Jacobs et al v. Clark et al
Plaintiff: Michael Jacobs and Ruby Handler Jacobs
Defendant: Brandon Dewayne Clark, Mellissa Michelle Carroll, Amanda Carroll, Ruth A. Chioda, Brandon P. Clark, Melissa M. Zawistoski, Amanda Carole, William Michael Jones, Genienne Conaway Riggle, Candie Renee Swan, Ashton Swan, Renee Andrea Kexel, Jeremy R. Stone, Gerald R. Stone, Ruth Heldreth and Does 1 through 20; Individually or jointly and severally
Case Number: 1:2023cv01060
Filed: November 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO UNSEAL DOCUMENT 6 by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. (jdm)
December 30, 2023 Filing 13 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT to Doc. #12 by Ruby Handler Jacobs, Michael Jacobs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit to Doc. 12) (Jacobs, Michael) Modified on 1/5/2024 (jg).
December 29, 2023 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Brandon Dewayne Clark, Ruth A. Chioda, Mellissa Michelle Carroll. terminating William Michael Jones, Renee Andrea Kexel, Gerald R. Stone, Jeremy R. Stone, Ashton Swan, Candie Renee Swan, Amanda Carroll and Genienne Conaway Riggle., filed by Ruby Handler Jacobs, Michael Jacobs. (Jacobs, Michael)
December 29, 2023 Filing 11 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Ruby Handler Jacobs (Jacobs, Michael)
December 29, 2023 Filing 10 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Ruby Handler Jacobs, Michael Jacobs (Jacobs, Michael)
December 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time (jdm)
December 22, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Order by Ruby Handler Jacobs, Michael Jacobs. (Jacobs, Michael)
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #6 Notice (Other) filed by Ruby Handler Jacobs by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. (jdm)
December 7, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE by Ruby Handler Jacobs re. USMS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jacobs, Michael)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. (jdm)
November 29, 2023 Filing 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa has been assigned for a 28 U.S.C. 1915 review. (dr)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
November 29, 2023 Filing 3 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 1003609 (dr)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
November 29, 2023 United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (dr)
November 28, 2023 Filing 2 CMECF ProSe Notification Form electing to receive notice by email by Michael Jacobs (dr)
November 28, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Ruby Handler Jacobs, Michael Jacobs. (dr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacobs et al v. Clark et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Dewayne Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mellissa Michelle Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruth A. Chioda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon P. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa M. Zawistoski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Carole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Michael Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genienne Conaway Riggle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Candie Renee Swan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashton Swan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renee Andrea Kexel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy R. Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald R. Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruth Heldreth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20; Individually or jointly and severally
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Jacobs
Represented By: Michael Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruby Handler Jacobs
Represented By: Michael Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?