Lucero v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Eric Mark Lucero
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2023cv01044
Filed: November 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea granting #11 Motion to Seal. (atc)
January 18, 2024 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Certified Administrative Record by Social Security Administration. (Van Der Valk, Annalies)
December 13, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 8 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Social Security Administration, 4 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Eric Mark Lucero. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (vrr)
December 6, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Manuel Lucero on behalf of Social Security Administration (Lucero, Manuel)
November 28, 2023 Filing 8 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Social Security Administration voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Van Der Valk, Annalies)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
November 28, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Annalies Van Der Valk on behalf of Social Security Administration (Van Der Valk, Annalies)
November 28, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE: The parties are notified that effective December 1, 2022, the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure were amended to add Supplemental Rules for Social Security cases filed under 42 U.S.C 405(g). Pursuant to Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g), the Clerk hereby transmits a Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) using the Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system to the Social Security Administration's Office of General Counsel and to the United States Attorney's Office, notifying the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration of the filing of a Complaint in this action. The parties should review and comply with these rules in full. In relevant part, the rules result in the following changes: 1. Eliminate the need for service under FED. R. CIV. P. 4. Instead, the Court will transmit a Notice of Electronic Filing to the SSA's Office of General Counsel and the USAO for the district where the action is filed.2. Require the Commissioner to file the administrative record within 60 days of receipt of the Notice of Electronic Filing.3. Require the parties to adhere to the following briefing schedule: - Plaintiff's brief due 30 days after answer/administrative record filed and served. - Commissioner's response due 30 days after Plaintiff's brief filed and served. - Plaintiff's reply due 14 days after the Commissioner's response filed and served. Social Security Administration answer due 1/29/2024. (jg)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (atc)
November 22, 2023 Filing 4 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Eric Mark Lucero voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Johnson, Laura)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
November 22, 2023 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
November 22, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eric Mark Lucero. (Johnson, Laura)
November 22, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration ( Filing Fee - Waived), filed by Eric Mark Lucero. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Johnson, Laura)
November 22, 2023 United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea assigned. (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lucero v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Mark Lucero
Represented By: Laura J. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Annalies Van Der Valk
Represented By: Manuel Lucero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?