023 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss the Second and Third Counts of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Express Scripts Inc.. (Allison, Benjamin)
December 26, 2023 Filing 13 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Martha Vazquez as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
December 21, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand to State Court by New Mexico Public Schools Insurance Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Purcell, Charles)
December 12, 2023 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Express Scripts Inc.., filed by New Mexico Public Schools Insurance Authority. (Purcell, Charles)
December 12, 2023 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss the Second and Third Counts of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by New Mexico Public Schools Insurance Authority. (Purcell, Charles)
December 1, 2023 Filing 9 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth. Joint Status Report due by 1/11/2024. Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 1/25/2024 at 2:00 p.m. Parties shall call Judge Wormuth's teleconference line at (877) 402-9753, access code 7578461, to connect to proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 12/22/2023. (dkk)
November 29, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 14 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (kfo)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
November 28, 2023 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support of its Motion to Dismiss the Second and Third Counts of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Express Scripts Inc.. (Allison, Benjamin)
November 28, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss the Second and Third Counts of Plaintiff's Complaint by Express Scripts Inc.. (Allison, Benjamin)
November 21, 2023 Filing 5 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
November 21, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE by Express Scripts Inc. to Plaintiff of Filing Notice of Removal (Allison, Benjamin)
November 21, 2023 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Express Scripts Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The Cigna Group for Express Scripts Inc.. (Allison, Benjamin)
November 21, 2023 Filing 2 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT Civil Cover Sheet by Express Scripts Inc. (Allison, Benjamin)
November 21, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Express Scripts Inc. from First Judicial District Court, case number D-101-CV-2023-02567. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Express Scripts Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Allison, Benjamin)
November 21, 2023 United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough and Chief United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth assigned. (jg)
November 21, 2023 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-9102478 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Express Scripts Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Allison, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New Mexico Public Schools Insurance Authority v. Express Scripts Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Mexico Public Schools Insurance Authority
Represented By: Charles K. Purcell
Represented By: Martin R. Esquivel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Inc.
Represented By: Michael Woods
Represented By: Benjamin W Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?