Wirtco, Inc. v. Allianz Resolution Management, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Wirtco, Inc.
Defendant: Allianz Resolution Management, Inc. a foreign corporation,, Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, ACE Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Aetna Insurance Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company, United States Fidelity and Guaranty Company, Bankers Standard Insurance Company, Century Indemnity Company, Pacific Employers Insurance Company and Allianz Resolution Management, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv01095
Filed: December 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: John F Robbenhaar
Referring Judge: Jennifer M Rozzoni
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2024 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by ALLIANZ RESOLUTION MANAGEMENT, INC. and by Fireman's Fund Insurance Company. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Wirtco, Inc..(Allen, Meena)
January 30, 2024 Filing 11 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Fireman's Fund Insurance Company (Allen, Meena)
January 30, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Meena H Allen on behalf of Fireman's Fund Insurance Company (Allen, Meena)
January 25, 2024 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wirtco, Inc.. Allianz Resolution Management, Inc. served on 1/23/2024, answer due 2/13/2024. (Hnasko, Thomas)
January 25, 2024 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wirtco, Inc.. The Travelers Indemnity Company served on 1/23/2024, answer due 2/13/2024. (Hnasko, Thomas)
January 10, 2024 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wirtco, Inc.. United States Fidelity and Guaranty Company served on 1/10/2024, answer due 1/31/2024. (Hnasko, Thomas)
January 10, 2024 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wirtco, Inc.. Fireman's Fund Insurance Company served on 1/10/2024, answer due 1/31/2024. (Hnasko, Thomas)
January 10, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wirtco, Inc.. Century Indemnity Company served on 1/10/2024, answer due 1/31/2024. (Hnasko, Thomas)
January 10, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wirtco, Inc.. Bankers Standard Insurance Company served on 1/10/2024, answer due 1/31/2024. (Hnasko, Thomas)
January 10, 2024 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wirtco, Inc.. ACE Property and Casualty Insurance Company served on 1/10/2024, answer due 1/31/2024. (Hnasko, Thomas)
December 13, 2023 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (bc)
December 11, 2023 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jennifer M. Rozzoni to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
December 11, 2023 United States Magistrate Judge Jennifer M. Rozzoni and United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (dr)
December 8, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Breach of Contract, Violations of the Insurance Practices Act, Breach of the Covenant of Good Faith and Fair Dealing, and for Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Wirtco, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hnasko, Thomas)
December 8, 2023 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 405 receipt number ANMDC-9126648 re #1 Complaint, filed by Wirtco, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Hnasko, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wirtco, Inc. v. Allianz Resolution Management, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wirtco, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas M. Hnasko
Represented By: Lisa Gabrielle Zammiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allianz Resolution Management, Inc. a foreign corporation,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fireman's Fund Insurance Company
Represented By: Meena H Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACE Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Travelers Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Fidelity and Guaranty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bankers Standard Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Century Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Employers Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allianz Resolution Management, Inc.
Represented By: Meena H Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?