Romero et al v. Santa Fe County et al
Plaintiff: Barbara Romero
Defendant: Santa Fe County, City of Santa Fe, Ceasar Ornales, Richard Hildebrant, Derek Williams and Melquiades Olivares
Case Number: 1:2023cv01056
Filed: November 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Matthew L Garcia
Referring Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
2 Judge: Jennifer M Rozzoni
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2024 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Barbara Romero Initial Disclosures (Ruyle, Sam) Modified text on 1/22/2024 (arp).
January 18, 2024 Filing 25 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Melquiades Olivares, Santa Fe County, Derek Williams re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Santa Fe County, Melquiades Olivares, Derek Williams (Barnett, Bree)
January 18, 2024 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Melquiades Olivares, Santa Fe County, Derek Williams. (Barnett, Bree)
January 18, 2024 Filing 23 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 16. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg)
January 16, 2024 Set Deadlines: Discovery due by 7/25/2024. Motions due by 8/28/2024. (arp)
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Telephonic Status Conference set for 5/23/2024 at 01:30 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing before Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Counsel are to call Judge Khalsas AT&T conference line at (877) 848 7030 and enter the code 7324132 to connect to the proceedings. (dr)
January 16, 2024 Filing 21 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa: Telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference held on 1/16/2024. (dr)
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STATUS REPORT by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. (dr)
January 12, 2024 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City of Santa Fe, Richard Hildebrant, Ceasar Ornales City Defendants' Initial Disclosures (Salganek, Luke)
January 12, 2024 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Melquiades Olivares, Santa Fe County, Derek Williams County Defendants' Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Barnett, Bree)
January 12, 2024 Filing 17 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Matthew L. Garcia as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Jennifer M. Rozzoni no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
January 8, 2024 Filing 15 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by City of Santa Fe (Salganek, Luke)
January 4, 2024 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Barbara Romero. (Perrin, Kenneth)
January 3, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE by City of Santa Fe of Extension of Deadline to file Initial Disclosures - Extended to January 12, 2024 (Salganek, Luke)
December 18, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE by Barbara Romero OF EXTENSTION OF TIME FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE RESPONSE (Perrin, Kenneth)
December 11, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE by City of Santa Fe, Richard Hildebrant, Ceasar Ornales Jury Demand (Salganek, Luke)
December 7, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE by Melquiades Olivares, Santa Fe County, Derek Williams of Consent to Removal (Barnett, Bree)
December 6, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Melquiades Olivares, Santa Fe County, Derek Williams. (Barnett, Bree)
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Joint Status Report due by 1/8/2024. Counsel and any pro se parties will "meet and confer" no later than Tuesday, December 26, 2023. Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/16/2024 at 10:30 AM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 1/11/2024. (bc) Modified on 12/6/2023 (bc).
December 5, 2023 Filing 6 Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number NMXDCLERK24-0015 (da)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 4, 2023 Filing 5 City Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) for Damages for Wrongful Death by City of Santa Fe, Richard Hildebrant, Ceasar Ornales. (Salganek, Luke)
December 4, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Richard Hildebrant, City of Santa Fe, Ceasar Ornales from First Judicial District Court, case number D-101-CV-2023-02404. ( Filing Fee - Deliver Payment), filed by Richard Hildebrant, City of Santa Fe, Ceasar Ornales. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Salganek, Luke)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(a) requires, absent a court order, any filings with the Court that contain the name of an individual known to be a minor shall only use the minors initials. The Court has directed the Clerk's office to place the Notice of Removal 1 under seal because it uses the child's full name. No later than Monday, December 4, 2023, Defendants shall file a redacted Notice of Removal with attachments reflecting only the minor's initials. Unless otherwise ordered, all future filings shall only use the minor's initials. IT IS SO ORDERED. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
November 27, 2023 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jennifer M. Rozzoni to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
November 27, 2023 United States Magistrate Judge Jennifer M. Rozzoni and United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Romero et al v. Santa Fe County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Romero
Represented By: Kenneth Doug Perrin
Represented By: Sam P. Ruyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Fe County
Represented By: Brandon Huss
Represented By: Bree Kathlene Barnett
Represented By: David Anthony Roman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Santa Fe
Represented By: Paula Grace Maynes
Represented By: Luke Salganek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ceasar Ornales
Represented By: Paula Grace Maynes
Represented By: Luke Salganek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Hildebrant
Represented By: Paula Grace Maynes
Represented By: Luke Salganek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek Williams
Represented By: Brandon Huss
Represented By: Bree Kathlene Barnett
Represented By: David Anthony Roman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melquiades Olivares
Represented By: Brandon Huss
Represented By: Bree Kathlene Barnett
Represented By: David Anthony Roman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?