Dechaine v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Carolyn Dechaine
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2023cv01134
Filed: December 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (Kaselonis, Taryn)
February 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Kaselonis, Taryn)
January 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM 2nd Extension of Time to File Reply (Kaselonis, Taryn)
January 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Extension of Time to File Reply (Kaselonis, Taryn)
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Carolyn Dechaine. (Fuqua, Scott)
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea to Notify Court of the Status of #3 Motion to Dismiss. (atc)
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 9 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Carolyn Dechaine, 8 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (vrr)
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Carolyn Dechaine voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Fuqua, Scott)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Liberty Mutual Insurance Company voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Kaselonis, Taryn)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2) and considering the pending dispositive motion, the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 10 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (atc)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 (b)(2), the Court finds good cause to delay entering a scheduling order at this time due to the pending dispositive motion #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (cda)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Kaselonis, Taryn)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Kaselonis, Taryn)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc., Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Insurance Company for Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Kaselonis, Taryn)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company from First Judicial District Court, County of Santa Fe, State of New Mexico, case number D-101-CV-2023-02570. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kaselonis, Taryn)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 405 receipt number ANMDC-9142616 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Kaselonis, Taryn)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dechaine v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Dechaine
Represented By: Scott Fuqua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Courtenay L Keller
Represented By: Taryn M Kaselonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?