Johnson et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Ronnie Johnson and Sharon Johnson
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 1:2023cv01086
Filed: December 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: Gregory B Wormuth
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Settlement Conference set for 3/18/2024 at 09:00 AM Remote via Zoom before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. (cda)
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STATUS REPORT AND PROVISIONAL DISCOVERY PLAN and SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Discovery due by 7/15/2024. Motions due by 8/5/2024. (cda)
January 17, 2024 Filing 16 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing: Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference held on 1/17/2024. (cda)
January 17, 2024 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ronnie Johnson, Sharon Johnson Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures (Childress, Suzanne)
January 17, 2024 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company Initial Disclosures (Allen, Meena)
January 10, 2024 Filing 13 Joint Status Report by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Allen, Meena)
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING TRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Chief Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth. Telephonic Trial Scheduling Conference set for 2/7/2024 at 2:30 p.m. The parties shall call Judge Wormuth's teleconference line at (877) 402-9753, access code 7578461, to connect to the proceedings. (es)
January 5, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 3 , 10 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, 9 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge filed by Sharon Johnson, Ronnie Johnson. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kls)
January 4, 2024 Filing 10 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), State Farm Fire and Casualty Company voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Chief Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Allen, Meena)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
January 4, 2024 Filing 9 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Ronnie Johnson, Sharon Johnson voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Chief Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (VandenBout, Lawrence)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
January 3, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 7 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (kls)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 14, 2023 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Allen, Meena)
December 14, 2023 Filing 6 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Allen, Meena)
December 11, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne Love Childress on behalf of Ronnie Johnson, Sharon Johnson (Childress, Suzanne)
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/17/2024 at 02:30 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 1/10/2024. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 12/28/2023. (cda)
December 6, 2023 Filing 3 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), State Farm Fire and Casualty Company voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Chief Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Allen, Meena)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 6, 2023 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Chief Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
December 6, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company from Thirteenth Judicial District Court, case number D-1314-CV-2023-00947. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Allen, Meena)
December 6, 2023 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 405 receipt number ANMDC-9122503 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Allen, Meena)
December 6, 2023 United States Chief Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (dr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Johnson
Represented By: James Trenton Cooper
Represented By: Lawrence A VandenBout
Represented By: Suzanne Love Childress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Johnson
Represented By: James Trenton Cooper
Represented By: Lawrence A VandenBout
Represented By: Suzanne Love Childress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Jacqueline Mosher
Represented By: Meena H Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?