Leal v. Ohio Security Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Gabriel Leal doing business as GE Wireless
Defendant: Ohio Security Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2023cv01121
Filed: December 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2024 Filing 20 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Gabriel Leal. (Ayala, Shavon)
February 2, 2024 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Request for Admissions, First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production by Gabriel Leal (Ayala, Shavon) Modified text on 2/5/2024 (eh).
January 30, 2024 Filing 18 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough: Scheduling Conference held on 01/30/2024. (cm)
January 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough setting a Telephonic Status Conference for 04/30/2024 at 10:30 AM. The purpose of this conference is to discuss setting a settlement conference. The parties shall call the AT&T Conference line at (888) 398-2342 [Access Code: 2418431] to connect to the proceedings. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (cm)
January 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Discovery due by 09/03/2024. Discovery motions due by 09/24/2024. Pretrial motions due by 10/15/2024. (cm)
January 23, 2024 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ohio Security Insurance Company Initial Disclosures (Kaselonis, Taryn)
January 22, 2024 Filing 14 Joint Status Report by Ohio Security Insurance Company (Kaselonis, Taryn)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough granting #12 Motion for Extension. Defendant should file the Joint Status Report by noon on Friday, January 26, 2024. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (cm)
January 19, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by Ohio Security Insurance Company. (Kaselonis, Taryn)
January 10, 2024 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gabriel Leal for Initial Disclosures (Ayala, Shavon)
January 9, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 7 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Gabriel Leal, 9 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Ohio Security Insurance Company. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bc)
January 8, 2024 Filing 9 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Ohio Security Insurance Company voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Kaselonis, Taryn)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
January 8, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 2 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (lj)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
January 3, 2024 Filing 7 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Gabriel Leal voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Ayala, Shavon)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 01/30/2024 at 11:30 AM. Joint Status Report due by 01/19/2024. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 01/10/2024. (cm)
December 18, 2023 Filing 5 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
December 18, 2023 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ohio Security Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc., Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Corporate Parent The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Ohio Casualty Corporation, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Peerless Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Employers Insurance Company of Wausau, Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual Agency Corporation, Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Liberty Insurance Holdings, Inc. for Ohio Security Insurance Company. (Kaselonis, Taryn)
December 18, 2023 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Ohio Security Insurance Company. (Kaselonis, Taryn)
December 18, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Count IV of Complaint by Ohio Security Insurance Company. (Kaselonis, Taryn)
December 18, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ohio Security Insurance Company from Second Judicial District Court, County of Bernalillo, State of New Mexico, case number D-202-CV-2023-07191. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Ohio Security Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kaselonis, Taryn)
December 18, 2023 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 405 receipt number ANMDC-9138626 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Ohio Security Insurance Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Kaselonis, Taryn)
December 18, 2023 United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (dr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leal v. Ohio Security Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Leal doing business as GE Wireless
Represented By: Shavon M. Ayala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Security Insurance Company
Represented By: Courtenay L Keller
Represented By: Taryn M Kaselonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?